EP2214021 - Kit for predicting implantation success in assisted fertilisation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.11.2015 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.09.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 04.10.2017 [2017/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Femalon S.P.R.L. Rue Saint Exupéry 17 4460 Bierset / BE | [2014/36] |
Former [2014/16] | For all designated states Femalon S.P.R.L. Rue de Travail 16 4460 Grâce-Hollogne / BE | ||
Former [2012/02] | For all designated states Femalon S.A. rue du Travail 16 4460 Grâce-Hollogne / BE | ||
Former [2010/31] | For all designated states Mithra Pharmaceuticals NV/SA Rue sur les Foulons 1 4000 Liège / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lédée, Nathalie c/o Université Versailles St-Quentin en Yvelines Service de GOMR CHI Poissy St-Germain en Laye 10 rue du Champs Gaillard 78300 Poissy / FR | 02 /
Piccinni, Marie-Pierre c/o University of Florence Department of Internal Medicine Immunoallergology Unit Viale Morgagni 85 50134 Florence / IT | 03 /
Lombroso, Raoul c/o Université Versailles St-Quentin en Yvelines Unité clinique d'AMP CHI Poissy St-Germain en Laye 10 rue du Champs Gaillard 78300 Poissy / FR | [2015/02] |
Former [2010/39] | 01 /
Lédée, Nathalie c/o Université Versailles St-Quentin en Yvelines Service de GOMR CHI Poissy St-Germain en Laye 10 rue du Champs Gaillard 78300 Poissy / FR | ||
02 /
Piccinni, Marie-Pierre c/o University of Florence Department of Internal Medicine, Immunoallergology Unit Viale Morgagni 85 50134 Florence / IT | |||
03 /
Lombroso, Raoul c/o Université Versailles St-Quentin en Yvelines Unité clinique d'AMP CHI Poissy St-Germain en Laye 10 rue du Champs Gaillard 78300 Poissy / FR | |||
Former [2010/31] | 01 /
Lédée, Nathalie c/o Université Versailles St-Quentin en Yvelines Service de GOMR CHI Poissy St-Germain en Laye 10 rue du Champs Gaillard 78300, Poissy / FR | ||
02 /
Piccinni, Marie-Pierre c/o University of Florence Department of Internal Medicine, Immunoallergology Unit Viale Morgagni 85 50134, Florence / IT | |||
03 /
Lombroso, Raoul c/o Université Versailles St-Quentin en Yvelines Unité clinique d'AMP CHI Poissy St-Germain en Laye 10 rue du Champs Gaillard 78300, Poissy / FR | Representative(s) | Gyi, Jeffrey Ivan, et al De Clercq & Partners cvba Edgard Gevaertdreef 10 a 9830 Sint-Martens-Latem / BE | [2015/02] |
Former [2011/12] | Gyi, Jeffrey Ivan, et al De Clercq & Partners cvba Edgard Gevaertdreef 10 a 9830 Sint-Martens-Latem / BE | ||
Former [2010/31] | Vanhalst, Koen, et al De Clercq & Partners cvba E. Gevaertdreef 10a 9830 Sint-Martens-Latem / BE | Application number, filing date | 10162987.1 | 18.07.2007 | [2010/31] | Priority number, date | US20060832094P | 21.07.2006 Original published format: US 832094 P | [2010/31] | Previously filed application, date | EP20070787688 | 18.07.2007 | [2010/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2214021 | Date: | 04.08.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2214021 | Date: | 07.01.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.07.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/68 | [2010/31] | CPC: |
G01N33/689 (EP,CN,US);
C07K14/53 (KR);
A61P15/08 (EP);
G01N33/53 (KR);
G01N33/68 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/31] | Extension states | AL | 17.05.2010 | BA | 17.05.2010 | HR | 17.05.2010 | MK | 17.05.2010 | RS | 17.05.2010 | Title | German: | Kit zur Vorhersage des Implantationserfolgs bei unterstützter Befruchtung | [2010/31] | English: | Kit for predicting implantation success in assisted fertilisation | [2010/31] | French: | Trousse pour prédire le succés d'implantation lors de la fécondation assistée | [2010/31] | Examination procedure | 17.05.2010 | Examination requested [2010/31] | 04.02.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.09.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.03.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.08.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.12.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 01.12.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.12.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP07787688.6 / EP2049906 | Divisional application(s) | EP15150111.1 / EP2857840 | EP17175527.5 / EP3267198 | EP19194901.5 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20070787688) is 20.07.2009 | Opposition(s) | 08.10.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 07.01.2015 | EE | 07.01.2015 | MC | 07.01.2015 | MT | 07.01.2015 | SI | 07.01.2015 | SK | 07.01.2015 | BG | 07.04.2015 | IS | 07.05.2015 | [2017/40] |
Former [2017/21] | EE | 07.01.2015 | |
MC | 07.01.2015 | ||
MT | 07.01.2015 | ||
SI | 07.01.2015 | ||
SK | 07.01.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
IS | 07.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/13] | EE | 07.01.2015 | |
MC | 07.01.2015 | ||
SI | 07.01.2015 | ||
SK | 07.01.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
IS | 07.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | EE | 07.01.2015 | |
SI | 07.01.2015 | ||
SK | 07.01.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
IS | 07.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | EE | 07.01.2015 | |
SK | 07.01.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
IS | 07.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/38] | BG | 07.04.2015 | |
IS | 07.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | BG | 07.04.2015 | Cited in | by applicant | US4376110 | EP0239400 | WO8909088 |