EP2393029 - Method for activating at least a function on a chipset and chipset for the implementation of the method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.11.2012 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.11.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.12.2012 [2012/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nagravision S.A. 22-24, route de Genève 1033 Cheseaux-sur-Lausanne / CH | [2011/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Servet, Patrick / ch. de Sous-le-Mont 36 1033, Cheseaux-sur-Lausanne / CH | 02 /
Hunacek, Didier / ch. du Pré des Planches 16C 1807, Blonay / CH | [2011/49] | Representative(s) | Leman Consulting S.A. Chemin de Précossy 31 1260 Nyon / CH | [2011/49] | Application number, filing date | 10165003.4 | 04.06.2010 | [2011/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2393029 | Date: | 07.12.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.11.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G06F21/00, G06F21/02, H04N7/16 | [2011/49] | CPC: |
G06F21/71 (EP,KR,US);
H04L9/14 (KR);
H04L63/08 (KR);
H04N21/26606 (EP,KR,US);
H04N21/4623 (EP,KR,US);
H04N21/8453 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/49] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Aktivierung von mindestens einer Funktion auf einem Chipsatz und Chipsatz zur Umsetzung des Verfahrens | [2011/49] | English: | Method for activating at least a function on a chipset and chipset for the implementation of the method | [2011/49] | French: | Procédé d'activation d'au moins une fonction sur un jeu de puces et jeu de puces pour la mise en oeuvre du procédé | [2011/49] | Examination procedure | 09.06.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/49] | 16.07.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2012/49] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2012 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5883956 (LE AN VAN [US], et al) [Y] 1-11 * column 4, line 65 - column 5, line 4 * * column 7, line 36 - column 7, line 61 * * column 10, line 64 - column 11, line 22 * * column 12, line 11 - column 12, line 22 * * column 14, line 64 - column 15, line 24 * * column 15, line 64 - column 15, line 67 *; | [Y]WO2006091304 (COMCAST CABLE HOLDINGS LLC [US], et al) [Y] 1-11 * page 2, line 18 - page 2, line 22 * * page 13, line 26 - page 14, line 29 * * figure 2 *; | [Y]US2003097578 (ENGLAND PAUL [US], et al) [Y] 2,3 * paragraphs [0007] , [0081] , [0082] * * figure 7 *; | [A]US2004190558 (OLIVER DELTON JOHN [US]) [A] 1,4-8,10,11 * paragraphs [0029] , [0037] , [0040] , [0042] , [0044] , [0051] , [0053] * * figure 8 *; | [A]US7389415 (KUMAR JAINENDRA [US]) [A] 1,4,7,8,10,11 * column 2, line 65 - column 3, line 1 * * column 3, line 53 - column 4, line 50 * * column 5, line 7 - column 6, line 5 * * figure 2 *; | [A]US2003060189 (MINEAR BRIAN [US], et al) [A] 2,3 * paragraphs [0010] , [0087] , [0113] , [0114] , [0123] , [0127] * * figure 10 * |