EP2282000 - Running tool that prevents seal test [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.05.2016 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.05.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.06.2016 [2016/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vetco Gray Inc. 4424 West Sam Houston Pkwy North, Suite 100 Houston, TX 77041 / US | [2011/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Neto, Guilherme Pedro Eppinghaus Roberto Garrido de Sousa 271, Mirante de Lagoa Mcaea Rio de Janeiro / BR | 02 /
Kobata, Francisco Rua Apotribu, 150, apto 42A 04302-000, Sao Paulo, SP / BR | 03 /
Gette, Nicholas 45 Versante Court Houston, TX 77070 / US | [2011/06] | Representative(s) | Illingworth-Law, William Illingworth GPO Europe GE International Inc. The Ark 201 Talgarth Road Hammersmith London W6 8BJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/06] | Illingworth-Law, William Illingworth Global Patent Operation - Europe GE International Inc. 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | Application number, filing date | 10165667.6 | 11.06.2010 | [2011/06] | Priority number, date | US20090490874 | 24.06.2009 Original published format: US 490874 | [2011/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2282000 | Date: | 09.02.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/06] | Classification | IPC: | E21B33/04 | [2011/06] | CPC: |
E21B33/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/06] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Einbauwerkzeug, das die Prüfung eines Abdichtglieders unterbinden kann | [2011/06] | English: | Running tool that prevents seal test | [2011/06] | French: | Outil de pose, qui peut êmpecher l'essai de joints d'étanchéité | [2011/06] | Examination procedure | 05.01.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/23] | 28.01.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2015 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |