EP2258195 - Pesticide composition comprising propamocarb-fosetylate and an insecticide active substance [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 13.12.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.12.2013 | Refusal of application | published on 15.01.2014 [2014/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayer CropScience AG BCS-BPA-LP-PL Gebäude 6100 Alfred-Nobel-Straße 50 40789 Monheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/49] | For all designated states Bayer CropScience AG BCS-BPA-LP-PL Gebäude 6100 Alfred-Nobel-Straße 50 40789 Monheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Van Den Eynde, Koen Vijlstraat 3 B-1785 Merchtem / BE | 02 /
Andrieux, Marc 1401 Wildwood Drive Chapel Hill, NC 27517 / US | 03 /
Hundenberg, Heike Grünewaldstrasse 39b 40764, Langenfeld / DE | 04 /
Thielert, Wolfgang Buschweg 69 51519 Odenthal / DE | 05 /
Suty-Heinze, Anne Schlieper Strasse 29 40764 Langenfeld / DE | [2010/49] | Application number, filing date | 10167846.4 | 21.12.2007 | [2010/49] | Priority number, date | EP20060127172 | 22.12.2006 Original published format: EP 06127172 | [2010/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2258195 | Date: | 08.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2258195 | Date: | 16.02.2011 | [2011/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.01.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A01N57/12, A01N47/12, A01N47/02, A01N43/56, A01P7/00, A01P3/00 | [2010/49] | CPC: |
A01N47/12 (EP,KR,US);
A01N37/18 (KR);
A01N57/12 (EP,US);
Y02A90/40 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
A01N47/12, A01N2300/00 (US,EP);
A01N47/12, A01N57/12, A01N51/00 (US,EP);
A01N57/12, A01N2300/00 (US,EP);
A01N57/12, A01N47/12, A01N51/00 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/49] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | 16.08.2011 | MK | Not yet paid | RS | 16.08.2011 | Title | German: | Pestizidzusammensetzung mit Propamocarb-Fosetylat und einem insektiziden Wirkstoff | [2010/49] | English: | Pesticide composition comprising propamocarb-fosetylate and an insecticide active substance | [2010/49] | French: | Composition pesticide comprenant du propamocarbe-fosétylate et une substance active insecticide | [2010/49] | Examination procedure | 25.07.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.08.2011 | Examination requested [2011/38] | 16.02.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.05.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.07.2013 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 30.08.2013 | 16.07.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2014/03] | 26.07.2013 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2014/03] | 30.08.2013 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP07858039.6 / EP2124566 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20070858039) is 07.04.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ID]WO9942468 (AGREVO UK LTD [GB], et al) [ID] 1-11 * page 1, lines 6-14,23-25 *; | [A]WO2005034628 (BAYER CROPSCIENCE AG [DE], et al) [A] 1-11 * page 1, lines 3-5 * * page 1, line 22 - page 2, line 17 * * page 6, line 12 - line 17 ** page 26, line 3 - line 4 *; | [I]DE102005022147 (BAYER CROPSCIENCE AG [DE]) [I] 1-11 * paragraphs [0002] , [0004] , [0 31] , [0 58] , [ 148] * | by applicant | WO9942468 | WO2007101547 | - COLBY, "Calculation of the synergistic and antagonistic responses of herbicide combinations", WEEDS, (1967), vol. 15, pages 20 - 22 | - JOURNAL OF PLANT PATHOLOGY, (1964), vol. 70, pages 73 - 80 | - "Calculation of the synergistic and antagonistic responses of herbicide combinations", WEEDS, (1967), vol. 15, pages 20 - 22 |