EP2392775 - Blade for use in a fluid flow of a turbine engine and turbine engine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.11.2012 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.12.2012 [2012/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/49] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Batt, Stephen Cherry Tree House Moor Lane Lincoln, LN4 2DZ / GB | 02 /
Pacey, Andy St Wilfrids Close, 1 Lincoln, LN4 3HU / GB | [2011/49] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2011/49] | Application number, filing date | 10165110.7 | 07.06.2010 | [2011/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2392775 | Date: | 07.12.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.10.2010 | Classification | IPC: | F01D5/18, F01D9/04 | [2011/49] | CPC: |
F01D5/181 (EP,US);
F01D5/041 (US);
F01D9/041 (US);
F01D9/042 (EP,US);
F05D2300/603 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/49] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Rotationsschaufel zur Verwendung in einem Fluidstrom einer Turbine und zugehörige Turbine | [2011/49] | English: | Blade for use in a fluid flow of a turbine engine and turbine engine | [2011/49] | French: | Aude mobile à utiliser dans un écoulement de fluide d'une turbine et turbine correspondant | [2011/49] | Examination procedure | 09.06.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/52] | 23.07.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2012/52] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2012 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IY]US2974926 (THOMPSON JR WILLIAM F) [I] 1,4,7-9,13,14 * figures 1,2 * * column 2, lines 6-9 * * column 2, lines 47-53 * * column 2, lines 54-57 * [Y] 2,3,5,6,10-12; | [Y]EP0892149 (ABB RESEARCH LTD [CH]) [Y] 3 * figures 1,2 * * column 2, line 31 - line 34 * * column 3, line 45 - line 49 *; | [Y]US2007140835 (ALBRECHT HARRY A [US], et al) [Y] 11* abstract *; | [Y]US2009047136 (CHON YOUNG H [US], et al) [Y] 2,5,6,10,12 * page 2, paragraph 0015 * * figure 2 * | by applicant | US5484258 | US5660524 |