EP2263464 - Method for producing an antibacterial PUR foam [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.11.2011 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.11.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.12.2011 [2011/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eurofoam Deutschland GmbH Lichtenkopfer Weg 66450 Bexbach/Saar / DE | [2010/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bettinger, Herbert Eurofoam Deutschland GmbH Lichtenkopfer Weg 66450, Bexbach/Saar / DE | [2010/51] | Representative(s) | Rasch, Michael Rösler - Rasch - van der Heide & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Bodenseestrasse 18 81241 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/08] | Rasch, Michael Rösler Schick Rasch Patentanwälte Bodenseestrasse 18 81241 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/51] | Rasch, Michael Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Lewinsky & Partner GbR Gotthardstrasse 81 80689 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10165411.9 | 09.06.2010 | [2010/51] | Priority number, date | DE20091029948 | 19.06.2009 Original published format: DE102009029948 | [2010/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2263464 | Date: | 22.12.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.09.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A01N59/16, A47C27/00, A61L2/238, A61L15/44, C08J9/00, C08J9/32, C08K3/00, C08K7/14, C08K7/20, C08K7/28, C08K9/02 | [2010/51] | CPC: |
A47C31/004 (EP);
A01N59/16 (EP);
A47C27/14 (EP);
A47C31/007 (EP);
A61L2/235 (EP);
A61L2/238 (EP);
C08J9/0066 (EP);
C08J9/02 (EP);
C08K3/015 (EP);
C08K7/14 (EP);
C08K7/20 (EP);
C08K7/28 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A01N59/16, A01N2300/00 (EP);
A01N59/16, A01N25/10, A01N25/34 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/51] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines antibakteriellen PUR-Schaumstoffes | [2010/51] | English: | Method for producing an antibacterial PUR foam | [2010/51] | French: | Procédé de fabrication d'une matière en mousse PUR antibactérienne | [2010/51] | Examination procedure | 22.06.2011 | Examination requested [2011/31] | 23.06.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/50] | 29.07.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2011/50] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]DE10316156 (BEIERSDORF AG [DE]) [X] 1,5,7,8 * paragraphs [0001] , [0077] , [0078] , [0 85] * * claims 1,9 * [Y] 1-9 [I] 2-4,6,9; | [XYI]US2008306181 (GAREY JR HAROLD ELBRIDGE [US], et al) [X] 1,5,7,8 * paragraphs [0001] , [0022] , [0035] * * claims 1,9,10 * [Y] 1-9 [I] 2-4,6,9; | [Y]DE202008015613U (BRECKLE GERD [DE]) [Y] 1-9 * the whole document * |