12.10.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] |
17.07.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] |
03.07.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.08.2015 [2015/32] |
08.05.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.06.2015 [2015/24] |
20.02.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.03.2015 [2015/13] |
11.04.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.05.2014 [2014/20] |
17.01.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.02.2014 [2014/08] |
13.12.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.01.2014 [2014/03] |
29.11.2013 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 01.01.2014 [2014/01] |
22.11.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.12.2013 [2013/52] |
08.11.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.12.2013 [2013/50] |
01.11.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.12.2013 [2013/49] |
25.10.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.11.2013 [2013/48] |
06.09.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.10.2013 [2013/41] |
30.08.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.10.2013 [2013/40] |
16.08.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.09.2013 [2013/38] |
09.08.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.09.2013 [2013/37] |
02.08.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.09.2013 [2013/36] |
26.07.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.08.2013 [2013/35] |
19.07.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.08.2013 [2013/34] |
12.07.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.08.2013 [2013/33] |
21.12.2012 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 23.01.2013 [2013/04] |
10.12.2012 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
10.12.2012 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
05.09.2012 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
08.04.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
24.05.2011 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
08.03.2011 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
26.11.2010 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 29.12.2010 [2010/52] |
26.11.2010 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 29.12.2010 [2010/52] |