EP2253615 - Cyclopropyl amide derivatives [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.05.2015 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU, TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AstraZeneca AB 151 85 Södertälje / SE | [2014/28] |
Former [2010/47] | For all designated states AstraZeneca AB 151 85 Södertälje / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Arnold, James 96 Toledo Way, Apartment 305 San Francisco, CA 94123 / US | 02 /
Edwards, Phil 1921 Marlboro Road Kenneth Square, PA 19348 / US | 03 /
Griffin, Andrew AstraZeneca R&D Montreal 7171 Frederick-Banting Ville St. Laurent Montreal Québec H4S 1Z9 / CA | 04 /
Groblewski, Thierry AstraZeneca R&D Montreal 7171 Frédérick-Banting St Laurent Québec H4S 1Z9 / CA | 05 /
Labrecque, Denis AstraZeneca R&D Montreal 7171 Frederick-Banting St. Laurent Québec H4S 1Z9 / CA | 06 /
Throner, Scott AstraZeneca R&D Wilmington P.O. Box 15437 1800 Concord Pike Wilmington, DE 19850-5437 / US | 07 /
Wesolowski, Steven AstraZeneca Wilmington P.O. Box 15437 1800 Concord Pike Wilmington, DE 19850-5437 / US | 08 /
Brugel, Todd Andrew 1800 Concord Pike P.O. Box 15437 Wilmington, DE 19850-5437 / US | 09 /
Brown, Dean AstraZeneca R&D Boston 35 Gatehouse Drive Waltham, Massachusetts 02451 / US | [2014/28] |
Former [2011/16] | 01 /
Arnold, James 96 Toledo Way, Apartment 305 San Francisco, CA 94123 / US | ||
02 /
Edwards, Phil 1921 Marlboro Road Kenneth Square, PA 19348 / US | |||
03 /
Griffin, Andrew AstraZeneca R&D Montreal 7171 Frederick-Banting Ville St. Laurent Montreal Québec H4S 1Z9 / CA | |||
04 /
Groblewski, Thierry AstraZeneca R&D Montreal 7171 Frédérick-Banting St Laurent Québec H4S 1Z9 / CA | |||
05 /
Labrecque, Denis AstraZeneca R&D Montreal 7171 Frederick-Banting St. Laurent Québec H4S 1Z9 / CA | |||
06 /
Throner, Scott AstraZeneca R&D Wilmington P.O. Box 15437 1800 Concord Pike Wilmington, DE 19850-5437 / US | |||
07 /
Wesolowski, Steven AstraZeneca Wilmington P.O. Box 15437 1800 Concord Pike Wilmington, DE 19850-5437 / US | |||
08 /
Brugel, Todd Andrew 1800 Concord Pike P.O. Box 15437 Wilmington, DE 19850-5437 / US | |||
09 /
Brown, Dean AstraZeneca R&D Boston 35 Gatehouse Drive Waltham, Massachusetts 02451 / US | |||
Former [2010/50] | 01 /
Arnold, James 96 Toledo Way, Apartment 305 San Francisco, CA 94123 / US | ||
02 /
Edwards, Phil c/o AstraZeneca Intellectual Property AstraZeneca R&D Wilmington 1800 Concord Pike PO Box 15437 Wilmington, DE 19850-5437 / US | |||
03 /
Griffin, Andrew AstraZeneca R&D Montreal 7171 Frederick-Banting Ville St. Laurent Montreal Québec H4S 1Z9 / CA | |||
04 /
Groblewski, Thierry AstraZeneca R&D Montreal 7171 Frédérick-Banting St Laurent Québec H4S 1Z9 / CA | |||
05 /
Labrecque, Denis AstraZeneca R&D Montreal 7171 Frederick-Banting St. Laurent Québec H4S 1Z9 / CA | |||
06 /
Throner, Scott AstraZeneca R&D Wilmington P.O. Box 15437 1800 Concord Pike Wilmington, DE 19850-5437 / US | |||
07 /
Wesolowski, Steven AstraZeneca Wilmington P.O. Box 15437 1800 Concord Pike Wilmington, DE 19850-5437 / US | |||
08 /
Brugel, Todd Andrew 1800 Concord Pike P.O. Box 15437 Wilmington, DE 19850-5437 / US | |||
Former [2010/47] | 01 /
Arnold, James 96 Toledo Way, Apartment 305 San Francisco, CA 94123 / US | ||
02 /
Edwards, Philip c/o AstraZenca Intellectual Property AstraZeneca R&D Wilmington 1800 Concord Pike PO Box 15437 Wilmington, DE 19850-5437 / US | |||
03 /
Griffin, Andrew AstraZeneca R&D Montreal 7171 Frederick-Banting Ville St. Laurent Montreal Québec H4S 1Z9 / CA | |||
04 /
Groblewski, Thierry AstraZeneca R&D Montreal 7171 Frédérick-Banting St Laurent Québec H4S 1Z9 / CA | |||
05 /
Labrecque, Denis AstraZeneca R&D Montreal 7171 Frederick-Banting St. Laurent Québec H4S 1Z9 / CA | |||
06 /
Throner, Scott AstraZeneca R&D Wilmington P.O. Box 15437 1800 Concord Pike Wilmington, DE 19850-5437 / US | |||
07 /
Wesolowski, Steven AstraZeneca Wilmington P.O. Box 15437 1800 Concord Pike Wilmington, DE 19850-5437 / US | |||
08 /
Brugel, Todd Andrew 1800 Concord Pike P.O. Box 15437 Wilmington, DE 19850-5437 / US | Representative(s) | Curran, Clair, et al Ropes & Gray International LLP 5 New Street Square London EC4A 3BF / GB | [2013/46] | Application number, filing date | 10165133.9 | 20.08.2008 | [2010/47] | Priority number, date | US20070957181P | 22.08.2007 Original published format: US 957181 P | [2010/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2253615 | Date: | 24.11.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2253615 | Date: | 09.07.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.10.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C07D211/40, C07D207/12, C07D295/18 | [2010/47] | CPC: |
A61K31/496 (EP,US);
A61K31/495 (EP,US);
A61K31/551 (EP,US);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/02 (EP);
A61P25/04 (EP);
A61P25/08 (EP);
A61P25/18 (EP);
A61P25/22 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/04 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07D207/12 (EP,US);
C07D207/27 (EP,US);
C07D211/40 (EP,US);
C07D211/76 (EP,US);
C07D213/56 (EP,US);
C07D231/12 (EP,US);
C07D233/36 (EP,US);
C07D239/26 (EP,US);
C07D243/08 (EP,US);
C07D295/18 (EP,US);
C07D295/182 (EP,US);
C07D295/185 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/47] | Extension states | AL | 24.05.2011 | BA | 24.05.2011 | MK | 24.05.2011 | RS | 24.05.2011 | Title | German: | Cyclopropylamidderivate | [2010/47] | English: | Cyclopropyl amide derivatives | [2010/47] | French: | Derives de cyclopropyl amide | [2010/47] | Examination procedure | 07.06.2010 | Examination requested [2010/47] | 16.11.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.03.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.04.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.10.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.12.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.04.2014 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 17.04.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.05.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 27.05.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.05.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP08788694.1 / EP2195293 | Divisional application(s) | EP14173061.4 / EP2805937 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20080788694) is 04.05.2012 | Opposition(s) | 10.04.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.08.2008 | AT | 09.07.2014 | BE | 09.07.2014 | CY | 09.07.2014 | CZ | 09.07.2014 | DK | 09.07.2014 | EE | 09.07.2014 | ES | 09.07.2014 | FI | 09.07.2014 | HR | 09.07.2014 | IT | 09.07.2014 | LT | 09.07.2014 | LV | 09.07.2014 | MC | 09.07.2014 | MT | 09.07.2014 | NL | 09.07.2014 | PL | 09.07.2014 | RO | 09.07.2014 | SE | 09.07.2014 | SI | 09.07.2014 | SK | 09.07.2014 | TR | 09.07.2014 | IE | 20.08.2014 | LU | 20.08.2014 | CH | 31.08.2014 | LI | 31.08.2014 | FR | 09.09.2014 | BG | 09.10.2014 | GB | 09.10.2014 | NO | 09.10.2014 | GR | 10.10.2014 | IS | 09.11.2014 | PT | 10.11.2014 | DE | 03.03.2015 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 20.08.2008 | |
AT | 09.07.2014 | ||
BE | 09.07.2014 | ||
CY | 09.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 09.07.2014 | ||
DK | 09.07.2014 | ||
EE | 09.07.2014 | ||
ES | 09.07.2014 | ||
FI | 09.07.2014 | ||
HR | 09.07.2014 | ||
IT | 09.07.2014 | ||
LT | 09.07.2014 | ||
LV | 09.07.2014 | ||
MC | 09.07.2014 | ||
MT | 09.07.2014 | ||
NL | 09.07.2014 | ||
PL | 09.07.2014 | ||
RO | 09.07.2014 | ||
SE | 09.07.2014 | ||
SI | 09.07.2014 | ||
SK | 09.07.2014 | ||
IE | 20.08.2014 | ||
CH | 31.08.2014 | ||
LI | 31.08.2014 | ||
FR | 09.09.2014 | ||
BG | 09.10.2014 | ||
GB | 09.10.2014 | ||
NO | 09.10.2014 | ||
GR | 10.10.2014 | ||
IS | 09.11.2014 | ||
PT | 10.11.2014 | ||
DE | 03.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 09.07.2014 | |
CY | 09.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 09.07.2014 | ||
DK | 09.07.2014 | ||
EE | 09.07.2014 | ||
ES | 09.07.2014 | ||
FI | 09.07.2014 | ||
HR | 09.07.2014 | ||
IT | 09.07.2014 | ||
LT | 09.07.2014 | ||
LV | 09.07.2014 | ||
MC | 09.07.2014 | ||
MT | 09.07.2014 | ||
NL | 09.07.2014 | ||
PL | 09.07.2014 | ||
RO | 09.07.2014 | ||
SE | 09.07.2014 | ||
SI | 09.07.2014 | ||
SK | 09.07.2014 | ||
IE | 20.08.2014 | ||
BE | 31.08.2014 | ||
CH | 31.08.2014 | ||
LI | 31.08.2014 | ||
FR | 09.09.2014 | ||
BG | 09.10.2014 | ||
GB | 09.10.2014 | ||
NO | 09.10.2014 | ||
GR | 10.10.2014 | ||
IS | 09.11.2014 | ||
PT | 10.11.2014 | ||
DE | 03.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | AT | 09.07.2014 | |
CY | 09.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 09.07.2014 | ||
DK | 09.07.2014 | ||
EE | 09.07.2014 | ||
ES | 09.07.2014 | ||
FI | 09.07.2014 | ||
HR | 09.07.2014 | ||
IT | 09.07.2014 | ||
LT | 09.07.2014 | ||
LV | 09.07.2014 | ||
MC | 09.07.2014 | ||
NL | 09.07.2014 | ||
PL | 09.07.2014 | ||
RO | 09.07.2014 | ||
SE | 09.07.2014 | ||
SI | 09.07.2014 | ||
SK | 09.07.2014 | ||
IE | 20.08.2014 | ||
BE | 31.08.2014 | ||
CH | 31.08.2014 | ||
LI | 31.08.2014 | ||
FR | 09.09.2014 | ||
BG | 09.10.2014 | ||
GB | 09.10.2014 | ||
NO | 09.10.2014 | ||
GR | 10.10.2014 | ||
IS | 09.11.2014 | ||
PT | 10.11.2014 | ||
DE | 03.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/38] | AT | 09.07.2014 | |
CY | 09.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 09.07.2014 | ||
DK | 09.07.2014 | ||
EE | 09.07.2014 | ||
ES | 09.07.2014 | ||
FI | 09.07.2014 | ||
HR | 09.07.2014 | ||
IT | 09.07.2014 | ||
LT | 09.07.2014 | ||
LV | 09.07.2014 | ||
MC | 09.07.2014 | ||
NL | 09.07.2014 | ||
PL | 09.07.2014 | ||
RO | 09.07.2014 | ||
SE | 09.07.2014 | ||
SK | 09.07.2014 | ||
IE | 20.08.2014 | ||
BE | 31.08.2014 | ||
CH | 31.08.2014 | ||
LI | 31.08.2014 | ||
FR | 09.09.2014 | ||
BG | 09.10.2014 | ||
GB | 09.10.2014 | ||
NO | 09.10.2014 | ||
GR | 10.10.2014 | ||
IS | 09.11.2014 | ||
PT | 10.11.2014 | ||
DE | 03.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 09.07.2014 | |
CY | 09.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 09.07.2014 | ||
DK | 09.07.2014 | ||
EE | 09.07.2014 | ||
ES | 09.07.2014 | ||
FI | 09.07.2014 | ||
HR | 09.07.2014 | ||
IT | 09.07.2014 | ||
LT | 09.07.2014 | ||
LV | 09.07.2014 | ||
MC | 09.07.2014 | ||
NL | 09.07.2014 | ||
PL | 09.07.2014 | ||
RO | 09.07.2014 | ||
SE | 09.07.2014 | ||
SK | 09.07.2014 | ||
IE | 20.08.2014 | ||
BE | 31.08.2014 | ||
CH | 31.08.2014 | ||
LI | 31.08.2014 | ||
BG | 09.10.2014 | ||
GB | 09.10.2014 | ||
NO | 09.10.2014 | ||
GR | 10.10.2014 | ||
IS | 09.11.2014 | ||
PT | 10.11.2014 | ||
DE | 03.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 09.07.2014 | |
CY | 09.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 09.07.2014 | ||
DK | 09.07.2014 | ||
EE | 09.07.2014 | ||
ES | 09.07.2014 | ||
FI | 09.07.2014 | ||
HR | 09.07.2014 | ||
IT | 09.07.2014 | ||
LT | 09.07.2014 | ||
LV | 09.07.2014 | ||
MC | 09.07.2014 | ||
NL | 09.07.2014 | ||
PL | 09.07.2014 | ||
RO | 09.07.2014 | ||
SE | 09.07.2014 | ||
SK | 09.07.2014 | ||
BE | 31.08.2014 | ||
CH | 31.08.2014 | ||
LI | 31.08.2014 | ||
BG | 09.10.2014 | ||
GB | 09.10.2014 | ||
NO | 09.10.2014 | ||
GR | 10.10.2014 | ||
IS | 09.11.2014 | ||
PT | 10.11.2014 | ||
DE | 03.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | AT | 09.07.2014 | |
CY | 09.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 09.07.2014 | ||
DK | 09.07.2014 | ||
EE | 09.07.2014 | ||
ES | 09.07.2014 | ||
FI | 09.07.2014 | ||
HR | 09.07.2014 | ||
IT | 09.07.2014 | ||
LT | 09.07.2014 | ||
LV | 09.07.2014 | ||
MC | 09.07.2014 | ||
NL | 09.07.2014 | ||
PL | 09.07.2014 | ||
RO | 09.07.2014 | ||
SE | 09.07.2014 | ||
SK | 09.07.2014 | ||
BE | 31.08.2014 | ||
CH | 31.08.2014 | ||
LI | 31.08.2014 | ||
BG | 09.10.2014 | ||
NO | 09.10.2014 | ||
GR | 10.10.2014 | ||
IS | 09.11.2014 | ||
PT | 10.11.2014 | ||
DE | 03.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | AT | 09.07.2014 | |
CY | 09.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 09.07.2014 | ||
DK | 09.07.2014 | ||
EE | 09.07.2014 | ||
ES | 09.07.2014 | ||
FI | 09.07.2014 | ||
HR | 09.07.2014 | ||
IT | 09.07.2014 | ||
LT | 09.07.2014 | ||
LV | 09.07.2014 | ||
MC | 09.07.2014 | ||
NL | 09.07.2014 | ||
PL | 09.07.2014 | ||
RO | 09.07.2014 | ||
SE | 09.07.2014 | ||
SK | 09.07.2014 | ||
BE | 31.08.2014 | ||
CH | 31.08.2014 | ||
LI | 31.08.2014 | ||
BG | 09.10.2014 | ||
NO | 09.10.2014 | ||
GR | 10.10.2014 | ||
IS | 09.11.2014 | ||
PT | 10.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | AT | 09.07.2014 | |
CY | 09.07.2014 | ||
DK | 09.07.2014 | ||
ES | 09.07.2014 | ||
FI | 09.07.2014 | ||
HR | 09.07.2014 | ||
IT | 09.07.2014 | ||
LT | 09.07.2014 | ||
LV | 09.07.2014 | ||
MC | 09.07.2014 | ||
NL | 09.07.2014 | ||
PL | 09.07.2014 | ||
RO | 09.07.2014 | ||
SE | 09.07.2014 | ||
BE | 31.08.2014 | ||
CH | 31.08.2014 | ||
LI | 31.08.2014 | ||
BG | 09.10.2014 | ||
NO | 09.10.2014 | ||
GR | 10.10.2014 | ||
IS | 09.11.2014 | ||
PT | 10.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/20] | AT | 09.07.2014 | |
CY | 09.07.2014 | ||
ES | 09.07.2014 | ||
FI | 09.07.2014 | ||
HR | 09.07.2014 | ||
LT | 09.07.2014 | ||
LV | 09.07.2014 | ||
MC | 09.07.2014 | ||
NL | 09.07.2014 | ||
PL | 09.07.2014 | ||
SE | 09.07.2014 | ||
BE | 31.08.2014 | ||
CH | 31.08.2014 | ||
LI | 31.08.2014 | ||
BG | 09.10.2014 | ||
NO | 09.10.2014 | ||
GR | 10.10.2014 | ||
IS | 09.11.2014 | ||
PT | 10.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/19] | AT | 09.07.2014 | |
CY | 09.07.2014 | ||
ES | 09.07.2014 | ||
FI | 09.07.2014 | ||
HR | 09.07.2014 | ||
LT | 09.07.2014 | ||
LV | 09.07.2014 | ||
NL | 09.07.2014 | ||
PL | 09.07.2014 | ||
SE | 09.07.2014 | ||
BE | 31.08.2014 | ||
BG | 09.10.2014 | ||
NO | 09.10.2014 | ||
GR | 10.10.2014 | ||
IS | 09.11.2014 | ||
PT | 10.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | AT | 09.07.2014 | |
CY | 09.07.2014 | ||
ES | 09.07.2014 | ||
FI | 09.07.2014 | ||
HR | 09.07.2014 | ||
LT | 09.07.2014 | ||
LV | 09.07.2014 | ||
NL | 09.07.2014 | ||
PL | 09.07.2014 | ||
SE | 09.07.2014 | ||
BG | 09.10.2014 | ||
NO | 09.10.2014 | ||
GR | 10.10.2014 | ||
IS | 09.11.2014 | ||
PT | 10.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 09.07.2014 | |
ES | 09.07.2014 | ||
FI | 09.07.2014 | ||
LT | 09.07.2014 | ||
PL | 09.07.2014 | ||
SE | 09.07.2014 | ||
BG | 09.10.2014 | ||
NO | 09.10.2014 | ||
GR | 10.10.2014 | ||
PT | 10.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | ES | 09.07.2014 | |
FI | 09.07.2014 | ||
LT | 09.07.2014 | ||
SE | 09.07.2014 | ||
BG | 09.10.2014 | ||
NO | 09.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | FI | 09.07.2014 | |
LT | 09.07.2014 | ||
SE | 09.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | LT | 09.07.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0040572 (NEUROGEN CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * example - *; | [A]US6284761 (ZHANG XIAOYAN [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * example - *; | [A] - KAZUYA YAMAGUCHI ET AL, "Construction of a cis-Cyclopropane via Reductive Radical Decarboxylation. Enantioselective Synthesis of cis- and trans-1-Arylpiperazyl-2-phenylcyclopropanes Designed as Antidopaminergic Agents", JOC, (2003), vol. 68, no. 24, pages 9255 - 9262, XP002512742 [A] 1-13 * example - * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/JO0302206 | [A] - XIAOYAN ZHANG, "trans-1-[(2-Phenylcyclopropyl)methyl]-4-arylpiperazines: mixed dopamine D2/D4 receptor antagonists as potential antipsychotic agents", J.MED.CHEM., (2000), vol. 43, no. 21, pages 3923 - 3932, XP002512743 [A] 1-13 * page 3924 - page 3929; examples 5w,x,y,z; table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/JM990562X | by applicant | - ZARAGOZA, J MED. CHEM., (2004), vol. 47, pages 2833 - 2838 | - GILLASPY, TETRAHEDRON LETT., (1995), vol. 36, no. 41, pages 7399 - 7402 | - LEE, C.; YANG, W.; PARR, R. G., PHYS. REV. B, (1988), vol. 37, page 785 | - HARIHARAN, P.C.; POPLE, J.A., THEOR. CHIM. ACTA, (1973), vol. 28, page 213 |