EP2281470 - A method and equipment for monitoring the external integrity of tobacco products [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.04.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states G.D S.p.A. Via Battindarno, 91 40133 Bologna / IT | [2011/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cuppini, Michele Via X Settembre 1943, 33 40011 Anzola Emilia ( Bologna) / IT | 02 /
Osti, Eugenio Via Tasso, 16/5 40069 Zola Predosa (Bologna) / IT | [2014/24] |
Former [2011/06] | 01 /
Cuppini, Michele Via X Settembre 1943, 33 40011 Anzola Emilia ( Bologna) / IT | ||
02 /
Osti, Eugenio Via Tasso, 16/5 40069 Zola Predosa (Bologna) / IT | Representative(s) | Bianciardi, Ezio, et al Bugnion S.p.A. Via di Corticella, 87 40128 Bologna / IT | [2014/08] |
Former [2011/31] | Ghioni, Carlo Raoul Maria c/o Bugnion S.p.A. Via di Corticella, 87 40128 Bologna / IT | ||
Former [2011/06] | Ghioni, Carlo Raoul Maria c/o Bugnion S.p.A. Via Goito 18 40126 Bologna / IT | Application number, filing date | 10167825.8 | 30.06.2010 | [2011/06] | Priority number, date | IT2009BO00530 | 06.08.2009 Original published format: IT BO20090530 | [2011/06] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2281470 | Date: | 09.02.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2281470 | Date: | 11.06.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.11.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A24C5/34, G01N21/952 | [2011/06] | CPC: |
A24C5/3412 (EP);
G01N21/952 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/06] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Gerät zur Überprüfung der externen Integrität von Tabakprodukten | [2011/06] | English: | A method and equipment for monitoring the external integrity of tobacco products | [2011/06] | French: | Procédé et équipement pour surveiller l'intégrité extérieure de produits de tabac | [2011/06] | Examination procedure | 30.05.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.05.2011 | Examination requested [2011/27] | 16.01.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.04.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 29.04.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.04.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.01.2014 | Opposition(s) | 12.03.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.06.2010 | AL | 11.06.2014 | AT | 11.06.2014 | BE | 11.06.2014 | BG | 11.06.2014 | CY | 11.06.2014 | CZ | 11.06.2014 | DK | 11.06.2014 | EE | 11.06.2014 | ES | 11.06.2014 | FI | 11.06.2014 | HR | 11.06.2014 | LT | 11.06.2014 | LV | 11.06.2014 | MC | 11.06.2014 | MK | 11.06.2014 | MT | 11.06.2014 | NL | 11.06.2014 | PL | 11.06.2014 | RO | 11.06.2014 | SE | 11.06.2014 | SI | 11.06.2014 | SK | 11.06.2014 | SM | 11.06.2014 | CH | 30.06.2014 | IE | 30.06.2014 | LI | 30.06.2014 | LU | 30.06.2014 | FR | 11.08.2014 | NO | 11.09.2014 | GR | 12.09.2014 | IS | 11.10.2014 | PT | 13.10.2014 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/30] | HU | 30.06.2010 | |
AT | 11.06.2014 | ||
BE | 11.06.2014 | ||
BG | 11.06.2014 | ||
CY | 11.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 11.06.2014 | ||
DK | 11.06.2014 | ||
EE | 11.06.2014 | ||
ES | 11.06.2014 | ||
FI | 11.06.2014 | ||
HR | 11.06.2014 | ||
LT | 11.06.2014 | ||
LV | 11.06.2014 | ||
MC | 11.06.2014 | ||
MK | 11.06.2014 | ||
MT | 11.06.2014 | ||
NL | 11.06.2014 | ||
PL | 11.06.2014 | ||
RO | 11.06.2014 | ||
SE | 11.06.2014 | ||
SI | 11.06.2014 | ||
SK | 11.06.2014 | ||
SM | 11.06.2014 | ||
CH | 30.06.2014 | ||
IE | 30.06.2014 | ||
LI | 30.06.2014 | ||
LU | 30.06.2014 | ||
FR | 11.08.2014 | ||
NO | 11.09.2014 | ||
GR | 12.09.2014 | ||
IS | 11.10.2014 | ||
PT | 13.10.2014 | ||
Former [2016/33] | HU | 30.06.2010 | |
AT | 11.06.2014 | ||
BE | 11.06.2014 | ||
BG | 11.06.2014 | ||
CY | 11.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 11.06.2014 | ||
DK | 11.06.2014 | ||
EE | 11.06.2014 | ||
ES | 11.06.2014 | ||
FI | 11.06.2014 | ||
HR | 11.06.2014 | ||
LT | 11.06.2014 | ||
LV | 11.06.2014 | ||
MC | 11.06.2014 | ||
MT | 11.06.2014 | ||
NL | 11.06.2014 | ||
PL | 11.06.2014 | ||
RO | 11.06.2014 | ||
SE | 11.06.2014 | ||
SI | 11.06.2014 | ||
SK | 11.06.2014 | ||
SM | 11.06.2014 | ||
CH | 30.06.2014 | ||
IE | 30.06.2014 | ||
LI | 30.06.2014 | ||
LU | 30.06.2014 | ||
FR | 11.08.2014 | ||
NO | 11.09.2014 | ||
GR | 12.09.2014 | ||
IS | 11.10.2014 | ||
PT | 13.10.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 30.06.2010 | |
AT | 11.06.2014 | ||
BE | 11.06.2014 | ||
BG | 11.06.2014 | ||
CY | 11.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 11.06.2014 | ||
DK | 11.06.2014 | ||
EE | 11.06.2014 | ||
ES | 11.06.2014 | ||
FI | 11.06.2014 | ||
HR | 11.06.2014 | ||
LT | 11.06.2014 | ||
LV | 11.06.2014 | ||
MC | 11.06.2014 | ||
MT | 11.06.2014 | ||
NL | 11.06.2014 | ||
PL | 11.06.2014 | ||
RO | 11.06.2014 | ||
SE | 11.06.2014 | ||
SI | 11.06.2014 | ||
SK | 11.06.2014 | ||
SM | 11.06.2014 | ||
CH | 30.06.2014 | ||
IE | 30.06.2014 | ||
LI | 30.06.2014 | ||
FR | 11.08.2014 | ||
NO | 11.09.2014 | ||
GR | 12.09.2014 | ||
IS | 11.10.2014 | ||
PT | 13.10.2014 | ||
Former [2016/31] | AT | 11.06.2014 | |
BE | 11.06.2014 | ||
BG | 11.06.2014 | ||
CY | 11.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 11.06.2014 | ||
DK | 11.06.2014 | ||
EE | 11.06.2014 | ||
ES | 11.06.2014 | ||
FI | 11.06.2014 | ||
HR | 11.06.2014 | ||
LT | 11.06.2014 | ||
LV | 11.06.2014 | ||
MC | 11.06.2014 | ||
MT | 11.06.2014 | ||
NL | 11.06.2014 | ||
PL | 11.06.2014 | ||
RO | 11.06.2014 | ||
SE | 11.06.2014 | ||
SI | 11.06.2014 | ||
SK | 11.06.2014 | ||
SM | 11.06.2014 | ||
CH | 30.06.2014 | ||
IE | 30.06.2014 | ||
LI | 30.06.2014 | ||
FR | 11.08.2014 | ||
NO | 11.09.2014 | ||
GR | 12.09.2014 | ||
IS | 11.10.2014 | ||
PT | 13.10.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 11.06.2014 | |
BE | 11.06.2014 | ||
BG | 11.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 11.06.2014 | ||
DK | 11.06.2014 | ||
EE | 11.06.2014 | ||
ES | 11.06.2014 | ||
FI | 11.06.2014 | ||
HR | 11.06.2014 | ||
LT | 11.06.2014 | ||
LV | 11.06.2014 | ||
MC | 11.06.2014 | ||
MT | 11.06.2014 | ||
NL | 11.06.2014 | ||
PL | 11.06.2014 | ||
RO | 11.06.2014 | ||
SE | 11.06.2014 | ||
SI | 11.06.2014 | ||
SK | 11.06.2014 | ||
SM | 11.06.2014 | ||
CH | 30.06.2014 | ||
IE | 30.06.2014 | ||
LI | 30.06.2014 | ||
FR | 11.08.2014 | ||
NO | 11.09.2014 | ||
GR | 12.09.2014 | ||
IS | 11.10.2014 | ||
PT | 13.10.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 11.06.2014 | |
BE | 11.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 11.06.2014 | ||
DK | 11.06.2014 | ||
EE | 11.06.2014 | ||
ES | 11.06.2014 | ||
FI | 11.06.2014 | ||
HR | 11.06.2014 | ||
LT | 11.06.2014 | ||
LV | 11.06.2014 | ||
MC | 11.06.2014 | ||
MT | 11.06.2014 | ||
NL | 11.06.2014 | ||
PL | 11.06.2014 | ||
RO | 11.06.2014 | ||
SE | 11.06.2014 | ||
SI | 11.06.2014 | ||
SK | 11.06.2014 | ||
SM | 11.06.2014 | ||
CH | 30.06.2014 | ||
IE | 30.06.2014 | ||
LI | 30.06.2014 | ||
FR | 11.08.2014 | ||
NO | 11.09.2014 | ||
GR | 12.09.2014 | ||
IS | 11.10.2014 | ||
PT | 13.10.2014 | ||
Former [2016/16] | AT | 11.06.2014 | |
BE | 11.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 11.06.2014 | ||
DK | 11.06.2014 | ||
EE | 11.06.2014 | ||
ES | 11.06.2014 | ||
FI | 11.06.2014 | ||
HR | 11.06.2014 | ||
LT | 11.06.2014 | ||
LV | 11.06.2014 | ||
MC | 11.06.2014 | ||
MT | 11.06.2014 | ||
NL | 11.06.2014 | ||
PL | 11.06.2014 | ||
RO | 11.06.2014 | ||
SE | 11.06.2014 | ||
SI | 11.06.2014 | ||
SK | 11.06.2014 | ||
CH | 30.06.2014 | ||
IE | 30.06.2014 | ||
LI | 30.06.2014 | ||
FR | 11.08.2014 | ||
NO | 11.09.2014 | ||
GR | 12.09.2014 | ||
IS | 11.10.2014 | ||
PT | 13.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 11.06.2014 | |
BE | 11.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 11.06.2014 | ||
DK | 11.06.2014 | ||
EE | 11.06.2014 | ||
ES | 11.06.2014 | ||
FI | 11.06.2014 | ||
HR | 11.06.2014 | ||
LT | 11.06.2014 | ||
LV | 11.06.2014 | ||
MC | 11.06.2014 | ||
NL | 11.06.2014 | ||
PL | 11.06.2014 | ||
RO | 11.06.2014 | ||
SE | 11.06.2014 | ||
SI | 11.06.2014 | ||
SK | 11.06.2014 | ||
CH | 30.06.2014 | ||
IE | 30.06.2014 | ||
LI | 30.06.2014 | ||
FR | 11.08.2014 | ||
NO | 11.09.2014 | ||
GR | 12.09.2014 | ||
IS | 11.10.2014 | ||
PT | 13.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/30] | AT | 11.06.2014 | |
BE | 11.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 11.06.2014 | ||
DK | 11.06.2014 | ||
EE | 11.06.2014 | ||
ES | 11.06.2014 | ||
FI | 11.06.2014 | ||
HR | 11.06.2014 | ||
LT | 11.06.2014 | ||
LV | 11.06.2014 | ||
MC | 11.06.2014 | ||
NL | 11.06.2014 | ||
PL | 11.06.2014 | ||
RO | 11.06.2014 | ||
SE | 11.06.2014 | ||
SK | 11.06.2014 | ||
CH | 30.06.2014 | ||
IE | 30.06.2014 | ||
LI | 30.06.2014 | ||
FR | 11.08.2014 | ||
NO | 11.09.2014 | ||
GR | 12.09.2014 | ||
IS | 11.10.2014 | ||
PT | 13.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/25] | AT | 11.06.2014 | |
CZ | 11.06.2014 | ||
DK | 11.06.2014 | ||
EE | 11.06.2014 | ||
ES | 11.06.2014 | ||
FI | 11.06.2014 | ||
HR | 11.06.2014 | ||
LT | 11.06.2014 | ||
LV | 11.06.2014 | ||
MC | 11.06.2014 | ||
NL | 11.06.2014 | ||
PL | 11.06.2014 | ||
RO | 11.06.2014 | ||
SE | 11.06.2014 | ||
SK | 11.06.2014 | ||
CH | 30.06.2014 | ||
IE | 30.06.2014 | ||
LI | 30.06.2014 | ||
FR | 11.08.2014 | ||
NO | 11.09.2014 | ||
GR | 12.09.2014 | ||
IS | 11.10.2014 | ||
PT | 13.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | AT | 11.06.2014 | |
CZ | 11.06.2014 | ||
DK | 11.06.2014 | ||
EE | 11.06.2014 | ||
ES | 11.06.2014 | ||
FI | 11.06.2014 | ||
HR | 11.06.2014 | ||
LT | 11.06.2014 | ||
LV | 11.06.2014 | ||
MC | 11.06.2014 | ||
NL | 11.06.2014 | ||
PL | 11.06.2014 | ||
RO | 11.06.2014 | ||
SE | 11.06.2014 | ||
SK | 11.06.2014 | ||
CH | 30.06.2014 | ||
IE | 30.06.2014 | ||
LI | 30.06.2014 | ||
NO | 11.09.2014 | ||
GR | 12.09.2014 | ||
IS | 11.10.2014 | ||
PT | 13.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/21] | AT | 11.06.2014 | |
CZ | 11.06.2014 | ||
EE | 11.06.2014 | ||
ES | 11.06.2014 | ||
FI | 11.06.2014 | ||
HR | 11.06.2014 | ||
LT | 11.06.2014 | ||
LV | 11.06.2014 | ||
MC | 11.06.2014 | ||
NL | 11.06.2014 | ||
PL | 11.06.2014 | ||
RO | 11.06.2014 | ||
SE | 11.06.2014 | ||
SK | 11.06.2014 | ||
CH | 30.06.2014 | ||
IE | 30.06.2014 | ||
LI | 30.06.2014 | ||
NO | 11.09.2014 | ||
GR | 12.09.2014 | ||
IS | 11.10.2014 | ||
PT | 13.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/20] | AT | 11.06.2014 | |
CZ | 11.06.2014 | ||
EE | 11.06.2014 | ||
ES | 11.06.2014 | ||
FI | 11.06.2014 | ||
HR | 11.06.2014 | ||
LT | 11.06.2014 | ||
LV | 11.06.2014 | ||
MC | 11.06.2014 | ||
NL | 11.06.2014 | ||
PL | 11.06.2014 | ||
RO | 11.06.2014 | ||
SE | 11.06.2014 | ||
SK | 11.06.2014 | ||
CH | 30.06.2014 | ||
LI | 30.06.2014 | ||
NO | 11.09.2014 | ||
GR | 12.09.2014 | ||
IS | 11.10.2014 | ||
PT | 13.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/18] | AT | 11.06.2014 | |
CZ | 11.06.2014 | ||
EE | 11.06.2014 | ||
ES | 11.06.2014 | ||
FI | 11.06.2014 | ||
HR | 11.06.2014 | ||
LT | 11.06.2014 | ||
LV | 11.06.2014 | ||
MC | 11.06.2014 | ||
NL | 11.06.2014 | ||
PL | 11.06.2014 | ||
RO | 11.06.2014 | ||
SE | 11.06.2014 | ||
SK | 11.06.2014 | ||
NO | 11.09.2014 | ||
GR | 12.09.2014 | ||
IS | 11.10.2014 | ||
PT | 13.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | AT | 11.06.2014 | |
CZ | 11.06.2014 | ||
EE | 11.06.2014 | ||
ES | 11.06.2014 | ||
FI | 11.06.2014 | ||
HR | 11.06.2014 | ||
LT | 11.06.2014 | ||
LV | 11.06.2014 | ||
NL | 11.06.2014 | ||
PL | 11.06.2014 | ||
RO | 11.06.2014 | ||
SE | 11.06.2014 | ||
SK | 11.06.2014 | ||
NO | 11.09.2014 | ||
GR | 12.09.2014 | ||
IS | 11.10.2014 | ||
PT | 13.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CZ | 11.06.2014 | |
EE | 11.06.2014 | ||
ES | 11.06.2014 | ||
FI | 11.06.2014 | ||
HR | 11.06.2014 | ||
LT | 11.06.2014 | ||
LV | 11.06.2014 | ||
PL | 11.06.2014 | ||
RO | 11.06.2014 | ||
SE | 11.06.2014 | ||
SK | 11.06.2014 | ||
NO | 11.09.2014 | ||
GR | 12.09.2014 | ||
PT | 13.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | CZ | 11.06.2014 | |
EE | 11.06.2014 | ||
ES | 11.06.2014 | ||
FI | 11.06.2014 | ||
HR | 11.06.2014 | ||
LT | 11.06.2014 | ||
LV | 11.06.2014 | ||
SE | 11.06.2014 | ||
SK | 11.06.2014 | ||
NO | 11.09.2014 | ||
GR | 12.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | FI | 11.06.2014 | |
HR | 11.06.2014 | ||
LT | 11.06.2014 | ||
LV | 11.06.2014 | ||
SE | 11.06.2014 | ||
NO | 11.09.2014 | ||
GR | 12.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | FI | 11.06.2014 | |
LT | 11.06.2014 | ||
NO | 11.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | LT | 11.06.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0570163 (PHILIP MORRIS [US]) [X] 1-23 * column 3, line 47 - column 5, line 43; figure -; claim - *; | [X]EP1826557 (HAUNI WERKE KOERBER & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1-23 * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0028]; figure - *; | [X]EP0812548 (GD SPA [IT]) [X] 1-23 * column 3, line 30 - column 5, line 24; figure - *; | [X]WO2004083834 (MOLINS PLC [GB], et al) [X] 13 * page 41, line 16 - page 44, line 20 *; | [A]EP2022347 (HAUNI MASCHINENBAU AG [DE]) [A] 1-23 * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0041]; figure - *; | [A]EP0548695 (JAPAN TOBACCO INC [JP], et al) [A] 1-23 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1430796 (JAPAN TOBACCO INC [JP]) [A] 1-23 * the whole document *; | [A]US5366096 (MILLER LEWIS H [US]) [A] 1-23 * the whole document * | by applicant | IT2008BO00755 |