EP2256826 - Adhesive seal material for end portion of frameless solar cell module, frameless solar cell module, and sealed structure of end portion thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 18.04.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.04.2014 | Withdrawal of application | published on 21.05.2014 [2014/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nitto Denko Corporation 1-2, Shimohozumi 1-chome Ibaraki-shi Osaka 567-8680 / JP | [2010/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fujii, Hiroki c/o Nitto Denko Corporation 1-2, Shimo-hozumi 1-chome, Ibaraki-shi Osaka 567-8680 / JP | [2010/48] | Representative(s) | SSM Sandmair Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt Partnerschaft mbB Joseph-Wild-Straße 20 81829 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/48] | Schwabe - Sandmair - Marx Patentanwälte Stuntzstraße 16 81677 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10163989.6 | 27.05.2010 | [2010/48] | Priority number, date | JP20090131250 | 29.05.2009 Original published format: JP 2009131250 | [2010/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2256826 | Date: | 01.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/48] | Classification | IPC: | H01L31/048 | [2010/48] | CPC: |
B32B7/12 (EP,US);
B32B15/08 (EP,US);
B32B15/14 (EP,US);
B32B15/20 (EP,US);
B32B25/08 (EP,US);
B32B25/10 (EP,US);
B32B25/14 (EP,US);
B32B27/12 (EP,US);
B32B27/18 (EP,US);
B32B27/36 (EP,US);
B32B27/38 (EP,US);
B32B5/022 (EP,US);
B32B5/028 (EP,US);
B32B5/12 (EP,US);
B32B5/22 (EP,US);
B32B5/26 (EP,US);
B32B7/06 (EP,US);
H01L31/048 (EP,US);
H01L31/0488 (EP,US);
B32B2255/02 (EP,US);
B32B2255/06 (EP,US);
B32B2255/10 (EP,US);
B32B2255/20 (EP,US);
B32B2255/205 (EP,US);
B32B2255/26 (EP,US);
B32B2262/0253 (EP,US);
B32B2264/108 (EP,US);
B32B2307/306 (EP,US);
B32B2307/50 (EP,US);
B32B2307/71 (EP,US);
B32B2307/712 (EP,US);
B32B2307/718 (EP,US);
B32B2307/7246 (EP,US);
B32B2307/748 (EP,US);
B32B2405/00 (EP,US);
B32B2457/12 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/48] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Klebdichtmaterial für den Endabschnitt eines rahmenlosen Solarzellenmoduls, rahmenloses Solarzellenmodul und Dichtungsstruktur des Endabschnitts davon | [2010/48] | English: | Adhesive seal material for end portion of frameless solar cell module, frameless solar cell module, and sealed structure of end portion thereof | [2010/48] | French: | Matériau de joint adhésif pour la partie terminale d'un module de cellule solaire sans cadre, module de cellule solaire sans cadre et structure scellée de sa partie terminale | [2010/48] | Examination procedure | 09.04.2014 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2014/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | by applicant | JP2005347395 | JP2008283035 |