Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8334026 | Global Dossier | 18.12.2012 | B2 | US2010304040 | 02.12.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US47494609 | 29.05.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5784883B | Global Dossier | 24.09.2015 | B2 | JP2010275554 | 09.12.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | US47494609 | 29.05.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2256170 | Global Dossier | 24.12.2014 | B1 | EP2256170 | 01.12.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US47494609 | 29.05.2009 |