EP2392610 - New thermoplast-rubber multi-component system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.11.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.11.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.12.2012 [2012/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lanxess Deutschland GmbH 51369 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/49] | For all designated states Lanxess Deutschland GmbH 51369 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Soddemann, Matthias, Dr. / Bergische Landstrasse 89b 51503 Rösrath-Hoffnungsthal / DE | 02 /
Schulte, Maik / Henkhauserstr. 68 58119 Hagen / DE | 03 /
Margraf, Günter Nettergasse 98 41539 Dormagen / DE | 04 /
Roos, Andreas, Dr. Niederkasseler Strasse 57 40547 Düsseldorf / DE | 05 /
Thust, Torsten Neustädter Strasse 28 49565 Bramsche / DE | 06 /
Giese, Ulrich, Prof. Dr. Lindenweg 12 31191 Algermissen / DE | [2011/49] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2011/49] | Application number, filing date | 10164751.9 | 02.06.2010 | [2011/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2392610 | Date: | 07.12.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.10.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C08J5/12, C08K5/00, C08K5/3492, C08G81/02, B29C45/16 | [2011/49] | CPC: |
B29C45/1676 (EP);
B29C45/0001 (EP);
C08J5/121 (EP);
C08J2300/22 (EP);
C08J2321/00 (EP);
C08K5/0025 (EP);
C08K5/34924 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/49] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Neue Thermoplast-Kautschuk-Mehrkomponenten-Systeme | [2011/49] | English: | New thermoplast-rubber multi-component system | [2011/49] | French: | Nouveaux systèmes à plusieurs composants en caoutchouc thermoplastique | [2011/49] | Examination procedure | 09.06.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/49] | 16.07.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2012/49] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2012 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP1666535 (DAICEL DEGUSSA LTD [JP]) [X] 1-7,9,10,12,13 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0063] * * paragraph [0068] * * paragraph [0096] - paragraph [0111] * * paragraph [0115] * * paragraph [0136] - paragraph [0140] * * paragraph [0155] * * paragraph [0168] - paragraph [0170] * * paragraph [0172] - paragraph [0174] * * example - * * claims 1-4,6-9,15-17,20-22 * [I] 8,11; | [XI]EP1552965 (DAICEL DEGUSSA LTD [JP]) [X] 1-7,9,12,13 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0025] * * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0067] * * paragraph [0100] - paragraph [0114] * * paragraph [0117] - paragraph [0122] * * paragraph [0157] * * paragraph [0164] * * paragraph [0172] * * paragraph [0186] * * example - * * claims 1-3,6-11,13,16,17 * [I] 8,10,11; | [XI]EP1273433 (DAICEL DEGUSSA LTD [JP]) [X] 1-9,12,13 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0060] * * paragraph [0064] - paragraph [0073] * * paragraph [0078] - paragraph [0083] * * paragraph [0098] - paragraph [0101] * * paragraph [0114] - paragraph [0115] * * paragraph [0169] * * example - * * claims 1-6,8,9,14,15 * [I] 10,11; | [AD]EP0629653 (HUELS CHEMISCHE WERKE AG [DE]) [AD] 1-13 * page 2, line 1 - line 4 * * page 2, line 28 - page 3, line 2 * * page 4, line 19 - page 6, line 15 * * example - * * claims 1,4,8 * | by applicant | EP0344427 | EP0629653 | DE19718504 | US3700637 | DE2539132 | EP0134023 | DE3540918 | EP0298386 | DE3529252 | DE3433392 | US4464515 | US4503196 | US4826721 |