EP2289976 - Silicone polyether copolymers and method for their manufacture [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.10.2013 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Evonik Degussa GmbH Rellinghauser Straße 1-11 45128 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/41] | For all designated states Evonik Degussa GmbH Rellinghauser Strasse 1-11 45128 Essen / DE | ||
Former [2011/09] | For all designated states Evonik Goldschmidt GmbH Goldschmidtstrasse 100 45127 Essen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Henning, Frauke Julienstraße 79 45130, Essen / DE | 02 /
Schubert, Frank Wiesfurthstraße 2a 47506, Neukirchen-Vluyn / DE | 03 /
Knott, Wilfried Rechtstr. 9-11 45355, Essen / DE | 04 /
Dudzik, Horst Palmbuschweg 108 45326, Essen / DE | [2012/48] |
Former [2011/09] | 01 /
Henning, Frauke Julienstraße 79 45130, Essen / DE | ||
02 /
Schubert, Frank Wiesfurthstraße 2a 47506, Neukirchen-Vluyn / DE | |||
03 /
Knott, Wilfried Rechtstr. 9-11 45355, Essen / DE | |||
04 /
Dudzik, Horst Palmbuschweg 108 45326, Essen / DE | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2012/48] | Application number, filing date | 10167143.6 | 24.06.2010 | [2011/09] | Priority number, date | DE20091034607 | 24.07.2009 Original published format: DE102009034607 | [2011/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2289976 | Date: | 02.03.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2289976 | Date: | 27.04.2011 | [2011/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2289976 | Date: | 28.11.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.03.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C08G77/46, C08G77/48, C08L83/12 | [2011/09] | CPC: |
C08G77/46 (EP,US);
C08G77/18 (US);
C08G77/445 (US);
C08G77/48 (EP,US);
C08L83/12 (EP,US);
C08G77/80 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/09] | Title | German: | Siliconpolyethercopolymere und Verfahren zu deren Herstellung | [2011/09] | English: | Silicone polyether copolymers and method for their manufacture | [2011/09] | French: | Copolymères de silicone polyéther et leur procédé de fabrication | [2011/09] | Examination procedure | 24.06.2010 | Examination requested [2011/09] | 22.07.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.08.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.08.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.09.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 07.11.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.01.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.05.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.05.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 06.07.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.08.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.10.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 16.10.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP12192920.2 / EP2559722 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.08.2011 | Opposition(s) | 29.08.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.06.2010 | AL | 28.11.2012 | CY | 28.11.2012 | CZ | 28.11.2012 | DK | 28.11.2012 | EE | 28.11.2012 | FI | 28.11.2012 | HR | 28.11.2012 | IS | 28.11.2012 | LT | 28.11.2012 | LV | 28.11.2012 | MC | 28.11.2012 | MK | 28.11.2012 | MT | 28.11.2012 | PL | 28.11.2012 | RO | 28.11.2012 | SE | 28.11.2012 | SI | 28.11.2012 | SK | 28.11.2012 | SM | 28.11.2012 | TR | 28.11.2012 | BG | 28.02.2013 | NO | 28.02.2013 | GR | 01.03.2013 | PT | 28.03.2013 | IE | 24.06.2013 | LU | 24.06.2013 | [2018/46] |
Former [2016/31] | HU | 24.06.2010 | |
CY | 28.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 28.11.2012 | ||
DK | 28.11.2012 | ||
EE | 28.11.2012 | ||
FI | 28.11.2012 | ||
HR | 28.11.2012 | ||
IS | 28.11.2012 | ||
LT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LV | 28.11.2012 | ||
MC | 28.11.2012 | ||
MK | 28.11.2012 | ||
MT | 28.11.2012 | ||
PL | 28.11.2012 | ||
RO | 28.11.2012 | ||
SE | 28.11.2012 | ||
SI | 28.11.2012 | ||
SK | 28.11.2012 | ||
SM | 28.11.2012 | ||
TR | 28.11.2012 | ||
BG | 28.02.2013 | ||
NO | 28.02.2013 | ||
GR | 01.03.2013 | ||
PT | 28.03.2013 | ||
IE | 24.06.2013 | ||
LU | 24.06.2013 | ||
Former [2015/34] | HU | 24.06.2010 | |
CY | 28.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 28.11.2012 | ||
DK | 28.11.2012 | ||
EE | 28.11.2012 | ||
FI | 28.11.2012 | ||
HR | 28.11.2012 | ||
LT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LV | 28.11.2012 | ||
MC | 28.11.2012 | ||
MK | 28.11.2012 | ||
MT | 28.11.2012 | ||
PL | 28.11.2012 | ||
RO | 28.11.2012 | ||
SE | 28.11.2012 | ||
SI | 28.11.2012 | ||
SK | 28.11.2012 | ||
SM | 28.11.2012 | ||
TR | 28.11.2012 | ||
BG | 28.02.2013 | ||
NO | 28.02.2013 | ||
GR | 01.03.2013 | ||
PT | 28.03.2013 | ||
IE | 24.06.2013 | ||
LU | 24.06.2013 | ||
Former [2015/32] | CY | 28.11.2012 | |
CZ | 28.11.2012 | ||
DK | 28.11.2012 | ||
EE | 28.11.2012 | ||
FI | 28.11.2012 | ||
HR | 28.11.2012 | ||
LT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LV | 28.11.2012 | ||
MC | 28.11.2012 | ||
MK | 28.11.2012 | ||
MT | 28.11.2012 | ||
PL | 28.11.2012 | ||
RO | 28.11.2012 | ||
SE | 28.11.2012 | ||
SI | 28.11.2012 | ||
SK | 28.11.2012 | ||
SM | 28.11.2012 | ||
TR | 28.11.2012 | ||
BG | 28.02.2013 | ||
NO | 28.02.2013 | ||
GR | 01.03.2013 | ||
PT | 28.03.2013 | ||
IE | 24.06.2013 | ||
Former [2015/24] | CY | 28.11.2012 | |
CZ | 28.11.2012 | ||
DK | 28.11.2012 | ||
EE | 28.11.2012 | ||
FI | 28.11.2012 | ||
HR | 28.11.2012 | ||
LT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LV | 28.11.2012 | ||
MC | 28.11.2012 | ||
MT | 28.11.2012 | ||
PL | 28.11.2012 | ||
RO | 28.11.2012 | ||
SE | 28.11.2012 | ||
SI | 28.11.2012 | ||
SK | 28.11.2012 | ||
SM | 28.11.2012 | ||
BG | 28.02.2013 | ||
NO | 28.02.2013 | ||
GR | 01.03.2013 | ||
PT | 28.03.2013 | ||
IE | 24.06.2013 | ||
Former [2015/13] | CY | 28.11.2012 | |
CZ | 28.11.2012 | ||
DK | 28.11.2012 | ||
EE | 28.11.2012 | ||
FI | 28.11.2012 | ||
HR | 28.11.2012 | ||
LT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LV | 28.11.2012 | ||
MC | 28.11.2012 | ||
MT | 28.11.2012 | ||
PL | 28.11.2012 | ||
RO | 28.11.2012 | ||
SE | 28.11.2012 | ||
SI | 28.11.2012 | ||
SK | 28.11.2012 | ||
BG | 28.02.2013 | ||
NO | 28.02.2013 | ||
GR | 01.03.2013 | ||
PT | 28.03.2013 | ||
IE | 24.06.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | CY | 28.11.2012 | |
CZ | 28.11.2012 | ||
DK | 28.11.2012 | ||
EE | 28.11.2012 | ||
FI | 28.11.2012 | ||
HR | 28.11.2012 | ||
LT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LV | 28.11.2012 | ||
MC | 28.11.2012 | ||
PL | 28.11.2012 | ||
RO | 28.11.2012 | ||
SE | 28.11.2012 | ||
SI | 28.11.2012 | ||
SK | 28.11.2012 | ||
BG | 28.02.2013 | ||
NO | 28.02.2013 | ||
GR | 01.03.2013 | ||
PT | 28.03.2013 | ||
IE | 24.06.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | CY | 28.11.2012 | |
CZ | 28.11.2012 | ||
DK | 28.11.2012 | ||
EE | 28.11.2012 | ||
FI | 28.11.2012 | ||
HR | 28.11.2012 | ||
LT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LV | 28.11.2012 | ||
MC | 28.11.2012 | ||
PL | 28.11.2012 | ||
RO | 28.11.2012 | ||
SE | 28.11.2012 | ||
SI | 28.11.2012 | ||
SK | 28.11.2012 | ||
BG | 28.02.2013 | ||
NO | 28.02.2013 | ||
GR | 01.03.2013 | ||
PT | 28.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | CY | 28.11.2012 | |
CZ | 28.11.2012 | ||
DK | 28.11.2012 | ||
EE | 28.11.2012 | ||
FI | 28.11.2012 | ||
HR | 28.11.2012 | ||
LT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LV | 28.11.2012 | ||
PL | 28.11.2012 | ||
RO | 28.11.2012 | ||
SE | 28.11.2012 | ||
SI | 28.11.2012 | ||
SK | 28.11.2012 | ||
BG | 28.02.2013 | ||
NO | 28.02.2013 | ||
GR | 01.03.2013 | ||
PT | 28.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/51] | CZ | 28.11.2012 | |
DK | 28.11.2012 | ||
EE | 28.11.2012 | ||
FI | 28.11.2012 | ||
HR | 28.11.2012 | ||
LT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LV | 28.11.2012 | ||
PL | 28.11.2012 | ||
RO | 28.11.2012 | ||
SE | 28.11.2012 | ||
SI | 28.11.2012 | ||
SK | 28.11.2012 | ||
BG | 28.02.2013 | ||
NO | 28.02.2013 | ||
GR | 01.03.2013 | ||
PT | 28.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | CZ | 28.11.2012 | |
DK | 28.11.2012 | ||
EE | 28.11.2012 | ||
FI | 28.11.2012 | ||
LT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LV | 28.11.2012 | ||
PL | 28.11.2012 | ||
RO | 28.11.2012 | ||
SE | 28.11.2012 | ||
SI | 28.11.2012 | ||
SK | 28.11.2012 | ||
HR | 26.12.2012 | ||
BG | 28.02.2013 | ||
NO | 28.02.2013 | ||
GR | 01.03.2013 | ||
PT | 28.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | CZ | 28.11.2012 | |
DK | 28.11.2012 | ||
EE | 28.11.2012 | ||
FI | 28.11.2012 | ||
LT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LV | 28.11.2012 | ||
PL | 28.11.2012 | ||
SE | 28.11.2012 | ||
SI | 28.11.2012 | ||
SK | 28.11.2012 | ||
HR | 26.12.2012 | ||
BG | 28.02.2013 | ||
NO | 28.02.2013 | ||
GR | 01.03.2013 | ||
PT | 28.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | DK | 28.11.2012 | |
FI | 28.11.2012 | ||
LT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LV | 28.11.2012 | ||
PL | 28.11.2012 | ||
SE | 28.11.2012 | ||
SI | 28.11.2012 | ||
HR | 26.12.2012 | ||
BG | 28.02.2013 | ||
NO | 28.02.2013 | ||
GR | 01.03.2013 | ||
PT | 28.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/28] | FI | 28.11.2012 | |
LT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LV | 28.11.2012 | ||
PL | 28.11.2012 | ||
SE | 28.11.2012 | ||
SI | 28.11.2012 | ||
HR | 26.12.2012 | ||
NO | 28.02.2013 | ||
GR | 01.03.2013 | ||
PT | 28.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/26] | FI | 28.11.2012 | |
LT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LV | 28.11.2012 | ||
PL | 28.11.2012 | ||
SE | 28.11.2012 | ||
SI | 28.11.2012 | ||
HR | 26.12.2012 | ||
NO | 28.02.2013 | ||
GR | 01.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/24] | FI | 28.11.2012 | |
LT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LV | 28.11.2012 | ||
PL | 28.11.2012 | ||
SE | 28.11.2012 | ||
HR | 26.12.2012 | ||
NO | 28.02.2013 | ||
GR | 01.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | FI | 28.11.2012 | |
LT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LV | 28.11.2012 | ||
PL | 28.11.2012 | ||
SE | 28.11.2012 | ||
HR | 26.12.2012 | ||
NO | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | FI | 28.11.2012 | |
LT | 28.11.2012 | ||
SE | 28.11.2012 | ||
NO | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/21] | LT | 28.11.2012 | |
SE | 28.11.2012 | ||
NO | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/20] | LT | 28.11.2012 | |
NO | 28.02.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO8903851 (MASSACHUSETTS INST TECHNOLOGY [US]) [I] 1,3,4 * page 9; example 1; claims 1-4 *; | [YD]EP0506086 (UNION CARBIDE CHEM PLASTIC [US]) [YD] 1-10 * abstract * * page 4, line 25 - page 5, line 2; examples II,III; claim -; table 1 *; | [Y]WO2005078036 (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE], et al) [Y] 1-10 * page 9, line 28 - page 10, line 19; example 6; claims 1,5,8,12 *; | [ADP]EP2093244 (EVONIK GOLDSCHMIDT GMBH [DE]) [ADP] 1-10 * example -; claim - *; | [AP]WO2010063531 (EVONIK GOLDSCHMIDT GMBH [DE], et al) [AP] 1-10* example -; claim - * | by applicant | US3627722 | US3632557 | US3971751 | EP0368195 | EP0506086 | WO9634030 | JPH1112473 | JP2005113063 | WO2005100482 | DE60116592T | US7365145 | EP1967550 |