EP2390285 - Process for the preparation of surface treated mineral filler products and uses of same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.12.2015 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.12.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.01.2016 [2016/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Omya International AG Baslerstrasse 42 4665 Oftringen / CH | [2013/43] |
Former [2011/48] | For all designated states Omya Development AG Baslerstrasse 42 4665 Oftringen / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Buri, Matthias Mätteliweg 20 4852, Rothrist / CH | 02 /
Gane, Patrick A.C. Studenweg 8 4852, Rothrist / CH | 03 /
Rentsch, Samuel Höheweg 1 4663, Aarburg / CH | 04 /
Burkhalter, René Cuno Amiet Strasse 56 3360, Herzogenbuchsee / CH | [2011/48] | Representative(s) | Glas, Holger Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/48] | Glas, Holger Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstrasse 3 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10164408.6 | 28.05.2010 | [2011/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2390285 | Date: | 30.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.10.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C09C1/02 | [2011/48] | CPC: |
C09C1/021 (EP,US);
C09C3/08 (KR);
C08K13/02 (EP,US);
C08K3/26 (EP,US);
C08K5/07 (EP,US);
C08K9/04 (EP,US);
C09C1/02 (KR);
C01P2004/51 (EP,US);
C01P2004/61 (EP,US);
C01P2004/62 (EP,US);
C01P2006/12 (EP,US);
C01P2006/32 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/48] | Extension states | BA | 28.05.2010 | ME | 28.05.2010 | RS | 28.05.2010 | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von oberflächenbehandelten mineralischen Füllstoffprodukten und Verwendungen davon | [2011/48] | English: | Process for the preparation of surface treated mineral filler products and uses of same | [2011/48] | French: | Procédé de préparation de charges à base de minerai traité en surface et leurs utilisations | [2011/48] | Examination procedure | 28.05.2010 | Examination requested [2011/48] | 21.05.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.01.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.05.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.06.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.10.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.03.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.07.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/01] | 01.09.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/01] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.01.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2015 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]WO9961521 (ECC INT LTD [GB], et al) [AD] 1-17; | [AD]WO0020336 (PLUSS STAUFFER AG [CH], et al) [AD] 1-17; | [AD]US2002102404 (NAKAI GO [JP], et al)[AD] 1-17; | [AD]WO2005075353 (IMERYS MINERALS LTD [GB], et al) [AD] 1-17; | [A]EP1980588 (OMYA DEVELOPMENT AG [CH]) [A] 1-17 * paragraphs [0008] , [0928] , [0029] , [0032] - [0041] - [0068] - [0072]; claim - * | by applicant | JPS54162746 | US4407986 | US4520073 | EP0325114 | WO9202587 | WO9961521 | WO0020336 | WO0132787 | US2002102404 | WO03082966 | WO2005075353 |