EP2226035 - An acetabular cup [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.09.2012 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DePuy Products, Inc. 700 Orthopaedic Drive Warsaw, IN 46581 / US | [2010/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Caylor, Edward J III 14628 Firethorne Path Fort Wayne, IN 46814 / US | [2010/36] | Representative(s) | Belcher, Simon James Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Arena Point Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/46] | Belcher, Simon James Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Tower North Central Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | ||
Former [2010/36] | Belcher, Simon James Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Tower North Central Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | Application number, filing date | 10165631.2 | 27.09.2007 | [2010/36] | Priority number, date | US20060537359 | 29.09.2006 Original published format: US 537359 | [2010/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2226035 | Date: | 08.09.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2226035 | Date: | 16.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.08.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/02, A61F2/34 | [2010/36] | CPC: |
A61F2/3094 (EP,US);
A61B5/076 (EP,US);
A61B5/4528 (EP,US);
A61B5/6846 (EP,US);
A61F2/34 (EP,US);
A61B2560/0219 (EP,US);
A61B5/03 (EP,US);
A61F2/30771 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30153 (EP,US);
A61F2002/302 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30289 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30367 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30403 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30448 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30449 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30589 (EP,US);
A61F2002/3067 (EP,US);
A61F2002/3071 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30822 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30825 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30957 (EP,US);
A61F2002/3241 (EP,US);
A61F2220/0025 (EP,US);
A61F2220/0033 (EP,US);
A61F2220/005 (EP,US);
A61F2230/0019 (EP,US);
A61F2230/0065 (EP,US);
A61F2230/0091 (EP,US);
A61F2250/0002 (EP,US);
A61F2250/0085 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/36] | Title | German: | Hüftgelenkpfanne | [2010/36] | English: | An acetabular cup | [2010/36] | French: | Coupe acétabulaire | [2010/36] | Examination procedure | 11.06.2010 | Examination requested [2010/36] | 23.02.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.08.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.10.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 03.10.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP07253839.0 / EP1905384 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20070253839) is 02.06.2008 | Opposition(s) | 17.08.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.09.2007 | AT | 16.11.2011 | BE | 16.11.2011 | CY | 16.11.2011 | CZ | 16.11.2011 | DK | 16.11.2011 | EE | 16.11.2011 | FI | 16.11.2011 | IT | 16.11.2011 | LT | 16.11.2011 | LV | 16.11.2011 | MT | 16.11.2011 | NL | 16.11.2011 | PL | 16.11.2011 | RO | 16.11.2011 | SE | 16.11.2011 | SI | 16.11.2011 | SK | 16.11.2011 | TR | 16.11.2011 | BG | 16.02.2012 | GR | 17.02.2012 | ES | 27.02.2012 | IS | 16.03.2012 | PT | 16.03.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/21] | AT | 16.11.2011 | |
BE | 16.11.2011 | ||
CY | 16.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2011 | ||
DK | 16.11.2011 | ||
EE | 16.11.2011 | ||
FI | 16.11.2011 | ||
IT | 16.11.2011 | ||
LT | 16.11.2011 | ||
LV | 16.11.2011 | ||
MT | 16.11.2011 | ||
NL | 16.11.2011 | ||
PL | 16.11.2011 | ||
RO | 16.11.2011 | ||
SE | 16.11.2011 | ||
SI | 16.11.2011 | ||
SK | 16.11.2011 | ||
TR | 16.11.2011 | ||
BG | 16.02.2012 | ||
GR | 17.02.2012 | ||
ES | 27.02.2012 | ||
IS | 16.03.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/51] | AT | 16.11.2011 | |
BE | 16.11.2011 | ||
CY | 16.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2011 | ||
DK | 16.11.2011 | ||
EE | 16.11.2011 | ||
FI | 16.11.2011 | ||
IT | 16.11.2011 | ||
LT | 16.11.2011 | ||
LV | 16.11.2011 | ||
MT | 16.11.2011 | ||
NL | 16.11.2011 | ||
PL | 16.11.2011 | ||
RO | 16.11.2011 | ||
SE | 16.11.2011 | ||
SI | 16.11.2011 | ||
SK | 16.11.2011 | ||
BG | 16.02.2012 | ||
GR | 17.02.2012 | ||
ES | 27.02.2012 | ||
IS | 16.03.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 16.11.2011 | |
BE | 16.11.2011 | ||
CY | 16.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2011 | ||
DK | 16.11.2011 | ||
EE | 16.11.2011 | ||
FI | 16.11.2011 | ||
IT | 16.11.2011 | ||
LT | 16.11.2011 | ||
LV | 16.11.2011 | ||
NL | 16.11.2011 | ||
PL | 16.11.2011 | ||
RO | 16.11.2011 | ||
SE | 16.11.2011 | ||
SI | 16.11.2011 | ||
SK | 16.11.2011 | ||
BG | 16.02.2012 | ||
GR | 17.02.2012 | ||
ES | 27.02.2012 | ||
IS | 16.03.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 16.11.2011 | |
BE | 16.11.2011 | ||
CY | 16.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2011 | ||
DK | 16.11.2011 | ||
EE | 16.11.2011 | ||
IT | 16.11.2011 | ||
LT | 16.11.2011 | ||
LV | 16.11.2011 | ||
NL | 16.11.2011 | ||
PL | 16.11.2011 | ||
RO | 16.11.2011 | ||
SE | 16.11.2011 | ||
SI | 16.11.2011 | ||
SK | 16.11.2011 | ||
BG | 16.02.2012 | ||
GR | 17.02.2012 | ||
ES | 27.02.2012 | ||
IS | 16.03.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 16.11.2011 | |
BE | 16.11.2011 | ||
CY | 16.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2011 | ||
DK | 16.11.2011 | ||
EE | 16.11.2011 | ||
IT | 16.11.2011 | ||
LT | 16.11.2011 | ||
LV | 16.11.2011 | ||
NL | 16.11.2011 | ||
PL | 16.11.2011 | ||
RO | 16.11.2011 | ||
SE | 16.11.2011 | ||
SI | 16.11.2011 | ||
SK | 16.11.2011 | ||
BG | 16.02.2012 | ||
GR | 17.02.2012 | ||
IS | 16.03.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | BE | 16.11.2011 | |
CY | 16.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2011 | ||
DK | 16.11.2011 | ||
EE | 16.11.2011 | ||
IT | 16.11.2011 | ||
LT | 16.11.2011 | ||
LV | 16.11.2011 | ||
NL | 16.11.2011 | ||
PL | 16.11.2011 | ||
RO | 16.11.2011 | ||
SE | 16.11.2011 | ||
SI | 16.11.2011 | ||
SK | 16.11.2011 | ||
BG | 16.02.2012 | ||
GR | 17.02.2012 | ||
IS | 16.03.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | BE | 16.11.2011 | |
CY | 16.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2011 | ||
DK | 16.11.2011 | ||
EE | 16.11.2011 | ||
LT | 16.11.2011 | ||
LV | 16.11.2011 | ||
NL | 16.11.2011 | ||
PL | 16.11.2011 | ||
RO | 16.11.2011 | ||
SE | 16.11.2011 | ||
SI | 16.11.2011 | ||
SK | 16.11.2011 | ||
BG | 16.02.2012 | ||
GR | 17.02.2012 | ||
IS | 16.03.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | BE | 16.11.2011 | |
CY | 16.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2011 | ||
DK | 16.11.2011 | ||
EE | 16.11.2011 | ||
LT | 16.11.2011 | ||
LV | 16.11.2011 | ||
NL | 16.11.2011 | ||
PL | 16.11.2011 | ||
SE | 16.11.2011 | ||
SI | 16.11.2011 | ||
BG | 16.02.2012 | ||
GR | 17.02.2012 | ||
IS | 16.03.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | BE | 16.11.2011 | |
CY | 16.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2011 | ||
LT | 16.11.2011 | ||
LV | 16.11.2011 | ||
NL | 16.11.2011 | ||
PL | 16.11.2011 | ||
SE | 16.11.2011 | ||
SI | 16.11.2011 | ||
GR | 17.02.2012 | ||
IS | 16.03.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/28] | BE | 16.11.2011 | |
CY | 16.11.2011 | ||
LT | 16.11.2011 | ||
LV | 16.11.2011 | ||
NL | 16.11.2011 | ||
PL | 16.11.2011 | ||
SE | 16.11.2011 | ||
SI | 16.11.2011 | ||
GR | 17.02.2012 | ||
IS | 16.03.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/26] | BE | 16.11.2011 | |
LT | 16.11.2011 | ||
LV | 16.11.2011 | ||
NL | 16.11.2011 | ||
PL | 16.11.2011 | ||
SE | 16.11.2011 | ||
SI | 16.11.2011 | ||
GR | 17.02.2012 | ||
IS | 16.03.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/25] | BE | 16.11.2011 | |
LT | 16.11.2011 | ||
LV | 16.11.2011 | ||
NL | 16.11.2011 | ||
SE | 16.11.2011 | ||
SI | 16.11.2011 | ||
GR | 17.02.2012 | ||
IS | 16.03.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/24] | LT | 16.11.2011 | |
LV | 16.11.2011 | ||
NL | 16.11.2011 | ||
SE | 16.11.2011 | ||
SI | 16.11.2011 | ||
GR | 17.02.2012 | ||
IS | 16.03.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/23] | LT | 16.11.2011 | |
NL | 16.11.2011 | ||
GR | 17.02.2012 | ||
IS | 16.03.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/21] | LT | 16.11.2011 | |
IS | 16.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/20] | LT | 16.11.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2005039440 (DEPUY PRODUCTS INC [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * page 4, line 11 - page 5, line 3 * * page 12, line 18 - page 13, line 10 * * page 35, line 17 - page 36, line 15 * * page 40, line 9 - line 21; figure 7 *; | [A]WO2005084544 (DEPUY INT LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1-11 * page 16, paragraph 2 * * page 20, paragraph 4 - page 21, paragraph 2 * * page 23, paragraph 4 ** page 27, paragraph 4 - page 28, paragraph 1; figure 9 *; | [A]WO2005087125 (DEPUY INT LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1-11 * page 74, line 21 - page 76, line 24; figures 40a-41d * |