EP2264254 - Chamber [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.10.2018 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Uponor Infra Oy Äyritie 20 01510 Vantaa / FI | [2015/24] |
Former [2013/04] | For all designated states Uponor Innovation AB P.O. Box 101 73061 Virsbo / SE | ||
Former [2010/51] | For all designated states Uponor Innovation Ab Virsbo Industriomräde 73061 Virsbo / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Juuti, Rauno Mutkatie 3 B 12 15550 Nastola / FI | 02 /
Puolimatka, Ville-Veikko Kulmakatu 12 A 11 15140 Lahti / FI | [2010/51] | Representative(s) | Papula Oy P.O. Box 981 00101 Helsinki / FI | [2013/30] |
Former [2010/51] | Huhtanen, Ossi Jaakko Kolster Oy AB, Iso Roobertinkatu 23, P.O. Box 148 00121 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 10163685.0 | 24.05.2010 | [2010/51] | Priority number, date | FI20090005580 | 26.05.2009 Original published format: FI 20095580 | [2010/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2264254 | Date: | 22.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.08.2010 | Classification | IPC: | E03F5/02, E03F5/14, E03B3/02 | [2010/51] | CPC: |
E03B3/03 (EP);
F16L41/08 (FI);
E03F11/00 (FI);
E03F5/021 (EP);
E03F5/024 (EP);
Y02A20/108 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/51] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Kammer | [2010/51] | English: | Chamber | [2010/51] | French: | Chambre | [2010/51] | Examination procedure | 17.06.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.06.2011 | Examination requested [2011/31] | 01.04.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.06.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.10.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.04.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.12.2017 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 18.12.2017 | 18.12.2017 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 08.01.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.05.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/46] | 26.06.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2018/46] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.04.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2018 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]SE450161 (UPONOR AB [SE]) [Y] 1-3,7,8 * abstract *; | [Y]DE9006904U (VEB UNIVERSAL DRESDEN) [Y] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [Y]GB2263926 (TENNANT CHARLES & CO LTD [GB]) [Y] 4-6* page 9; figure 4 *; | [Y]DE4445276 (JUNG PUMPEN GMBH & CO [DE]) [Y] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [Y]EP1094163 (BEDNARSCH GERD [DE]) [Y] 1-8 * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0038]; figures 6,11 *; | [Y]DE19961414 (HAMMES HORST [DE]) [Y] 4-6 * the whole document * | Examination | DE20211630U | by applicant | SE450161 |