EP2275718 - Automatic transmission [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.01.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JATCO Ltd 700-1, Imaizumi Fuji-shi Shizuoka 417-8585 / JP | [2011/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Watanabe, Hidehiko c/o JATCO Ltd 700-1, Imaizumi Fuji-shi Shizuoka 417-8585 / JP | 02 /
Higakubo, Noboru c/o Jatco Ltd. 700-1, Imaizumi Fuji-shi Shizuoka 417-8585 / JP | 03 /
Sakaguchi, Masataka c/o Jatco Ltd. 700-1, Imaizumi Fuji-shi Shizuoka 417-8585 / JP | [2013/11] |
Former [2011/03] | 01 /
Watanabe, Hidehiko c/o JATCO Ltd 700-1, Imaizumi Fuji-shi Shizuoka 417-8585 / JP | ||
02 /
Higakubo, Noboru c/o Jatco Ltd. 700-1, Imaizumi Fuji-shi Shizuoka 417-8585 / JP | |||
03 /
Sakaguchi, Masataka c/o Jatco Ltd. 700-1, Imaizumi Fuji-shi Shizuoka 417-8585 / JP | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/11] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/03] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10167107.1 | 24.06.2010 | [2011/03] | Priority number, date | JP20090166442 | 15.07.2009 Original published format: JP 2009166442 | [2011/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2275718 | Date: | 19.01.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2275718 | Date: | 07.12.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2275718 | Date: | 13.03.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.11.2011 | Classification | IPC: | F16H63/34 | [2011/49] | CPC: |
F16H63/3416 (EP,KR,US);
B60T1/06 (KR);
F16H57/02 (KR);
F16H57/023 (KR);
F16H57/03 (KR);
Y10T74/2186 (US)
|
Former IPC [2011/03] | F16H63/48 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/03] | Title | German: | Automatikgetriebe | [2011/03] | English: | Automatic transmission | [2011/03] | French: | Transmission automatique | [2011/03] | Examination procedure | 12.04.2012 | Examination requested [2012/22] | 18.04.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.09.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.01.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 17.01.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.09.2012 | Opposition(s) | 16.12.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.06.2010 | AL | 13.03.2013 | AT | 13.03.2013 | BE | 13.03.2013 | CY | 13.03.2013 | CZ | 13.03.2013 | DK | 13.03.2013 | EE | 13.03.2013 | FI | 13.03.2013 | HR | 13.03.2013 | LT | 13.03.2013 | LV | 13.03.2013 | MC | 13.03.2013 | MK | 13.03.2013 | MT | 13.03.2013 | NL | 13.03.2013 | PL | 13.03.2013 | RO | 13.03.2013 | SE | 13.03.2013 | SI | 13.03.2013 | SK | 13.03.2013 | SM | 13.03.2013 | TR | 13.03.2013 | BG | 13.06.2013 | NO | 13.06.2013 | GR | 14.06.2013 | ES | 24.06.2013 | IE | 24.06.2013 | LU | 24.06.2013 | IS | 13.07.2013 | PT | 15.07.2013 | [2018/46] |
Former [2015/34] | HU | 24.06.2010 | |
AT | 13.03.2013 | ||
BE | 13.03.2013 | ||
CY | 13.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.03.2013 | ||
DK | 13.03.2013 | ||
EE | 13.03.2013 | ||
FI | 13.03.2013 | ||
HR | 13.03.2013 | ||
LT | 13.03.2013 | ||
LV | 13.03.2013 | ||
MC | 13.03.2013 | ||
MK | 13.03.2013 | ||
MT | 13.03.2013 | ||
NL | 13.03.2013 | ||
PL | 13.03.2013 | ||
RO | 13.03.2013 | ||
SE | 13.03.2013 | ||
SI | 13.03.2013 | ||
SK | 13.03.2013 | ||
SM | 13.03.2013 | ||
TR | 13.03.2013 | ||
BG | 13.06.2013 | ||
NO | 13.06.2013 | ||
GR | 14.06.2013 | ||
ES | 24.06.2013 | ||
IE | 24.06.2013 | ||
LU | 24.06.2013 | ||
IS | 13.07.2013 | ||
PT | 15.07.2013 | ||
Former [2015/32] | AT | 13.03.2013 | |
BE | 13.03.2013 | ||
CY | 13.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.03.2013 | ||
DK | 13.03.2013 | ||
EE | 13.03.2013 | ||
FI | 13.03.2013 | ||
HR | 13.03.2013 | ||
LT | 13.03.2013 | ||
LV | 13.03.2013 | ||
MC | 13.03.2013 | ||
MK | 13.03.2013 | ||
MT | 13.03.2013 | ||
NL | 13.03.2013 | ||
PL | 13.03.2013 | ||
RO | 13.03.2013 | ||
SE | 13.03.2013 | ||
SI | 13.03.2013 | ||
SK | 13.03.2013 | ||
SM | 13.03.2013 | ||
TR | 13.03.2013 | ||
BG | 13.06.2013 | ||
NO | 13.06.2013 | ||
GR | 14.06.2013 | ||
ES | 24.06.2013 | ||
IE | 24.06.2013 | ||
IS | 13.07.2013 | ||
PT | 15.07.2013 | ||
Former [2015/30] | AT | 13.03.2013 | |
BE | 13.03.2013 | ||
CY | 13.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.03.2013 | ||
DK | 13.03.2013 | ||
EE | 13.03.2013 | ||
FI | 13.03.2013 | ||
HR | 13.03.2013 | ||
LT | 13.03.2013 | ||
LV | 13.03.2013 | ||
MC | 13.03.2013 | ||
MT | 13.03.2013 | ||
NL | 13.03.2013 | ||
PL | 13.03.2013 | ||
RO | 13.03.2013 | ||
SE | 13.03.2013 | ||
SI | 13.03.2013 | ||
SK | 13.03.2013 | ||
SM | 13.03.2013 | ||
BG | 13.06.2013 | ||
NO | 13.06.2013 | ||
GR | 14.06.2013 | ||
ES | 24.06.2013 | ||
IE | 24.06.2013 | ||
IS | 13.07.2013 | ||
PT | 15.07.2013 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 13.03.2013 | |
BE | 13.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.03.2013 | ||
DK | 13.03.2013 | ||
EE | 13.03.2013 | ||
FI | 13.03.2013 | ||
HR | 13.03.2013 | ||
LT | 13.03.2013 | ||
LV | 13.03.2013 | ||
MC | 13.03.2013 | ||
MT | 13.03.2013 | ||
NL | 13.03.2013 | ||
PL | 13.03.2013 | ||
RO | 13.03.2013 | ||
SE | 13.03.2013 | ||
SI | 13.03.2013 | ||
SK | 13.03.2013 | ||
SM | 13.03.2013 | ||
BG | 13.06.2013 | ||
NO | 13.06.2013 | ||
GR | 14.06.2013 | ||
ES | 24.06.2013 | ||
IE | 24.06.2013 | ||
IS | 13.07.2013 | ||
PT | 15.07.2013 | ||
Former [2015/13] | AT | 13.03.2013 | |
BE | 13.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.03.2013 | ||
DK | 13.03.2013 | ||
EE | 13.03.2013 | ||
FI | 13.03.2013 | ||
HR | 13.03.2013 | ||
LT | 13.03.2013 | ||
LV | 13.03.2013 | ||
MC | 13.03.2013 | ||
MT | 13.03.2013 | ||
NL | 13.03.2013 | ||
PL | 13.03.2013 | ||
RO | 13.03.2013 | ||
SE | 13.03.2013 | ||
SI | 13.03.2013 | ||
SK | 13.03.2013 | ||
BG | 13.06.2013 | ||
NO | 13.06.2013 | ||
GR | 14.06.2013 | ||
ES | 24.06.2013 | ||
IE | 24.06.2013 | ||
IS | 13.07.2013 | ||
PT | 15.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | AT | 13.03.2013 | |
BE | 13.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.03.2013 | ||
DK | 13.03.2013 | ||
EE | 13.03.2013 | ||
FI | 13.03.2013 | ||
HR | 13.03.2013 | ||
LT | 13.03.2013 | ||
LV | 13.03.2013 | ||
MC | 13.03.2013 | ||
NL | 13.03.2013 | ||
PL | 13.03.2013 | ||
RO | 13.03.2013 | ||
SE | 13.03.2013 | ||
SI | 13.03.2013 | ||
SK | 13.03.2013 | ||
BG | 13.06.2013 | ||
NO | 13.06.2013 | ||
GR | 14.06.2013 | ||
ES | 24.06.2013 | ||
IE | 24.06.2013 | ||
IS | 13.07.2013 | ||
PT | 15.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 13.03.2013 | |
BE | 13.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.03.2013 | ||
DK | 13.03.2013 | ||
EE | 13.03.2013 | ||
FI | 13.03.2013 | ||
HR | 13.03.2013 | ||
LT | 13.03.2013 | ||
LV | 13.03.2013 | ||
MC | 13.03.2013 | ||
NL | 13.03.2013 | ||
PL | 13.03.2013 | ||
RO | 13.03.2013 | ||
SE | 13.03.2013 | ||
SI | 13.03.2013 | ||
SK | 13.03.2013 | ||
BG | 13.06.2013 | ||
NO | 13.06.2013 | ||
GR | 14.06.2013 | ||
ES | 24.06.2013 | ||
IS | 13.07.2013 | ||
PT | 15.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | AT | 13.03.2013 | |
BE | 13.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.03.2013 | ||
EE | 13.03.2013 | ||
FI | 13.03.2013 | ||
HR | 13.03.2013 | ||
LT | 13.03.2013 | ||
LV | 13.03.2013 | ||
MC | 13.03.2013 | ||
NL | 13.03.2013 | ||
PL | 13.03.2013 | ||
RO | 13.03.2013 | ||
SE | 13.03.2013 | ||
SI | 13.03.2013 | ||
SK | 13.03.2013 | ||
BG | 13.06.2013 | ||
NO | 13.06.2013 | ||
GR | 14.06.2013 | ||
ES | 24.06.2013 | ||
IS | 13.07.2013 | ||
PT | 15.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | AT | 13.03.2013 | |
BE | 13.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.03.2013 | ||
EE | 13.03.2013 | ||
FI | 13.03.2013 | ||
HR | 13.03.2013 | ||
LT | 13.03.2013 | ||
LV | 13.03.2013 | ||
NL | 13.03.2013 | ||
PL | 13.03.2013 | ||
RO | 13.03.2013 | ||
SE | 13.03.2013 | ||
SI | 13.03.2013 | ||
SK | 13.03.2013 | ||
BG | 13.06.2013 | ||
NO | 13.06.2013 | ||
GR | 14.06.2013 | ||
ES | 24.06.2013 | ||
IS | 13.07.2013 | ||
PT | 15.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 13.03.2013 | |
BE | 13.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.03.2013 | ||
EE | 13.03.2013 | ||
FI | 13.03.2013 | ||
HR | 13.03.2013 | ||
LT | 13.03.2013 | ||
LV | 13.03.2013 | ||
NL | 13.03.2013 | ||
RO | 13.03.2013 | ||
SE | 13.03.2013 | ||
SI | 13.03.2013 | ||
SK | 13.03.2013 | ||
BG | 13.06.2013 | ||
NO | 13.06.2013 | ||
GR | 14.06.2013 | ||
ES | 24.06.2013 | ||
IS | 13.07.2013 | ||
PT | 15.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 13.03.2013 | |
BE | 13.03.2013 | ||
EE | 13.03.2013 | ||
FI | 13.03.2013 | ||
HR | 13.03.2013 | ||
LT | 13.03.2013 | ||
LV | 13.03.2013 | ||
NL | 13.03.2013 | ||
SE | 13.03.2013 | ||
SI | 13.03.2013 | ||
BG | 13.06.2013 | ||
NO | 13.06.2013 | ||
GR | 14.06.2013 | ||
ES | 24.06.2013 | ||
IS | 13.07.2013 | ||
PT | 15.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | BE | 13.03.2013 | |
FI | 13.03.2013 | ||
HR | 13.03.2013 | ||
LT | 13.03.2013 | ||
LV | 13.03.2013 | ||
SE | 13.03.2013 | ||
SI | 13.03.2013 | ||
BG | 13.06.2013 | ||
NO | 13.06.2013 | ||
GR | 14.06.2013 | ||
ES | 24.06.2013 | ||
PT | 15.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/44] | BE | 13.03.2013 | |
FI | 13.03.2013 | ||
HR | 13.03.2013 | ||
LT | 13.03.2013 | ||
LV | 13.03.2013 | ||
SE | 13.03.2013 | ||
SI | 13.03.2013 | ||
BG | 13.06.2013 | ||
NO | 13.06.2013 | ||
GR | 14.06.2013 | ||
ES | 24.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/41] | FI | 13.03.2013 | |
HR | 13.03.2013 | ||
LT | 13.03.2013 | ||
LV | 13.03.2013 | ||
SE | 13.03.2013 | ||
SI | 13.03.2013 | ||
BG | 13.06.2013 | ||
NO | 13.06.2013 | ||
GR | 14.06.2013 | ||
ES | 24.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/38] | FI | 13.03.2013 | |
LT | 13.03.2013 | ||
LV | 13.03.2013 | ||
SE | 13.03.2013 | ||
SI | 13.03.2013 | ||
BG | 13.06.2013 | ||
NO | 13.06.2013 | ||
GR | 14.06.2013 | ||
ES | 24.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | FI | 13.03.2013 | |
LT | 13.03.2013 | ||
SE | 13.03.2013 | ||
SI | 13.03.2013 | ||
BG | 13.06.2013 | ||
NO | 13.06.2013 | ||
GR | 14.06.2013 | ||
ES | 24.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/36] | LT | 13.03.2013 | |
SE | 13.03.2013 | ||
BG | 13.06.2013 | ||
NO | 13.06.2013 | ||
ES | 24.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | LT | 13.03.2013 | |
SE | 13.03.2013 | ||
BG | 13.06.2013 | ||
NO | 13.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/33] | LT | 13.03.2013 | |
NO | 13.06.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP2003276580 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [X] 1,3 * abstract *; | [X]JP2003276581 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [X] 1,3 * abstract * * paragraph [0024] *; | [I]JPH03200458 (NISSAN MOTOR) [I] 1,3 * figure 3 *; | [A]JP2005119603 (FUJI HEAVY IND LTD) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]JPS6121851 (AISIN WARNER, et al) [A] 1 * figure - *; | [A]US3912050 (IWANAGA KAZUYOSHI, et al) [A] 1 * column 1, line 35 - line 40; figure - *; | [A]US4606242 (HASEGAWA HIROMI [JP], et al) [A] 1 * figure 4 *; | [A]US3601230 (PLATZ EDWARD F) [A] 1 * figure - *; | [A]US4727967 (OGASAWARA TSUNEHIKO [JP], et al) [A] 1 * figure - * | by applicant | JP2007205383 |