EP2267721 - Data storage medium accessing method, data storage device and recording medium to perform the data storage medium accessing method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 03.03.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.03.2017 | Refusal of application | published on 05.04.2017 [2017/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do, 443-742 / KR | [2012/39] |
Former [2010/52] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416 Maetan-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ryu, In-sik 117-102, Hosan Village, 419-13 Woncheon-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 02 /
Park, Moon-chol 403-1406, Cheongmyeong Maeul 4-danji Apt. Yeongtong-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 03 /
Na, Se-wook 305-2401, Dongsuwon LG Village 3-cha Apt. Mangpo-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 04 /
Lee, Jae-sung 604-1602, Poonglim Apt. Yeongtong-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2010/52] | Representative(s) | Miller Sturt Kenyon 9 John Street London WC1N 2ES / GB | [2013/50] |
Former [2010/52] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10166478.7 | 18.06.2010 | [2010/52] | Priority number, date | KR20090055980 | 23.06.2009 Original published format: KR 20090055980 | [2010/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2267721 | Date: | 29.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.10.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G11B27/32, G06F3/06, G06F12/02, G06F12/10, G06F12/12, G11B5/55, G11B21/08 | [2010/52] | CPC: |
G11B27/32 (EP,US);
G11B20/10 (KR);
G06F12/1009 (EP,US);
G06F3/0611 (EP,US);
G06F3/0659 (EP,US);
G06F3/0676 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/52] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Zugangsverfahren für ein Datenspeicherungsmedium, Datenspeicherungsvorrichtung und Aufzeichnungsmedium zur Durchführung des Zugangsverfahrens für ein Datenspeicherungsmedium | [2010/52] | English: | Data storage medium accessing method, data storage device and recording medium to perform the data storage medium accessing method | [2010/52] | French: | Procédé d'accès à un support de stockage de données, dispositif de stockage de données et support d'enregistrement pour réaliser le procédé d'accès à un support de stockage de données | [2010/52] | Examination procedure | 22.06.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.06.2011 | Examination requested [2011/31] | 31.07.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.02.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.11.2016 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 16.03.2017 | 18.11.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2017/14] | 28.11.2016 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2017/14] | 16.03.2017 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 31.07.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US6128717 (HARRISON JOEL N [US], et al) [X] 1,6-8,10-12,14,15 * the whole document * [A] 2,5; | [A]US2001028524 (HOSKINS EDWARD SEAN [US]) [A] 2-5,9,10,13* figure 3 *; | [X]US2001048567 (CHNG YONG PENG [SG], et al) [X] 1,7,11,12,14,15 * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0069]; figure 7 *; | [XA]US6665772 (HAMLIN CHRISTOPHER L [US]) [X] 1,6,7,11,15 * column 4 - column 11; figures 1,2 * [A] 2-5,8-10,12-14; | [A]WO2006050455 (TRUSTED DATA CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * page 24, line 8 - page 58, line 15 *; | [IA]US2009070547 (JEONG SEONG-HUN [KR], et al) [I] 1,15 * paragraph [0045] - paragraph [0084]; figures 3-8 * [A] 2,5,7 | Examination | US7149046 | WO2009025715 |