EP2397125 - Antioxidant composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.11.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.11.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.12.2012 [2012/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Histocell, S.L. ParqueTecnólogico 800, 2° 48160 Derio (Bizkaia) / ES | [2011/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Castro Feo, María Begoña Aldekoane 128 2ºD E-48490, Leioa, (Vizcaya) / ES | 02 /
Azcoitia Ramsden, Iker Sancho de Azpeitia 2, 4ºD E-48014, Bilbao, (Vizcaya) / ES | 03 /
Palomares Casado, Teodoro Beato Tomás de Zumárraga 2, 2ºB E-01008, Vitoria, Alava / ES | 04 /
Herrero de Miguel, Jone Landaluce 18, Bajo E-48600, Sopelana, (Vizcaya) / ES | 05 /
Alonso Varona, Ana Isabel Sarenebarri 1, 1ºB E-48992, Getxo, (Vizcaya) / ES | 06 /
Del Olmo Basterrechea, Maite Gatzarriñe 10, 1ºB E-48600, Sopelana, (Vizcaya) / ES | [2011/51] | Representative(s) | ABG Intellectual Property Law, S.L. Avenida de Burgos, 16D Edificio Euromor 28036 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2011/51] | ABG Patentes, S.L. Avenida de Burgos, 16D Edificio Euromor 28036 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 10165939.9 | 15.06.2010 | [2011/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2397125 | Date: | 21.12.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.11.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/12, A61K31/198, A61K31/736, A61P17/02, A61P17/16, A61K35/12, A61K9/00 | [2011/51] | CPC: |
A61K31/736 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/12 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/198 (EP,KR,US);
A61K35/12 (US);
A61K35/30 (US);
A61K35/32 (US);
A61K35/33 (EP,KR,US);
A61K35/36 (US);
A61K36/483 (EP,KR,US);
A61K36/9066 (EP,US);
A61K8/042 (EP,US);
A61K8/35 (EP,KR,US);
A61K8/44 (KR);
A61K8/447 (EP,US);
A61K8/46 (US);
A61K8/737 (EP,KR,US);
A61K8/981 (US);
A61K9/0014 (US);
A61P17/00 (EP,KR);
A61P17/02 (EP);
A61P17/06 (EP);
A61P17/16 (EP);
A61P17/18 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P31/00 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P31/10 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
A61P37/04 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
A61P39/06 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61Q17/04 (EP,KR,US);
A61Q19/00 (US);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/12, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/198, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/736, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K35/33, A61K2300/00 (EP,US); | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/51] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Antioxidationszusammensetzung | [2011/51] | English: | Antioxidant composition | [2011/51] | French: | Composition antioxydante | [2011/51] | Examination procedure | 22.06.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/51] | 30.07.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2012/51] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2012 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0848951 (JOHNSON & JOHNSON MEDICAL LTD [GB]) [A] 1,4,10-15 * the whole document *; | [Y]US5804213 (ROLF DAVID [US]) [Y] 3-5,10,12,14,15 * column 6, lines 66, 67 - column 7, lines 1-36 * * column 1, line 24 - line 31 *; | [XI]WO2009137827 (TIARA PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US], et al) [X] 1,2,11,13 * pages 18, 19, paragraph 69 * * pages 42, 43; claims 10, 12, 13 * * page 4, paragraph 12 * [I] 6-9; | [Y] - SCHARSTUHL A ET AL, "Curcumin-induced fibroblast apoptosis and in vitro wound contraction are regulated by antioxidants and heme oxygenase: implications for scar formation", JOURNAL OF CELLULAR AND MOLECULAR MEDICINE, (200904), vol. 13, no. 4, ISSN 1582-1838, pages 712 - 725, XP002606793 [Y] 3-5,10,12,14,15 * abstract * * page 718, column right * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/J.1582-4934.2008.00339.X | [A] - MANIKANDAN PANCHATCHARAM ET AL, "Curcumin improves wound healing by modulating collagen and decreasing reactive oxygen species", MOLECULAR AND CELLULAR BIOCHEMISTRY, KLUWER ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS, BO LNKD- DOI:10.1007/S11010-006-9170-2, (20060613), vol. 290, no. 1-2, ISSN 1573-4919, pages 87 - 96, XP019436632 [A] 3,5,10-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s11010-006-9170-2 | by applicant | GB1280631 | EP0781550 | EP0792653 | WO9925395 | WO0149258 | US6406712 | US2004143871 | WO2004112850 | WO2005049101 | WO2005084650 | - MANIKANDAN, P. ET AL., MOLECULAR AND CELLULAR BIOCHEMISTRY, (2006), vol. 290, pages 87 - 96 | - RANI THAAKUR, S. ET AL., PHARMACOLOGYONLINE, (2009), vol. 1, pages 369 - 376 | - GOPINATH, D., BIOMATERIALS, (2004), vol. 25, pages 1911 - 1917 | - EDWARDS ET AL., PLANT PHYSIOLOGY, (2004), vol. 134, pages 1153 - 1162 | - THRALL BD ET AL., "Differential sensitivities of murine melanocytes and melanoma cells to buthionine sulfoximine and anticancer drugs", CELL. RES., (1991), vol. 4, pages 237 - 9 |