EP2403071 - An actuator, an electrical plug and socket assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 09.10.2015 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.10.2015 | Refusal of application | published on 11.11.2015 [2015/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schneider Electric Industries SAS 89, Boulevard Franklin Roosevelt 92500 Rueil-Malmaison / FR | [2012/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Reddy, Mahesh s/o Thimma Reddy no 81, kodihalli village Lakkur post, Malur taluk, Kolar District PIN-563130 Karnataka / IN | 02 /
Rao, Arjun no 17, J-Block Vidyarathna, Ramakrishna Nagar 570022 Mysore / IN | 03 /
Bhaskar, Vijai S / No 16, 6th, S.K. Garden Benson Town 560046 Bangalore / IN | 04 /
Prabhu, Raghunath T GF3, Malibu Homes -1 4th Cross, Green Garden Layout Kundalahalli Gate 560037 Bangalore / IN | [2012/01] | Representative(s) | Groth & Co. KB P.O. Box 6107 102 32 Stockholm / SE | [2014/13] |
Former [2013/46] | (deleted) | ||
Former [2012/01] | Löfgren, Håkan Bengt Alpo, et al Groth & Co KB Box 6107 102 32 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 10167741.7 | 29.06.2010 | [2012/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2403071 | Date: | 04.01.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.11.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H01R13/453, // H01R13/64 | [2012/01] | CPC: |
H01R13/4532 (EP);
H01R13/64 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/01] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Aktuator, elektrischer Stecker und Buchsenanordnung | [2012/01] | English: | An actuator, an electrical plug and socket assembly | [2012/01] | French: | Actionneur, prise électrique et ensemble de douille | [2012/01] | Examination procedure | 03.07.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.07.2012 | Examination requested [2012/33] | 03.07.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.11.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.06.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2015/46] | 30.06.2015 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2015/46] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.07.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]FR2271680 (COUQUEBERG MICHEL [FR]) [X] 1-3,5-14 * the whole document * [Y] 15 [I] 4; | [XI]FR2833111 (LEGRAND SA [FR], et al) [X] 1-3,5,7-9,11,12,14 * page 11, line 3 - page 12, line 7 * * figures 7,8 * [I] 4; | [Y]GB2279511 (SEAPART LTD [GB]) [Y] 15 * page 15, line 19 - page 16, line 10 * * figures 6,7 * | by applicant | GB2234865 |