EP2237085 - Polymeric optical retardation film with liquid crystal anisotropic material, optical functional film, polarizing film, and display device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2010/40] | Retardation film and method for producing the same, optical functional film, polarizing film, and display device | ||
[2012/28] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.11.2013 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.11.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.12.2013 [2013/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dai Nippon Printing Co., Ltd. 1-1, Ichigaya-kagacho 1-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo-to 162-8001 / JP | [2012/34] |
Former [2010/40] | For all designated states Dai Nippon Printing Co., Ltd. 1-1, Ichigaya-kaga-cho 1-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 162-8001 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shirai, Kenji c/o DAI NIPPON PRINTING CO., LTD. 1-1 Ichigaya-kagacho 1-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 162-8001 / JP | 02 /
Kashima, Keiji c/o DAI NIPPON PRINTING CO., LTD. 1-1 Ichigaya-kagacho 1-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 162-8001 / JP | 03 /
Kuroda, Takashi c/o DAI NIPPON PRINTING CO., LTD. 1-1 Ichigaya-kagacho 1-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 162-8001 / JP | 04 /
Haritani, Takeshi c/o DAI NIPPON PRINTING CO., LTD. 1-1 Ichigaya-kagacho 1-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 162-8001 / JP | [2012/29] |
Former [2010/40] | 01 /
Shirai, Kenji c/o DAI NIPPON PRINTING CO., LTD. 1-1 Ichigaya-kagacho 1-chome, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo-to 162-8001 / JP | ||
02 /
Kashima, Keiji c/o DAI NIPPON PRINTING CO., LTD. 1-1 Ichigaya-kagacho 1-chome, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo-to 162-8001 / JP | |||
03 /
Kuroda, Takashi c/o DAI NIPPON PRINTING CO., LTD. 1-1 Ichigaya-kagacho 1-chome, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo-to 162-8001 / JP | |||
04 /
Haritani, Takeshi c/o DAI NIPPON PRINTING CO., LTD. 1-1 Ichigaya-kagacho 1-chome, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo-to 162-8001 / JP | Representative(s) | Selden, Deborah Anne Beck Greener Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/01] | Selden, Deborah Anne Beck Greener Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | ||
Former [2010/40] | Selden, Deborah Anne Beck Greener Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | Application number, filing date | 10166717.8 | 09.09.2005 | [2010/40] | Priority number, date | JP20040264763 | 10.09.2004 Original published format: JP 2004264763 | JP20040350800 | 03.12.2004 Original published format: JP 2004350800 | JP20050005612 | 12.01.2005 Original published format: JP 2005005612 | [2010/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2237085 | Date: | 06.10.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2237085 | Date: | 20.04.2011 | [2011/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2237085 | Date: | 02.01.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.03.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G02B5/30 | [2010/40] | CPC: |
G02B5/3083 (EP);
G02B5/30 (KR);
G02B1/08 (KR);
G02B5/3016 (EP);
G02F1/13363 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE [2010/40] | Title | German: | Optische polymerische Verzögerungsfolie mit anisotropischem Flüssigkristallmaterial, optischer Funktionsfilm, Polarisationsfilm und Anzeigevorrichtung | [2012/28] | English: | Polymeric optical retardation film with liquid crystal anisotropic material, optical functional film, polarizing film, and display device | [2012/28] | French: | Film polymérique de retard optique avec du matériau anisotropique de cristaux liquides, film fonctionnel optique, film de polarisation et appareil d'affichage | [2012/28] |
Former [2010/40] | Verzögerungsfolie und Verfahren zu deren Herstellung, optische funktionelle Folie, Polarisationsfolie und Anzeigevorrichtung | ||
Former [2010/40] | Retardation film and method for producing the same, optical functional film, polarizing film, and display device | ||
Former [2010/40] | Film à retardement et son procédé de production, film fonctionnel optique, film de polarisation et dispositif d'affichage | Examination procedure | 10.10.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.10.2011 | Examination requested [2011/46] | 02.08.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.11.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 20.11.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP05782351.0 / EP1793246 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20050782351) is 22.10.2009 | Opposition(s) | 03.10.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]JP2004050516 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0012] - [0019] - [0022] - [0052] * [I] 2-19; | [XI]JP2003043250 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0033] - [0037] - [0044] , [0047] * [I] 2-19; | [XP]WO2004097470 (NITTO DENKO CORP [JP], et al) [XP] 1,2 * paragraphs [0007] , [0016] , [0057] , [0080] *; | [E]US2006182896 (MURAKAMI NAO [JP], et al) [E] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [A]JP2000190385 (NIPPON MITSUBISHI OIL CORP) [A] 1-19 * abstract *; | [A]US2002145691 (ITO YOJI [JP]) [A] 1-19 * claim 1 * | by applicant | JPH0367219 | JPH04322223 | JPH10312166 | JP2003207644 | JP2000111914 | JP2001249223 | DE19504224 | - J. CHEN ET AL., SID98 DIGEST, (1998), page 315 | - T. ISHINABE ET AL., SIDOO DIGEST, (2000), page 1094 | - MAKROMOL CHEM., (1989), vol. 190, pages 3201 - 3215 | - D. J. BROER ET AL., MAKROMOL CHEM., (1989), vol. 190, page 2250 |