EP2267948 - Communications system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.04.2018 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.04.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.05.2018 [2018/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1 80333 München / DE | [2017/35] |
Former [2013/11] | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/52] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Weber, Karl, Dr. Zur Schanze 5 90518 Altdorf / DE | [2010/52] | Application number, filing date | 10164002.7 | 27.05.2010 | [2010/52] | Priority number, date | DE20091023199 | 29.05.2009 Original published format: DE102009023199 | [2010/52] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2267948 | Date: | 29.12.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/52] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2267948 | Date: | 16.02.2011 | [2011/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.01.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/40, H04L29/08, G06F13/28, H04L29/06 | [2011/07] | CPC: |
H04L12/40006 (EP,US);
H04L12/40032 (EP,US);
H04L2012/4026 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2011/01] | H04L12/40, H04L29/08, G06F13/28 | ||
Former IPC [2010/52] | H04L12/40, H04L29/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/52] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Kommunikationssystem | [2010/52] | English: | Communications system | [2010/52] | French: | Système de communication | [2010/52] | Examination procedure | 21.03.2011 | Examination requested [2011/17] | 14.10.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.12.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.02.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.06.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.10.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.07.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.01.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.11.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.06.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.09.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 09.12.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/20] | 11.01.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/20] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.12.2011 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 14.10.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 14.10.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 28.10.2011 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]US2004078462 (PHILBRICK CLIVE M [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5,6,8 * paragraph [0013] * * paragraphs [0546] - [0595] * * paragraph [0751] * [A] 3,4 [I] 7,9,11,16; | [A]US2006023697 (SHORE PAUL [CA], et al) [A] 1-16 * figure 1C ** paragraphs [0037] - [0051] *; | [XI]EP1708451 (TOSHIBA TEC KK [JP]) [X] 10,15 * abstract * * figures 2,5 * * paragraphs [0008] , [0009] * * paragraph [0020] * * paragraphs [0030] - [0039] * [I] 11-14,16 | Examination | US2006280185 |