EP2262023 - Quantum dot solar cells [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.05.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.05.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.06.2016 [2016/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 115 Tabor Road Morris Plains, NJ 07950 / US | [2015/51] |
Former [2010/50] | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 101 Columbia Road Morristown, NJ 07962 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zhao, Linan Room 502, No. 5 Mudan Road 186 201204, Pudong New Area Shanghai / CN | 02 /
Zheng, Zhi 388 S. Wanping Road 4 No. 602 200030, Shanghai / CN | 03 /
Wang, Marilyn 430 LiBing Road Zhang Jiang Hi-Park 201203, Pudong New Area Shangai / CN | 04 /
Liu, Xuanbin 3009 4b Haodu International Garden 1881 Huqingpin Road 201702, Shanghai / CN | 05 /
Tang, Huili Honeywell International Inc, Patent Service m\s-ab\2b P.O. Box 22445 Norristown, NJ 07962-2245 / US | [2010/50] | Representative(s) | Houghton, Mark Phillip, et al Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell, Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/50] | Buckley, Guy Julian Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 10165149.5 | 07.06.2010 | [2010/50] | Priority number, date | US20090484034 | 12.06.2009 Original published format: US 484034 | [2010/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2262023 | Date: | 15.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2262023 | Date: | 14.08.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.07.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H01L51/42 | [2010/50] | CPC: |
H10K30/35 (EP,US);
H10K30/151 (US);
H10K30/50 (EP);
H10K85/113 (EP,US);
Y02E10/549 (EP,US);
Y02P70/50 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/50] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Quanten-Punkt-Solarzellen | [2010/50] | English: | Quantum dot solar cells | [2010/50] | French: | Cellules solaires à points quantiques | [2010/50] | Examination procedure | 07.06.2010 | Examination requested [2010/50] | 26.08.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.12.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.01.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/23] | 29.01.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/23] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.08.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2015 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO03081683 (ALIVISATOS PAUL A [US], et al) [X] 1,2,6,9,10 * page 26, line 16 - page 30, line 17; figures 3,7 *; | [X]WO2007098378 (SOLEXANT CORP [US], et al) [X] 9,10 * paragraph [0049] - paragraph [0081]; figures 10-14 *; | [X] - RINCON M E ET AL, "Thermal treatment effects in the photovoltaic conversion of spray-painted TiO2 coatings sensitized by chemically deposited CdSe thin films", SOLAR ENERGY MATERIALS AND SOLAR CELLS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20011215), vol. 70, no. 2, doi:10.1016/S0927-0248(01)00022-8, ISSN 0927-0248, pages 163 - 173, XP004303751 [X] 1-5 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0927-0248(01)00022-8 | [X] - HUYNH W U ET AL, "CdSe nanocrystal rods/poly(3-hexylthiophene) composite photovoltaic devices", ADVANCED MATERIALS, WILEY VCH VERLAG, DE, (19990101), vol. 11, no. 11, doi:10.1002/(SICI)1521-4095(199908)11:11<923::AID-ADMA923>3.0.CO;2-T, ISSN 0935-9648, pages 923 - 927, XP002965334 [X] 1,2,9,10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/(SICI)1521-4095(199908)11:11<923::AID-ADMA923>3.0.CO;2-T | [X] - WATT A ET AL, "Growing semiconductor nanocrystals directly in a conducting polymer", MATERIALS LETTERS, NORTH HOLLAND PUBLISHING COMPANY. AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 59, no. 24-25, ISSN 0167-577X, (20051001), pages 3033 - 3036, (20051001), XP027745043 [X] 1,6,9 * the whole document * |