EP2277743 - Focus unit fastening device for projector [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.04.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do, 443-742 / KR | [2012/39] |
Former [2011/04] | For all designated states SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD. 416 Maetan-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Park, Joong-Wan c/o Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416, Maetan-dong Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 442-742 / KR | [2013/22] |
Former [2011/04] | 01 /
Park, Joong-Wan c/o Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416, Maetan-dong, Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 442-742 / KR | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/22] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/04] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10167510.6 | 28.06.2010 | [2011/04] | Priority number, date | KR20090064771 | 16.07.2009 Original published format: KR 20090064771 | [2011/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2277743 | Date: | 26.01.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2277743 | Date: | 29.05.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.08.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B60R11/02, G03B21/14 | [2011/04] | CPC: |
G03B21/142 (EP,US);
G03B3/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/04] | Title | German: | Befestigungsvorrichtung für Fokussierungseinheit eines Projektors | [2011/04] | English: | Focus unit fastening device for projector | [2011/04] | French: | Dispositif de fixation d'unité de mise au point pour projecteur | [2011/04] | Examination procedure | 26.07.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.07.2011 | Examination requested [2011/36] | 28.03.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.07.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.11.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.04.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 09.04.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.03.2012 | Opposition(s) | 03.03.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.06.2010 | AL | 29.05.2013 | AT | 29.05.2013 | BE | 29.05.2013 | CY | 29.05.2013 | CZ | 29.05.2013 | DK | 29.05.2013 | EE | 29.05.2013 | FI | 29.05.2013 | HR | 29.05.2013 | IT | 29.05.2013 | LT | 29.05.2013 | LV | 29.05.2013 | MC | 29.05.2013 | MK | 29.05.2013 | MT | 29.05.2013 | PL | 29.05.2013 | RO | 29.05.2013 | SE | 29.05.2013 | SI | 29.05.2013 | SK | 29.05.2013 | SM | 29.05.2013 | TR | 29.05.2013 | IE | 28.06.2013 | LU | 28.06.2013 | FR | 29.07.2013 | BG | 29.08.2013 | NO | 29.08.2013 | GR | 30.08.2013 | ES | 09.09.2013 | IS | 29.09.2013 | PT | 30.09.2013 | [2018/46] |
Former [2015/34] | HU | 28.06.2010 | |
AT | 29.05.2013 | ||
BE | 29.05.2013 | ||
CY | 29.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 29.05.2013 | ||
DK | 29.05.2013 | ||
EE | 29.05.2013 | ||
FI | 29.05.2013 | ||
HR | 29.05.2013 | ||
IT | 29.05.2013 | ||
LT | 29.05.2013 | ||
LV | 29.05.2013 | ||
MC | 29.05.2013 | ||
MK | 29.05.2013 | ||
MT | 29.05.2013 | ||
PL | 29.05.2013 | ||
RO | 29.05.2013 | ||
SE | 29.05.2013 | ||
SI | 29.05.2013 | ||
SK | 29.05.2013 | ||
SM | 29.05.2013 | ||
TR | 29.05.2013 | ||
IE | 28.06.2013 | ||
LU | 28.06.2013 | ||
FR | 29.07.2013 | ||
BG | 29.08.2013 | ||
NO | 29.08.2013 | ||
GR | 30.08.2013 | ||
ES | 09.09.2013 | ||
IS | 29.09.2013 | ||
PT | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2015/32] | AT | 29.05.2013 | |
BE | 29.05.2013 | ||
CY | 29.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 29.05.2013 | ||
DK | 29.05.2013 | ||
EE | 29.05.2013 | ||
FI | 29.05.2013 | ||
HR | 29.05.2013 | ||
IT | 29.05.2013 | ||
LT | 29.05.2013 | ||
LV | 29.05.2013 | ||
MC | 29.05.2013 | ||
MK | 29.05.2013 | ||
MT | 29.05.2013 | ||
PL | 29.05.2013 | ||
RO | 29.05.2013 | ||
SE | 29.05.2013 | ||
SI | 29.05.2013 | ||
SK | 29.05.2013 | ||
SM | 29.05.2013 | ||
TR | 29.05.2013 | ||
IE | 28.06.2013 | ||
FR | 29.07.2013 | ||
BG | 29.08.2013 | ||
NO | 29.08.2013 | ||
GR | 30.08.2013 | ||
ES | 09.09.2013 | ||
IS | 29.09.2013 | ||
PT | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2015/30] | AT | 29.05.2013 | |
BE | 29.05.2013 | ||
CY | 29.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 29.05.2013 | ||
DK | 29.05.2013 | ||
EE | 29.05.2013 | ||
FI | 29.05.2013 | ||
HR | 29.05.2013 | ||
IT | 29.05.2013 | ||
LT | 29.05.2013 | ||
LV | 29.05.2013 | ||
MC | 29.05.2013 | ||
MT | 29.05.2013 | ||
PL | 29.05.2013 | ||
RO | 29.05.2013 | ||
SE | 29.05.2013 | ||
SI | 29.05.2013 | ||
SK | 29.05.2013 | ||
SM | 29.05.2013 | ||
IE | 28.06.2013 | ||
FR | 29.07.2013 | ||
BG | 29.08.2013 | ||
NO | 29.08.2013 | ||
GR | 30.08.2013 | ||
ES | 09.09.2013 | ||
IS | 29.09.2013 | ||
PT | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 29.05.2013 | |
BE | 29.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 29.05.2013 | ||
DK | 29.05.2013 | ||
EE | 29.05.2013 | ||
FI | 29.05.2013 | ||
HR | 29.05.2013 | ||
IT | 29.05.2013 | ||
LT | 29.05.2013 | ||
LV | 29.05.2013 | ||
MC | 29.05.2013 | ||
MT | 29.05.2013 | ||
PL | 29.05.2013 | ||
RO | 29.05.2013 | ||
SE | 29.05.2013 | ||
SI | 29.05.2013 | ||
SK | 29.05.2013 | ||
SM | 29.05.2013 | ||
IE | 28.06.2013 | ||
FR | 29.07.2013 | ||
BG | 29.08.2013 | ||
NO | 29.08.2013 | ||
GR | 30.08.2013 | ||
ES | 09.09.2013 | ||
IS | 29.09.2013 | ||
PT | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2015/13] | AT | 29.05.2013 | |
BE | 29.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 29.05.2013 | ||
DK | 29.05.2013 | ||
EE | 29.05.2013 | ||
FI | 29.05.2013 | ||
HR | 29.05.2013 | ||
IT | 29.05.2013 | ||
LT | 29.05.2013 | ||
LV | 29.05.2013 | ||
MC | 29.05.2013 | ||
MT | 29.05.2013 | ||
PL | 29.05.2013 | ||
RO | 29.05.2013 | ||
SE | 29.05.2013 | ||
SI | 29.05.2013 | ||
SK | 29.05.2013 | ||
IE | 28.06.2013 | ||
FR | 29.07.2013 | ||
BG | 29.08.2013 | ||
NO | 29.08.2013 | ||
GR | 30.08.2013 | ||
ES | 09.09.2013 | ||
IS | 29.09.2013 | ||
PT | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 29.05.2013 | |
BE | 29.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 29.05.2013 | ||
DK | 29.05.2013 | ||
EE | 29.05.2013 | ||
FI | 29.05.2013 | ||
HR | 29.05.2013 | ||
IT | 29.05.2013 | ||
LT | 29.05.2013 | ||
LV | 29.05.2013 | ||
MC | 29.05.2013 | ||
PL | 29.05.2013 | ||
RO | 29.05.2013 | ||
SE | 29.05.2013 | ||
SI | 29.05.2013 | ||
SK | 29.05.2013 | ||
IE | 28.06.2013 | ||
FR | 29.07.2013 | ||
BG | 29.08.2013 | ||
NO | 29.08.2013 | ||
GR | 30.08.2013 | ||
ES | 09.09.2013 | ||
IS | 29.09.2013 | ||
PT | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | AT | 29.05.2013 | |
BE | 29.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 29.05.2013 | ||
DK | 29.05.2013 | ||
EE | 29.05.2013 | ||
FI | 29.05.2013 | ||
HR | 29.05.2013 | ||
IT | 29.05.2013 | ||
LT | 29.05.2013 | ||
LV | 29.05.2013 | ||
MC | 29.05.2013 | ||
PL | 29.05.2013 | ||
RO | 29.05.2013 | ||
SE | 29.05.2013 | ||
SI | 29.05.2013 | ||
SK | 29.05.2013 | ||
IE | 28.06.2013 | ||
BG | 29.08.2013 | ||
NO | 29.08.2013 | ||
GR | 30.08.2013 | ||
ES | 09.09.2013 | ||
IS | 29.09.2013 | ||
PT | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | AT | 29.05.2013 | |
BE | 29.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 29.05.2013 | ||
DK | 29.05.2013 | ||
EE | 29.05.2013 | ||
FI | 29.05.2013 | ||
HR | 29.05.2013 | ||
IT | 29.05.2013 | ||
LT | 29.05.2013 | ||
LV | 29.05.2013 | ||
MC | 29.05.2013 | ||
PL | 29.05.2013 | ||
RO | 29.05.2013 | ||
SE | 29.05.2013 | ||
SI | 29.05.2013 | ||
SK | 29.05.2013 | ||
BG | 29.08.2013 | ||
NO | 29.08.2013 | ||
GR | 30.08.2013 | ||
ES | 09.09.2013 | ||
IS | 29.09.2013 | ||
PT | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | AT | 29.05.2013 | |
BE | 29.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 29.05.2013 | ||
DK | 29.05.2013 | ||
EE | 29.05.2013 | ||
FI | 29.05.2013 | ||
HR | 29.05.2013 | ||
IT | 29.05.2013 | ||
LT | 29.05.2013 | ||
LV | 29.05.2013 | ||
PL | 29.05.2013 | ||
RO | 29.05.2013 | ||
SE | 29.05.2013 | ||
SI | 29.05.2013 | ||
SK | 29.05.2013 | ||
BG | 29.08.2013 | ||
NO | 29.08.2013 | ||
GR | 30.08.2013 | ||
ES | 09.09.2013 | ||
IS | 29.09.2013 | ||
PT | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | AT | 29.05.2013 | |
BE | 29.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 29.05.2013 | ||
DK | 29.05.2013 | ||
EE | 29.05.2013 | ||
FI | 29.05.2013 | ||
HR | 29.05.2013 | ||
LT | 29.05.2013 | ||
LV | 29.05.2013 | ||
PL | 29.05.2013 | ||
SE | 29.05.2013 | ||
SI | 29.05.2013 | ||
SK | 29.05.2013 | ||
BG | 29.08.2013 | ||
NO | 29.08.2013 | ||
GR | 30.08.2013 | ||
ES | 09.09.2013 | ||
IS | 29.09.2013 | ||
PT | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 29.05.2013 | |
BE | 29.05.2013 | ||
DK | 29.05.2013 | ||
EE | 29.05.2013 | ||
FI | 29.05.2013 | ||
HR | 29.05.2013 | ||
LT | 29.05.2013 | ||
LV | 29.05.2013 | ||
PL | 29.05.2013 | ||
SE | 29.05.2013 | ||
SI | 29.05.2013 | ||
BG | 29.08.2013 | ||
NO | 29.08.2013 | ||
GR | 30.08.2013 | ||
ES | 09.09.2013 | ||
IS | 29.09.2013 | ||
PT | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/06] | AT | 29.05.2013 | |
BE | 29.05.2013 | ||
FI | 29.05.2013 | ||
HR | 29.05.2013 | ||
LT | 29.05.2013 | ||
LV | 29.05.2013 | ||
PL | 29.05.2013 | ||
SE | 29.05.2013 | ||
SI | 29.05.2013 | ||
BG | 29.08.2013 | ||
NO | 29.08.2013 | ||
GR | 30.08.2013 | ||
ES | 09.09.2013 | ||
IS | 29.09.2013 | ||
PT | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/02] | AT | 29.05.2013 | |
FI | 29.05.2013 | ||
HR | 29.05.2013 | ||
LT | 29.05.2013 | ||
LV | 29.05.2013 | ||
PL | 29.05.2013 | ||
SE | 29.05.2013 | ||
SI | 29.05.2013 | ||
BG | 29.08.2013 | ||
NO | 29.08.2013 | ||
GR | 30.08.2013 | ||
ES | 09.09.2013 | ||
IS | 29.09.2013 | ||
PT | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/51] | AT | 29.05.2013 | |
FI | 29.05.2013 | ||
HR | 29.05.2013 | ||
LT | 29.05.2013 | ||
PL | 29.05.2013 | ||
SE | 29.05.2013 | ||
SI | 29.05.2013 | ||
BG | 29.08.2013 | ||
NO | 29.08.2013 | ||
GR | 30.08.2013 | ||
ES | 09.09.2013 | ||
IS | 29.09.2013 | ||
PT | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | AT | 29.05.2013 | |
FI | 29.05.2013 | ||
LT | 29.05.2013 | ||
PL | 29.05.2013 | ||
SE | 29.05.2013 | ||
SI | 29.05.2013 | ||
BG | 29.08.2013 | ||
NO | 29.08.2013 | ||
GR | 30.08.2013 | ||
ES | 09.09.2013 | ||
IS | 29.09.2013 | ||
PT | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 29.05.2013 | |
FI | 29.05.2013 | ||
LT | 29.05.2013 | ||
SE | 29.05.2013 | ||
SI | 29.05.2013 | ||
NO | 29.08.2013 | ||
GR | 30.08.2013 | ||
ES | 09.09.2013 | ||
IS | 29.09.2013 | ||
PT | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 29.05.2013 | |
LT | 29.05.2013 | ||
NO | 29.08.2013 | ||
ES | 09.09.2013 | ||
IS | 29.09.2013 | ||
PT | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | LT | 29.05.2013 | |
NO | 29.08.2013 | ||
PT | 30.09.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1484626 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-10 * moving device for lens module; paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0026]; figures 1-6B *; | [A]EP1701207 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-10 * fastening device for projector lens module; paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0053]; figures 1-4B *; | [A]US2007064205 (MENG CHI-YU [TW], et al) [A] 1-10 * fastening device for projector lens module; paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0039]; figures 1-8 *; | [A]JP2007213832 (SEIKO EPSON CORP) [A] 1-10* abstract *; | [X]JP2008064131 (DAIWA KASEI IND CO LTD) [X] 1-10 * abstract * | by applicant | KR100735422B | KR100810260B |