EP2395341 - Method for determining the current sorption capacity of a moulded part drying agent [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.06.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM INTERNATIONAL GMBH Binger Str. 173 55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE | [2011/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Balthes, Eduard Binger Strasse 173 55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE | 02 /
Braun, Mathias Binger Strasse 173 55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE | [2011/50] | Representative(s) | Simon, Elke Anna Maria, et al Boehringer Ingelheim GmbH Binger Strasse 173 55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE | [2012/40] |
Former [2011/50] | Hammann, Heinz, et al Boehringer Ingelheim GmbH CD Patents Binger Strasse 173 55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE | Application number, filing date | 10165123.0 | 07.06.2010 | [2011/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2395341 | Date: | 14.12.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2395341 | Date: | 14.08.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.07.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G01N15/00 | [2011/50] | CPC: |
G01N5/025 (EP);
B01J20/103 (EP);
B01J20/12 (EP);
B01J20/18 (EP);
B01J20/26 (EP);
B01J20/28011 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/50] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur bestimmung der Aktuellen sorptionskapazität eines Formkörpertrockenmittels | [2011/50] | English: | Method for determining the current sorption capacity of a moulded part drying agent | [2011/50] | French: | Procédé de détermination de la capacité de sorption actuelle d'un moyen de séchage d'un corps de formage | [2011/50] | Examination procedure | 14.06.2012 | Examination requested [2012/31] | 25.07.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 25.09.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.01.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.05.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 07.05.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.01.2013 | Opposition(s) | 15.05.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/30] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 25.09.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 25.09.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 29.10.2012 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.06.2010 | AL | 14.08.2013 | BG | 14.08.2013 | CY | 14.08.2013 | CZ | 14.08.2013 | DK | 14.08.2013 | EE | 14.08.2013 | ES | 14.08.2013 | FI | 14.08.2013 | HR | 14.08.2013 | IT | 14.08.2013 | LT | 14.08.2013 | LV | 14.08.2013 | MC | 14.08.2013 | MK | 14.08.2013 | MT | 14.08.2013 | NL | 14.08.2013 | PL | 14.08.2013 | RO | 14.08.2013 | SE | 14.08.2013 | SI | 14.08.2013 | SK | 14.08.2013 | SM | 14.08.2013 | TR | 14.08.2013 | NO | 14.11.2013 | GR | 15.11.2013 | IS | 14.12.2013 | PT | 16.12.2013 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/30] | HU | 07.06.2010 | |
BG | 14.08.2013 | ||
CY | 14.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 14.08.2013 | ||
DK | 14.08.2013 | ||
EE | 14.08.2013 | ||
ES | 14.08.2013 | ||
FI | 14.08.2013 | ||
HR | 14.08.2013 | ||
IT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LV | 14.08.2013 | ||
MC | 14.08.2013 | ||
MK | 14.08.2013 | ||
MT | 14.08.2013 | ||
NL | 14.08.2013 | ||
PL | 14.08.2013 | ||
RO | 14.08.2013 | ||
SE | 14.08.2013 | ||
SI | 14.08.2013 | ||
SK | 14.08.2013 | ||
SM | 14.08.2013 | ||
TR | 14.08.2013 | ||
NO | 14.11.2013 | ||
GR | 15.11.2013 | ||
IS | 14.12.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2016/33] | HU | 07.06.2010 | |
BG | 14.08.2013 | ||
CY | 14.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 14.08.2013 | ||
DK | 14.08.2013 | ||
EE | 14.08.2013 | ||
ES | 14.08.2013 | ||
FI | 14.08.2013 | ||
HR | 14.08.2013 | ||
IT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LV | 14.08.2013 | ||
MC | 14.08.2013 | ||
MT | 14.08.2013 | ||
NL | 14.08.2013 | ||
PL | 14.08.2013 | ||
RO | 14.08.2013 | ||
SE | 14.08.2013 | ||
SI | 14.08.2013 | ||
SK | 14.08.2013 | ||
SM | 14.08.2013 | ||
TR | 14.08.2013 | ||
NO | 14.11.2013 | ||
GR | 15.11.2013 | ||
IS | 14.12.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 07.06.2010 | |
BG | 14.08.2013 | ||
CY | 14.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 14.08.2013 | ||
DK | 14.08.2013 | ||
EE | 14.08.2013 | ||
ES | 14.08.2013 | ||
FI | 14.08.2013 | ||
HR | 14.08.2013 | ||
IT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LV | 14.08.2013 | ||
MC | 14.08.2013 | ||
MT | 14.08.2013 | ||
NL | 14.08.2013 | ||
PL | 14.08.2013 | ||
RO | 14.08.2013 | ||
SE | 14.08.2013 | ||
SI | 14.08.2013 | ||
SK | 14.08.2013 | ||
SM | 14.08.2013 | ||
NO | 14.11.2013 | ||
GR | 15.11.2013 | ||
IS | 14.12.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2016/28] | BG | 14.08.2013 | |
CY | 14.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 14.08.2013 | ||
DK | 14.08.2013 | ||
EE | 14.08.2013 | ||
ES | 14.08.2013 | ||
FI | 14.08.2013 | ||
HR | 14.08.2013 | ||
IT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LV | 14.08.2013 | ||
MC | 14.08.2013 | ||
MT | 14.08.2013 | ||
NL | 14.08.2013 | ||
PL | 14.08.2013 | ||
RO | 14.08.2013 | ||
SE | 14.08.2013 | ||
SI | 14.08.2013 | ||
SK | 14.08.2013 | ||
SM | 14.08.2013 | ||
NO | 14.11.2013 | ||
GR | 15.11.2013 | ||
IS | 14.12.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CY | 14.08.2013 | |
CZ | 14.08.2013 | ||
DK | 14.08.2013 | ||
EE | 14.08.2013 | ||
ES | 14.08.2013 | ||
FI | 14.08.2013 | ||
HR | 14.08.2013 | ||
IT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LV | 14.08.2013 | ||
MC | 14.08.2013 | ||
MT | 14.08.2013 | ||
NL | 14.08.2013 | ||
PL | 14.08.2013 | ||
RO | 14.08.2013 | ||
SE | 14.08.2013 | ||
SI | 14.08.2013 | ||
SK | 14.08.2013 | ||
SM | 14.08.2013 | ||
NO | 14.11.2013 | ||
GR | 15.11.2013 | ||
IS | 14.12.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2016/16] | CY | 14.08.2013 | |
CZ | 14.08.2013 | ||
DK | 14.08.2013 | ||
EE | 14.08.2013 | ||
ES | 14.08.2013 | ||
FI | 14.08.2013 | ||
HR | 14.08.2013 | ||
IT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LV | 14.08.2013 | ||
MC | 14.08.2013 | ||
MT | 14.08.2013 | ||
NL | 14.08.2013 | ||
PL | 14.08.2013 | ||
RO | 14.08.2013 | ||
SE | 14.08.2013 | ||
SI | 14.08.2013 | ||
SK | 14.08.2013 | ||
NO | 14.11.2013 | ||
GR | 15.11.2013 | ||
IS | 14.12.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2015/09] | CY | 14.08.2013 | |
CZ | 14.08.2013 | ||
DK | 14.08.2013 | ||
EE | 14.08.2013 | ||
ES | 14.08.2013 | ||
FI | 14.08.2013 | ||
HR | 14.08.2013 | ||
IT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LV | 14.08.2013 | ||
MC | 14.08.2013 | ||
NL | 14.08.2013 | ||
PL | 14.08.2013 | ||
RO | 14.08.2013 | ||
SE | 14.08.2013 | ||
SI | 14.08.2013 | ||
SK | 14.08.2013 | ||
NO | 14.11.2013 | ||
GR | 15.11.2013 | ||
IS | 14.12.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/24] | CY | 14.08.2013 | |
CZ | 14.08.2013 | ||
DK | 14.08.2013 | ||
EE | 14.08.2013 | ||
ES | 14.08.2013 | ||
FI | 14.08.2013 | ||
HR | 14.08.2013 | ||
IT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LV | 14.08.2013 | ||
NL | 14.08.2013 | ||
PL | 14.08.2013 | ||
RO | 14.08.2013 | ||
SE | 14.08.2013 | ||
SI | 14.08.2013 | ||
SK | 14.08.2013 | ||
NO | 14.11.2013 | ||
GR | 15.11.2013 | ||
IS | 14.12.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/23] | CY | 14.08.2013 | |
CZ | 14.08.2013 | ||
DK | 14.08.2013 | ||
EE | 14.08.2013 | ||
FI | 14.08.2013 | ||
HR | 14.08.2013 | ||
LT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LV | 14.08.2013 | ||
NL | 14.08.2013 | ||
PL | 14.08.2013 | ||
RO | 14.08.2013 | ||
SE | 14.08.2013 | ||
SI | 14.08.2013 | ||
SK | 14.08.2013 | ||
NO | 14.11.2013 | ||
GR | 15.11.2013 | ||
IS | 14.12.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/22] | CY | 14.08.2013 | |
DK | 14.08.2013 | ||
FI | 14.08.2013 | ||
HR | 14.08.2013 | ||
LT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LV | 14.08.2013 | ||
NL | 14.08.2013 | ||
PL | 14.08.2013 | ||
RO | 14.08.2013 | ||
SE | 14.08.2013 | ||
SI | 14.08.2013 | ||
NO | 14.11.2013 | ||
GR | 15.11.2013 | ||
IS | 14.12.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | CY | 14.08.2013 | |
DK | 14.08.2013 | ||
FI | 14.08.2013 | ||
HR | 14.08.2013 | ||
LT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LV | 14.08.2013 | ||
PL | 14.08.2013 | ||
SE | 14.08.2013 | ||
SI | 14.08.2013 | ||
NO | 14.11.2013 | ||
GR | 15.11.2013 | ||
IS | 14.12.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | CY | 14.08.2013 | |
FI | 14.08.2013 | ||
HR | 14.08.2013 | ||
LT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LV | 14.08.2013 | ||
PL | 14.08.2013 | ||
SE | 14.08.2013 | ||
SI | 14.08.2013 | ||
NO | 14.11.2013 | ||
GR | 15.11.2013 | ||
IS | 14.12.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | CY | 31.07.2013 | |
FI | 14.08.2013 | ||
HR | 14.08.2013 | ||
LT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LV | 14.08.2013 | ||
PL | 14.08.2013 | ||
SE | 14.08.2013 | ||
SI | 14.08.2013 | ||
NO | 14.11.2013 | ||
GR | 15.11.2013 | ||
IS | 14.12.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | CY | 31.07.2013 | |
FI | 14.08.2013 | ||
HR | 14.08.2013 | ||
LT | 14.08.2013 | ||
PL | 14.08.2013 | ||
SE | 14.08.2013 | ||
NO | 14.11.2013 | ||
IS | 14.12.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | CY | 31.07.2013 | |
HR | 14.08.2013 | ||
LT | 14.08.2013 | ||
SE | 14.08.2013 | ||
NO | 14.11.2013 | ||
IS | 14.12.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | HR | 14.08.2013 | |
LT | 14.08.2013 | ||
SE | 14.08.2013 | ||
NO | 14.11.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | LT | 14.08.2013 | |
NO | 14.11.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | NO | 14.11.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0560504 (ROHM & HAAS [US]) [A] 1-5 * page 8, line 25 - page 8, line 33; figure 4 *; | [A]EP0940148 (NIPPON CATALYTIC CHEM IND [JP]) [A] 1-5 * claims 1-5 *; | [A]SU1038836 (NII STR FIZ GOSSTROYA SSSR [SU]) [A] 1-5 * the whole document * |