EP2228153 - Manufacturing method for a multi-channel copper tube, and manufacturing apparatus for the tube [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.12.2012 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CTA Technology (Proprietary) Limited 36 Hospital Street Cleveland Johannesburg Gauteng 2094 / ZA | For all designated states Mitsubishi Materials Corporation 5-1, Otemachi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8117 / JP | [2010/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Machet, David 17 Linksfield Drive, 35 Linksfield Heights Linksfield Johannesburg / ZA | 02 /
Da Cruz, Antonio, Rodrigues 26 Bradford Estate 7 Bradford Road, Bedfordview Johannesburg / ZA | 03 /
Ziserman, Vladimir, Shoilovich Stand 772 Unit Number 141 Montecello Country, Estate Summerset Extention 20 Midrand, Johannesburg / ZA | 04 /
Takagi, Kenichi 1975-2, Shimoishitokami, Kitamoto-shi Saitama 364-0022 Saitama 364-0022 / JP | [2012/06] |
Former [2010/41] | 01 /
Machet, David 17 Linksfield Drive, 35 Linksfield Heights Linksfield Johannesburg / ZA | ||
02 /
Da Cruz, Antonio, Rodrigues 26 Bradford Estate 7 Bradford Road, Bedfordview Johannesburg / ZA | |||
03 /
Ziserman, Vladimir, Shoilovich Stand 772 Unit Number 141 Montecello Country, Estate Summerset Extention 20 Midrand, Johannesburg / ZA | |||
04 /
Takagi, Kenichi 1975-2, Shimoishitokami, Kitamoto-shi Saitama 364-0022 Saitama 364-0022 / JP | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/06] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastraße 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/37] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10166135.3 | 14.12.2007 | [2010/37] | Priority number, date | ZA20060010521 | 14.12.2006 Original published format: ZA 200610521 | [2010/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2228153 | Date: | 15.09.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2228153 | Date: | 15.12.2010 | [2010/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2228153 | Date: | 08.02.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.11.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B22D11/00, B22D11/04, B22D11/045, B22D11/055, B22D11/12, F28F1/02, F28F21/08 | [2010/37] | CPC: |
B21C1/24 (EP,US);
B22D11/00 (KR);
B22C9/08 (US);
B21C1/16 (KR);
B21C37/151 (EP,US);
B22D11/004 (EP,US);
B22D11/006 (EP,US);
B22D11/04 (KR);
B22D11/0406 (EP,US);
B22D11/045 (EP,US);
B22D11/055 (EP,KR,US);
B22D11/1206 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/37] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Mehrkanal Kupfer Rohres und Vorrichtung zur Herstellung des Rohres | [2010/51] | English: | Manufacturing method for a multi-channel copper tube, and manufacturing apparatus for the tube | [2010/37] | French: | Procédé de fabrication d'un tube en cuivre multicanal et appareil de fabrication associé | [2010/51] |
Former [2010/37] | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Mehrkanalkupferrohres und Vorrichtung zur Herstellung des Rohres | ||
Former [2010/37] | Procédé de fabrication d'un tube en cuivre multicanal et appareil de fabrication associé | Examination procedure | 10.06.2011 | Examination requested [2011/30] | 15.06.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.08.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.12.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 21.12.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP07859915.6 / EP2125269 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20070859915) is 30.11.2009 | Opposition(s) | 09.11.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.12.2007 | AT | 08.02.2012 | BE | 08.02.2012 | CY | 08.02.2012 | CZ | 08.02.2012 | DK | 08.02.2012 | EE | 08.02.2012 | LT | 08.02.2012 | LV | 08.02.2012 | MT | 08.02.2012 | NL | 08.02.2012 | PL | 08.02.2012 | RO | 08.02.2012 | SE | 08.02.2012 | SI | 08.02.2012 | SK | 08.02.2012 | TR | 08.02.2012 | BG | 08.05.2012 | GR | 09.05.2012 | ES | 19.05.2012 | IS | 08.06.2012 | PT | 08.06.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/21] | AT | 08.02.2012 | |
BE | 08.02.2012 | ||
CY | 08.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 08.02.2012 | ||
DK | 08.02.2012 | ||
EE | 08.02.2012 | ||
LT | 08.02.2012 | ||
LV | 08.02.2012 | ||
MT | 08.02.2012 | ||
NL | 08.02.2012 | ||
PL | 08.02.2012 | ||
RO | 08.02.2012 | ||
SE | 08.02.2012 | ||
SI | 08.02.2012 | ||
SK | 08.02.2012 | ||
TR | 08.02.2012 | ||
BG | 08.05.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
ES | 19.05.2012 | ||
IS | 08.06.2012 | ||
PT | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/51] | AT | 08.02.2012 | |
BE | 08.02.2012 | ||
CY | 08.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 08.02.2012 | ||
DK | 08.02.2012 | ||
EE | 08.02.2012 | ||
LT | 08.02.2012 | ||
LV | 08.02.2012 | ||
MT | 08.02.2012 | ||
NL | 08.02.2012 | ||
PL | 08.02.2012 | ||
RO | 08.02.2012 | ||
SE | 08.02.2012 | ||
SI | 08.02.2012 | ||
SK | 08.02.2012 | ||
BG | 08.05.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
ES | 19.05.2012 | ||
IS | 08.06.2012 | ||
PT | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 08.02.2012 | |
BE | 08.02.2012 | ||
CY | 08.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 08.02.2012 | ||
DK | 08.02.2012 | ||
EE | 08.02.2012 | ||
LT | 08.02.2012 | ||
LV | 08.02.2012 | ||
NL | 08.02.2012 | ||
PL | 08.02.2012 | ||
RO | 08.02.2012 | ||
SE | 08.02.2012 | ||
SI | 08.02.2012 | ||
SK | 08.02.2012 | ||
BG | 08.05.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
ES | 19.05.2012 | ||
IS | 08.06.2012 | ||
PT | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 08.02.2012 | |
BE | 08.02.2012 | ||
CY | 08.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 08.02.2012 | ||
DK | 08.02.2012 | ||
EE | 08.02.2012 | ||
LT | 08.02.2012 | ||
LV | 08.02.2012 | ||
NL | 08.02.2012 | ||
PL | 08.02.2012 | ||
RO | 08.02.2012 | ||
SE | 08.02.2012 | ||
SI | 08.02.2012 | ||
SK | 08.02.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
ES | 19.05.2012 | ||
IS | 08.06.2012 | ||
PT | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 08.02.2012 | |
BE | 08.02.2012 | ||
CY | 08.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 08.02.2012 | ||
DK | 08.02.2012 | ||
EE | 08.02.2012 | ||
LT | 08.02.2012 | ||
LV | 08.02.2012 | ||
NL | 08.02.2012 | ||
PL | 08.02.2012 | ||
RO | 08.02.2012 | ||
SE | 08.02.2012 | ||
SI | 08.02.2012 | ||
SK | 08.02.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
IS | 08.06.2012 | ||
PT | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | BE | 08.02.2012 | |
CY | 08.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 08.02.2012 | ||
DK | 08.02.2012 | ||
EE | 08.02.2012 | ||
LT | 08.02.2012 | ||
LV | 08.02.2012 | ||
NL | 08.02.2012 | ||
PL | 08.02.2012 | ||
RO | 08.02.2012 | ||
SE | 08.02.2012 | ||
SI | 08.02.2012 | ||
SK | 08.02.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
IS | 08.06.2012 | ||
PT | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | BE | 08.02.2012 | |
CY | 08.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 08.02.2012 | ||
DK | 08.02.2012 | ||
EE | 08.02.2012 | ||
LT | 08.02.2012 | ||
LV | 08.02.2012 | ||
NL | 08.02.2012 | ||
PL | 08.02.2012 | ||
RO | 08.02.2012 | ||
SE | 08.02.2012 | ||
SI | 08.02.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
IS | 08.06.2012 | ||
PT | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | BE | 08.02.2012 | |
CY | 08.02.2012 | ||
EE | 08.02.2012 | ||
LT | 08.02.2012 | ||
LV | 08.02.2012 | ||
NL | 08.02.2012 | ||
PL | 08.02.2012 | ||
SE | 08.02.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
IS | 08.06.2012 | ||
PT | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/41] | BE | 08.02.2012 | |
CY | 08.02.2012 | ||
LT | 08.02.2012 | ||
LV | 08.02.2012 | ||
NL | 08.02.2012 | ||
PL | 08.02.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
IS | 08.06.2012 | ||
PT | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/39] | BE | 08.02.2012 | |
LT | 08.02.2012 | ||
LV | 08.02.2012 | ||
NL | 08.02.2012 | ||
PL | 08.02.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
IS | 08.06.2012 | ||
PT | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | BE | 08.02.2012 | |
LT | 08.02.2012 | ||
NL | 08.02.2012 | ||
PL | 08.02.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
IS | 08.06.2012 | ||
PT | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | LT | 08.02.2012 | |
NL | 08.02.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
IS | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | LT | 08.02.2012 | |
NL | 08.02.2012 | ||
IS | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | LT | 08.02.2012 | |
IS | 08.06.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US1841350 (STAPLES HORACE A) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US3347079 (ROWELL DOUGLAS W) [A] 2 * the whole document *; | [A]DE3207267 (KUJBYSEVSKIJ AVIACIONNYJ INST [SU]) [A] 2 * the whole document *; | [Y]JPS59126742 (NIPPON MINING CO) [Y] 3* abstract *; | [X]DE3626235 (BUELTMANN RUDOLF) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [Y]US4935076 (YAMAGUCHI HIROSHI [JP], et al) [Y] 3 * abstract *; | [X]DE19612002 (MANNESMANN AG [DE]) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [Y]JP2003268467 (KOBE STEEL LTD) [Y] 3 * abstract * * the whole document *; | [YA]JP2005164221 (HIDAKA SEIKI KK) [Y] 3 * the whole document * [A] 2 |