Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9477388 | Global Dossier | 25.10.2016 | B2 | US2014298234 | 02.10.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2009148779 | 23.06.2009 | US79321910 | 03.06.2010 | US201414304295 | 13.06.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8786630 | Global Dossier | 22.07.2014 | B2 | US2010321406 | 23.12.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2009148779 | 23.06.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20100138763 | Global Dossier | 31.12.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2009148779 | 23.06.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2011009846 | Global Dossier | 13.01.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2009148779 | 23.06.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101930780B | Global Dossier | 13.03.2013 | B | CN101930780 | 29.12.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2009148779 | 23.06.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2267716 | Global Dossier | 07.03.2018 | B1 | EP2267716 | 30.03.2011 | A3 | EP2267716 | 29.12.2010 | A2 | Priority number | Date | JP2009148779 | 23.06.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TW201112058 | 01.04.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2009148779 | 23.06.2009 |