EP2329939 - Sandwich panel and method for its manufacture [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.01.2014 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Groep Stevens International Wolfsakker 2 9160 Lokeren / BE | [2011/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Verhaeghe, Jan Stuurstraat 113B 9120 Beveren / BE | [2013/12] |
Former [2011/23] | 01 /
Verhaeghe, Jan Stuurstraat 113B 9120 Beveren / BE | Representative(s) | Duyver, Jurgen Martha Herman, et al Gevers Patents Holidaystraat 5 1831 Diegem / BE | [2013/24] |
Former [2011/23] | Luys, Marie-José A.H., et al Gevers Intellectual Property House Holidaystraat 5 1831 Diegem / BE | Application number, filing date | 10166128.8 | 16.06.2010 | [2011/23] | Priority number, date | BE20090000754 | 07.12.2009 Original published format: BE 200900754 | [2011/23] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2329939 | Date: | 08.06.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/23] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2329939 | Date: | 15.06.2011 | [2011/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2329939 | Date: | 20.03.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.05.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B29C70/24, B29C70/08, B29C70/86, F16B5/00 | [2011/23] | CPC: |
B29C70/24 (EP);
B29C70/086 (EP);
B29C70/86 (EP);
B29C70/865 (EP);
B29D99/0021 (EP);
F16B5/0064 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/23] | Title | German: | Sandwichplatte und Verfahren zu deren Herstellung | [2011/23] | English: | Sandwich panel and method for its manufacture | [2011/23] | French: | Panneau sandwich et procédé de fabrication | [2011/23] | Examination procedure | 15.12.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.12.2011 | Examination requested [2012/04] | 31.05.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.11.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 25.01.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 25.01.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 31.05.2012 | Opposition(s) | 02.01.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/09] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 25.01.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 25.01.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 07.02.2013 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.06.2010 | AL | 20.03.2013 | AT | 20.03.2013 | CY | 20.03.2013 | CZ | 20.03.2013 | DK | 20.03.2013 | EE | 20.03.2013 | FI | 20.03.2013 | HR | 20.03.2013 | IT | 20.03.2013 | LT | 20.03.2013 | LV | 20.03.2013 | MC | 20.03.2013 | MK | 20.03.2013 | MT | 20.03.2013 | PL | 20.03.2013 | RO | 20.03.2013 | SE | 20.03.2013 | SI | 20.03.2013 | SK | 20.03.2013 | SM | 20.03.2013 | TR | 20.03.2013 | IE | 16.06.2013 | LU | 16.06.2013 | BG | 20.06.2013 | NO | 20.06.2013 | GR | 21.06.2013 | ES | 01.07.2013 | IS | 20.07.2013 | PT | 22.07.2013 | [2018/46] |
Former [2015/34] | HU | 16.06.2010 | |
AT | 20.03.2013 | ||
CY | 20.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.03.2013 | ||
DK | 20.03.2013 | ||
EE | 20.03.2013 | ||
FI | 20.03.2013 | ||
HR | 20.03.2013 | ||
IT | 20.03.2013 | ||
LT | 20.03.2013 | ||
LV | 20.03.2013 | ||
MC | 20.03.2013 | ||
MK | 20.03.2013 | ||
MT | 20.03.2013 | ||
PL | 20.03.2013 | ||
RO | 20.03.2013 | ||
SE | 20.03.2013 | ||
SI | 20.03.2013 | ||
SK | 20.03.2013 | ||
SM | 20.03.2013 | ||
TR | 20.03.2013 | ||
IE | 16.06.2013 | ||
LU | 16.06.2013 | ||
BG | 20.06.2013 | ||
NO | 20.06.2013 | ||
GR | 21.06.2013 | ||
ES | 01.07.2013 | ||
IS | 20.07.2013 | ||
PT | 22.07.2013 | ||
Former [2015/32] | AT | 20.03.2013 | |
CY | 20.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.03.2013 | ||
DK | 20.03.2013 | ||
EE | 20.03.2013 | ||
FI | 20.03.2013 | ||
HR | 20.03.2013 | ||
IT | 20.03.2013 | ||
LT | 20.03.2013 | ||
LV | 20.03.2013 | ||
MC | 20.03.2013 | ||
MK | 20.03.2013 | ||
MT | 20.03.2013 | ||
PL | 20.03.2013 | ||
RO | 20.03.2013 | ||
SE | 20.03.2013 | ||
SI | 20.03.2013 | ||
SK | 20.03.2013 | ||
SM | 20.03.2013 | ||
TR | 20.03.2013 | ||
IE | 16.06.2013 | ||
BG | 20.06.2013 | ||
NO | 20.06.2013 | ||
GR | 21.06.2013 | ||
ES | 01.07.2013 | ||
IS | 20.07.2013 | ||
PT | 22.07.2013 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 20.03.2013 | |
CY | 20.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.03.2013 | ||
DK | 20.03.2013 | ||
EE | 20.03.2013 | ||
FI | 20.03.2013 | ||
HR | 20.03.2013 | ||
IT | 20.03.2013 | ||
LT | 20.03.2013 | ||
LV | 20.03.2013 | ||
MC | 20.03.2013 | ||
MT | 20.03.2013 | ||
PL | 20.03.2013 | ||
RO | 20.03.2013 | ||
SE | 20.03.2013 | ||
SI | 20.03.2013 | ||
SK | 20.03.2013 | ||
SM | 20.03.2013 | ||
IE | 16.06.2013 | ||
BG | 20.06.2013 | ||
NO | 20.06.2013 | ||
GR | 21.06.2013 | ||
ES | 01.07.2013 | ||
IS | 20.07.2013 | ||
PT | 22.07.2013 | ||
Former [2015/13] | AT | 20.03.2013 | |
CY | 20.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.03.2013 | ||
DK | 20.03.2013 | ||
EE | 20.03.2013 | ||
FI | 20.03.2013 | ||
HR | 20.03.2013 | ||
IT | 20.03.2013 | ||
LT | 20.03.2013 | ||
LV | 20.03.2013 | ||
MC | 20.03.2013 | ||
MT | 20.03.2013 | ||
PL | 20.03.2013 | ||
RO | 20.03.2013 | ||
SE | 20.03.2013 | ||
SI | 20.03.2013 | ||
SK | 20.03.2013 | ||
IE | 16.06.2013 | ||
BG | 20.06.2013 | ||
NO | 20.06.2013 | ||
GR | 21.06.2013 | ||
ES | 01.07.2013 | ||
IS | 20.07.2013 | ||
PT | 22.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | AT | 20.03.2013 | |
CY | 20.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.03.2013 | ||
DK | 20.03.2013 | ||
EE | 20.03.2013 | ||
FI | 20.03.2013 | ||
HR | 20.03.2013 | ||
IT | 20.03.2013 | ||
LT | 20.03.2013 | ||
LV | 20.03.2013 | ||
MC | 20.03.2013 | ||
PL | 20.03.2013 | ||
RO | 20.03.2013 | ||
SE | 20.03.2013 | ||
SI | 20.03.2013 | ||
SK | 20.03.2013 | ||
IE | 16.06.2013 | ||
BG | 20.06.2013 | ||
NO | 20.06.2013 | ||
GR | 21.06.2013 | ||
ES | 01.07.2013 | ||
IS | 20.07.2013 | ||
PT | 22.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | AT | 20.03.2013 | |
CY | 20.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.03.2013 | ||
DK | 20.03.2013 | ||
EE | 20.03.2013 | ||
FI | 20.03.2013 | ||
HR | 20.03.2013 | ||
IT | 20.03.2013 | ||
LT | 20.03.2013 | ||
LV | 20.03.2013 | ||
MC | 20.03.2013 | ||
PL | 20.03.2013 | ||
RO | 20.03.2013 | ||
SE | 20.03.2013 | ||
SI | 20.03.2013 | ||
SK | 20.03.2013 | ||
BG | 20.06.2013 | ||
NO | 20.06.2013 | ||
GR | 21.06.2013 | ||
ES | 01.07.2013 | ||
IS | 20.07.2013 | ||
PT | 22.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 20.03.2013 | |
CY | 20.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.03.2013 | ||
DK | 20.03.2013 | ||
EE | 20.03.2013 | ||
FI | 20.03.2013 | ||
HR | 20.03.2013 | ||
LT | 20.03.2013 | ||
LV | 20.03.2013 | ||
MC | 20.03.2013 | ||
PL | 20.03.2013 | ||
RO | 20.03.2013 | ||
SE | 20.03.2013 | ||
SI | 20.03.2013 | ||
SK | 20.03.2013 | ||
BG | 20.06.2013 | ||
NO | 20.06.2013 | ||
GR | 21.06.2013 | ||
ES | 01.07.2013 | ||
IS | 20.07.2013 | ||
PT | 22.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | AT | 20.03.2013 | |
CY | 20.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.03.2013 | ||
EE | 20.03.2013 | ||
FI | 20.03.2013 | ||
HR | 20.03.2013 | ||
LT | 20.03.2013 | ||
LV | 20.03.2013 | ||
MC | 20.03.2013 | ||
PL | 20.03.2013 | ||
RO | 20.03.2013 | ||
SE | 20.03.2013 | ||
SI | 20.03.2013 | ||
SK | 20.03.2013 | ||
BG | 20.06.2013 | ||
NO | 20.06.2013 | ||
GR | 21.06.2013 | ||
ES | 01.07.2013 | ||
IS | 20.07.2013 | ||
PT | 22.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 20.03.2013 | |
CY | 20.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.03.2013 | ||
EE | 20.03.2013 | ||
FI | 20.03.2013 | ||
HR | 20.03.2013 | ||
LT | 20.03.2013 | ||
LV | 20.03.2013 | ||
PL | 20.03.2013 | ||
RO | 20.03.2013 | ||
SE | 20.03.2013 | ||
SI | 20.03.2013 | ||
SK | 20.03.2013 | ||
BG | 20.06.2013 | ||
NO | 20.06.2013 | ||
GR | 21.06.2013 | ||
ES | 01.07.2013 | ||
IS | 20.07.2013 | ||
PT | 22.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | AT | 20.03.2013 | |
CZ | 20.03.2013 | ||
EE | 20.03.2013 | ||
FI | 20.03.2013 | ||
HR | 20.03.2013 | ||
LT | 20.03.2013 | ||
LV | 20.03.2013 | ||
PL | 20.03.2013 | ||
RO | 20.03.2013 | ||
SE | 20.03.2013 | ||
SI | 20.03.2013 | ||
SK | 20.03.2013 | ||
BG | 20.06.2013 | ||
NO | 20.06.2013 | ||
GR | 21.06.2013 | ||
ES | 01.07.2013 | ||
IS | 20.07.2013 | ||
PT | 22.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 20.03.2013 | |
CZ | 20.03.2013 | ||
EE | 20.03.2013 | ||
FI | 20.03.2013 | ||
HR | 20.03.2013 | ||
LT | 20.03.2013 | ||
LV | 20.03.2013 | ||
RO | 20.03.2013 | ||
SE | 20.03.2013 | ||
SI | 20.03.2013 | ||
SK | 20.03.2013 | ||
BG | 20.06.2013 | ||
NO | 20.06.2013 | ||
GR | 21.06.2013 | ||
ES | 01.07.2013 | ||
IS | 20.07.2013 | ||
PT | 22.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 20.03.2013 | |
EE | 20.03.2013 | ||
FI | 20.03.2013 | ||
HR | 20.03.2013 | ||
LT | 20.03.2013 | ||
LV | 20.03.2013 | ||
SE | 20.03.2013 | ||
SI | 20.03.2013 | ||
BG | 20.06.2013 | ||
NO | 20.06.2013 | ||
GR | 21.06.2013 | ||
ES | 01.07.2013 | ||
IS | 20.07.2013 | ||
PT | 22.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | FI | 20.03.2013 | |
HR | 20.03.2013 | ||
LT | 20.03.2013 | ||
LV | 20.03.2013 | ||
SE | 20.03.2013 | ||
SI | 20.03.2013 | ||
BG | 20.06.2013 | ||
NO | 20.06.2013 | ||
GR | 21.06.2013 | ||
ES | 01.07.2013 | ||
PT | 22.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/41] | FI | 20.03.2013 | |
HR | 20.03.2013 | ||
LT | 20.03.2013 | ||
LV | 20.03.2013 | ||
SE | 20.03.2013 | ||
SI | 20.03.2013 | ||
BG | 20.06.2013 | ||
NO | 20.06.2013 | ||
GR | 21.06.2013 | ||
ES | 01.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/38] | FI | 20.03.2013 | |
LT | 20.03.2013 | ||
LV | 20.03.2013 | ||
SE | 20.03.2013 | ||
SI | 20.03.2013 | ||
BG | 20.06.2013 | ||
NO | 20.06.2013 | ||
GR | 21.06.2013 | ||
ES | 01.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | FI | 20.03.2013 | |
LT | 20.03.2013 | ||
SE | 20.03.2013 | ||
SI | 20.03.2013 | ||
BG | 20.06.2013 | ||
NO | 20.06.2013 | ||
GR | 21.06.2013 | ||
ES | 01.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/36] | LT | 20.03.2013 | |
SE | 20.03.2013 | ||
BG | 20.06.2013 | ||
NO | 20.06.2013 | ||
ES | 01.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | LT | 20.03.2013 | |
SE | 20.03.2013 | ||
BG | 20.06.2013 | ||
NO | 20.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/33] | LT | 20.03.2013 | |
NO | 20.06.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US6187411 (PALMER RAYMOND J [US]) [X] 1-7,9-16 * column 6, line 28 - line 30; figure 4a *; | [A]WO03011577 (EBERT COMPOSITES CORP [US]) [A] 1-18 * figure -; claim - * | by applicant | WO03097335 | US3647606 | US5741574 |