EP2261715 - Method of producing an optical part holding member [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2010/50] | Optical part holding member and production method thereof | ||
[2014/32] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.06.2015 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 106- / JP | For all designated states National Institute of Advanced Industrial Science and Technology 3-1, Kasumigaseki 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8921 / JP | [2014/20] |
Former [2010/50] | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 106- / JP | ||
For all designated states Fujinon Corporation 324 Uetake-cho, 1-chome, Kita-ku Saitama-shi Saitama 331-9624 / JP | |||
For all designated states National Institute of Advanced Industrial Science and Technology 3-1, Kasumigaseki 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8921 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Taki, Ikuo c/o FUJIFILM Corporation 2-12-1, Ogi-cho, Odawara-shi Kanagawa Kanagawa 250-0001 / JP | 02 /
Hyuga, Hideki c/o Chubu Center, National Institute of Advanced Industrial Science and Technology 2266-98, Aza-Anagahora, oaza-Shimoshidami Moriyama-ku, Nagoya-shi Aichi Aichi 463-8560 / JP | 03 /
Kita, Hideki c/o Chubu Center, National Institute of Advanced Industrial Science and Technology 2266-98, Aza-Anagahora, oaza-Shimoshidami Moriyama-ku, Nagoya-shi Aichi Aichi 463-8560 / JP | 04 /
Tanaka, Yasunori c/o FUJINON CORPORATION 324, Uetake-cho 1-chome Kita-ku, Saitama-shi Saitama Saitama 331-9624 / JP | [2014/33] |
Former [2010/50] | 01 /
Taki, Ikuo c/o FUJIFILM Corporation 2-12-1, Ogi-cho, Odawara-shi Kanagawa Kanagawa 250-0001 / JP | ||
02 /
Hyuga, Hideki c/o Chubu Center, National Institute of Advanced Industrial Science and Technology 2266-98, Aza-Anagahora, oaza-Shimoshidami, Moriyama-ku, Nagoya-shi Aichi Aichi 463-8560 / JP | |||
03 /
Kita, Hideki c/o Chubu Center, National Institute of Advanced Industrial Science and Technology 2266-98, Aza-Anagahora, oaza-Shimoshidami, Moriyama-ku, Nagoya-shi Aichi Aichi 463-8560 / JP | |||
04 /
Tanaka, Yasunori c/o FUJINON CORPORATION 324, Uetake-cho 1-chome, Kita-ku, Saitama-shi Saitama Saitama 331-9624 / JP | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/33] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2012/24] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastraße 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/50] | Siegert, Georg Hoffmann - Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 D-81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10165063.8 | 07.06.2010 | [2010/50] | Priority number, date | JP20090140331 | 11.06.2009 Original published format: JP 2009140331 | [2010/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2261715 | Date: | 15.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2261715 | Date: | 13.08.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.09.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G02B7/00, B29D11/00, G02B1/00, G02B27/00, // G02B7/02 | [2010/50] | CPC: |
G02B13/001 (EP,US);
G02B7/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/50] | Title | German: | Herstellungsverfahren für ein Element zum Halten eines optischenTeils | [2014/32] | English: | Method of producing an optical part holding member | [2014/32] | French: | Procédé de production d'un élément de support de pièce optique | [2014/32] |
Former [2010/50] | Optisches Element zum Halten eines Teils und Herstellungsverfahren dafür | ||
Former [2010/50] | Optical part holding member and production method thereof | ||
Former [2010/50] | Élément de support de pièce optique et son procédé de production | Examination procedure | 07.06.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.06.2011 | Examination requested [2011/30] | 28.01.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.04.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.02.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.06.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 04.06.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.06.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.01.2013 | Opposition(s) | 15.05.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.06.2010 | AL | 13.08.2014 | AT | 13.08.2014 | BE | 13.08.2014 | CY | 13.08.2014 | CZ | 13.08.2014 | DK | 13.08.2014 | EE | 13.08.2014 | ES | 13.08.2014 | FI | 13.08.2014 | HR | 13.08.2014 | IT | 13.08.2014 | LT | 13.08.2014 | LV | 13.08.2014 | MC | 13.08.2014 | MK | 13.08.2014 | MT | 13.08.2014 | NL | 13.08.2014 | PL | 13.08.2014 | RO | 13.08.2014 | SE | 13.08.2014 | SI | 13.08.2014 | SK | 13.08.2014 | SM | 13.08.2014 | TR | 13.08.2014 | BG | 13.11.2014 | NO | 13.11.2014 | GR | 14.11.2014 | IS | 13.12.2014 | PT | 15.12.2014 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/30] | HU | 07.06.2010 | |
AT | 13.08.2014 | ||
BE | 13.08.2014 | ||
CY | 13.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 13.08.2014 | ||
DK | 13.08.2014 | ||
EE | 13.08.2014 | ||
ES | 13.08.2014 | ||
FI | 13.08.2014 | ||
HR | 13.08.2014 | ||
IT | 13.08.2014 | ||
LT | 13.08.2014 | ||
LV | 13.08.2014 | ||
MC | 13.08.2014 | ||
MK | 13.08.2014 | ||
MT | 13.08.2014 | ||
NL | 13.08.2014 | ||
PL | 13.08.2014 | ||
RO | 13.08.2014 | ||
SE | 13.08.2014 | ||
SI | 13.08.2014 | ||
SK | 13.08.2014 | ||
SM | 13.08.2014 | ||
TR | 13.08.2014 | ||
BG | 13.11.2014 | ||
NO | 13.11.2014 | ||
GR | 14.11.2014 | ||
IS | 13.12.2014 | ||
PT | 15.12.2014 | ||
Former [2017/39] | HU | 07.06.2010 | |
AT | 13.08.2014 | ||
BE | 13.08.2014 | ||
CY | 13.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 13.08.2014 | ||
DK | 13.08.2014 | ||
EE | 13.08.2014 | ||
ES | 13.08.2014 | ||
FI | 13.08.2014 | ||
HR | 13.08.2014 | ||
IT | 13.08.2014 | ||
LT | 13.08.2014 | ||
LV | 13.08.2014 | ||
MC | 13.08.2014 | ||
MT | 13.08.2014 | ||
NL | 13.08.2014 | ||
PL | 13.08.2014 | ||
RO | 13.08.2014 | ||
SE | 13.08.2014 | ||
SI | 13.08.2014 | ||
SK | 13.08.2014 | ||
SM | 13.08.2014 | ||
TR | 13.08.2014 | ||
BG | 13.11.2014 | ||
NO | 13.11.2014 | ||
GR | 14.11.2014 | ||
IS | 13.12.2014 | ||
PT | 15.12.2014 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 13.08.2014 | |
BE | 13.08.2014 | ||
CY | 13.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 13.08.2014 | ||
DK | 13.08.2014 | ||
EE | 13.08.2014 | ||
ES | 13.08.2014 | ||
FI | 13.08.2014 | ||
HR | 13.08.2014 | ||
IT | 13.08.2014 | ||
LT | 13.08.2014 | ||
LV | 13.08.2014 | ||
MC | 13.08.2014 | ||
MT | 13.08.2014 | ||
NL | 13.08.2014 | ||
PL | 13.08.2014 | ||
RO | 13.08.2014 | ||
SE | 13.08.2014 | ||
SI | 13.08.2014 | ||
SK | 13.08.2014 | ||
BG | 13.11.2014 | ||
NO | 13.11.2014 | ||
GR | 14.11.2014 | ||
IS | 13.12.2014 | ||
PT | 15.12.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | AT | 13.08.2014 | |
BE | 13.08.2014 | ||
CY | 13.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 13.08.2014 | ||
DK | 13.08.2014 | ||
EE | 13.08.2014 | ||
ES | 13.08.2014 | ||
FI | 13.08.2014 | ||
HR | 13.08.2014 | ||
IT | 13.08.2014 | ||
LT | 13.08.2014 | ||
LV | 13.08.2014 | ||
MC | 13.08.2014 | ||
NL | 13.08.2014 | ||
PL | 13.08.2014 | ||
RO | 13.08.2014 | ||
SE | 13.08.2014 | ||
SI | 13.08.2014 | ||
SK | 13.08.2014 | ||
BG | 13.11.2014 | ||
NO | 13.11.2014 | ||
GR | 14.11.2014 | ||
IS | 13.12.2014 | ||
PT | 15.12.2014 | ||
Former [2016/09] | AT | 13.08.2014 | |
CY | 13.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 13.08.2014 | ||
DK | 13.08.2014 | ||
EE | 13.08.2014 | ||
ES | 13.08.2014 | ||
FI | 13.08.2014 | ||
HR | 13.08.2014 | ||
IT | 13.08.2014 | ||
LT | 13.08.2014 | ||
LV | 13.08.2014 | ||
MC | 13.08.2014 | ||
NL | 13.08.2014 | ||
PL | 13.08.2014 | ||
RO | 13.08.2014 | ||
SE | 13.08.2014 | ||
SI | 13.08.2014 | ||
SK | 13.08.2014 | ||
BG | 13.11.2014 | ||
NO | 13.11.2014 | ||
GR | 14.11.2014 | ||
IS | 13.12.2014 | ||
PT | 15.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/50] | AT | 13.08.2014 | |
CY | 13.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 13.08.2014 | ||
DK | 13.08.2014 | ||
EE | 13.08.2014 | ||
ES | 13.08.2014 | ||
FI | 13.08.2014 | ||
HR | 13.08.2014 | ||
IT | 13.08.2014 | ||
LT | 13.08.2014 | ||
LV | 13.08.2014 | ||
NL | 13.08.2014 | ||
PL | 13.08.2014 | ||
RO | 13.08.2014 | ||
SE | 13.08.2014 | ||
SI | 13.08.2014 | ||
SK | 13.08.2014 | ||
BG | 13.11.2014 | ||
NO | 13.11.2014 | ||
GR | 14.11.2014 | ||
IS | 13.12.2014 | ||
PT | 15.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 13.08.2014 | |
CY | 13.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 13.08.2014 | ||
DK | 13.08.2014 | ||
EE | 13.08.2014 | ||
ES | 13.08.2014 | ||
FI | 13.08.2014 | ||
HR | 13.08.2014 | ||
IT | 13.08.2014 | ||
LT | 13.08.2014 | ||
LV | 13.08.2014 | ||
NL | 13.08.2014 | ||
PL | 13.08.2014 | ||
RO | 13.08.2014 | ||
SE | 13.08.2014 | ||
SK | 13.08.2014 | ||
BG | 13.11.2014 | ||
NO | 13.11.2014 | ||
GR | 14.11.2014 | ||
IS | 13.12.2014 | ||
PT | 15.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/23] | AT | 13.08.2014 | |
CY | 13.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 13.08.2014 | ||
DK | 13.08.2014 | ||
EE | 13.08.2014 | ||
ES | 13.08.2014 | ||
FI | 13.08.2014 | ||
HR | 13.08.2014 | ||
IT | 13.08.2014 | ||
LT | 13.08.2014 | ||
LV | 13.08.2014 | ||
NL | 13.08.2014 | ||
RO | 13.08.2014 | ||
SE | 13.08.2014 | ||
SK | 13.08.2014 | ||
BG | 13.11.2014 | ||
NO | 13.11.2014 | ||
GR | 14.11.2014 | ||
IS | 13.12.2014 | ||
PT | 15.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | AT | 13.08.2014 | |
CY | 13.08.2014 | ||
DK | 13.08.2014 | ||
ES | 13.08.2014 | ||
FI | 13.08.2014 | ||
HR | 13.08.2014 | ||
IT | 13.08.2014 | ||
LT | 13.08.2014 | ||
LV | 13.08.2014 | ||
NL | 13.08.2014 | ||
RO | 13.08.2014 | ||
SE | 13.08.2014 | ||
BG | 13.11.2014 | ||
NO | 13.11.2014 | ||
GR | 14.11.2014 | ||
IS | 13.12.2014 | ||
PT | 15.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/16] | AT | 13.08.2014 | |
CY | 13.08.2014 | ||
ES | 13.08.2014 | ||
FI | 13.08.2014 | ||
HR | 13.08.2014 | ||
LT | 13.08.2014 | ||
LV | 13.08.2014 | ||
NL | 13.08.2014 | ||
SE | 13.08.2014 | ||
BG | 13.11.2014 | ||
NO | 13.11.2014 | ||
GR | 14.11.2014 | ||
IS | 13.12.2014 | ||
PT | 15.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | AT | 13.08.2014 | |
CY | 13.08.2014 | ||
ES | 13.08.2014 | ||
FI | 13.08.2014 | ||
HR | 13.08.2014 | ||
LT | 13.08.2014 | ||
LV | 13.08.2014 | ||
SE | 13.08.2014 | ||
BG | 13.11.2014 | ||
NO | 13.11.2014 | ||
GR | 14.11.2014 | ||
IS | 13.12.2014 | ||
PT | 15.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 13.08.2014 | |
ES | 13.08.2014 | ||
FI | 13.08.2014 | ||
LT | 13.08.2014 | ||
SE | 13.08.2014 | ||
BG | 13.11.2014 | ||
NO | 13.11.2014 | ||
GR | 14.11.2014 | ||
PT | 15.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | ES | 13.08.2014 | |
FI | 13.08.2014 | ||
LT | 13.08.2014 | ||
SE | 13.08.2014 | ||
BG | 13.11.2014 | ||
NO | 13.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | FI | 13.08.2014 | |
LT | 13.08.2014 | ||
SE | 13.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | LT | 13.08.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2001039126 (EBINUMA RYUICHI [JP], et al) [A] 1 * abstract * * paragraphs [0056] , [0057] *; | [A]JP2004184882 (TAIHEIYO CEMENT CORP) [A] 1-7 * abstract * * paragraphs [0011] , [0014] *; | [ID]JP2007238430 (NAT INST OF ADV IND & TECHNOL, et al) [ID] 1-7 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] , [0006] - [0010] - [0017] , [0024] , [0026] *; | [A]US2008218721 (SCHOEPPACH ARMIN [DE], et al) [A] 1 * abstract ** paragraph [0084] * | by applicant | JPH11343168 | JP2002220277 | JP2006019894 | JP2006350187 | JP2007238430 |