EP2388723 - Method of assessing allergic status in a subject [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.11.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.11.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.12.2012 [2012/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states University College Cork-National University of Ireland, Cork Western Road Cork / IE | [2011/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DunnGalvin, Audrey 10, The Courtyard Woodville Glanmire Cork / IE | 02 /
Hourihane, Johnathan O'B. c/o Department of Paediatrics & Child Health University College Cork Western Road Cork / IE | [2011/47] | Representative(s) | Purdy, Hugh Barry PurdyLucey Intellectual Property The Capel Building, Suite 138-139 Mary's Abbey Dublin 7 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/47] | Purdy, Hugh Barry PurdyLucy Intellectual Property Suite 138/139 The Capel Building Mary's Abbey Dublin 7 / IE | Application number, filing date | 10163132.3 | 18.05.2010 | [2011/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2388723 | Date: | 23.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.11.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G06F19/00 | [2011/47] | CPC: |
G16H50/20 (EP,US);
G16Z99/00 (EP,US);
G16H50/30 (EP,US);
G16H50/50 (EP,US);
G16H50/70 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/47] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Beurteilung des allergischen Zustands einer Person | [2011/47] | English: | Method of assessing allergic status in a subject | [2011/47] | French: | Procédé d'évaluation de l'état allergique d'une personne | [2011/47] | Examination procedure | 24.05.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/49] | 16.07.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2012/49] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2012 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2008082364 (JUNG EDWARD K [US], et al) [I] 1-13 * figure 13; claim 48 * * paragraph [0039] * * paragraph [0059] * * paragraph [0152] - paragraph [0153] * * paragraph [0228] *; | [I] - SEYMOUR D G ET AL, "Making Better Decisions: Construction of Clinical Scoring Systems by the Spielgelhalter: Knill-Jones Approach", BRITISH MEDICAL JOURNAL, LONDON, GB, (19900127), vol. 300, ISSN 0267-0623, pages 223 - 226, XP009139940 [I] 1-13 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1136/bmj.300.6719.223 | [I] - KEARNEY S ET AL, "The Food Challenge Risk Index: Predicting Positive Open Food Challenges to Milk, Egg and Peanuts in Children", PEDIATRIC ASTHMA, ALLERGY & IMMUNOLOGY, (20050601), vol. 18, no. 2, pages 68 - 76, XP002606680 [I] 1-13 * the whole document * |