EP2280578 - Method and apparatus for suppressing inter-cell interference [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.06.2012 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | For all designated states Xidian University ISN Lab. Xidian University 2 SouthTaibai Road Xi'an Shaanxi 710071 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2011/20] | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District, Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | ||
For all designated states Xidian University ISN Lab. Xidian University 2 SouthTaibai Road Xi'an Shaanxi 710071 / CN | |||
Former [2011/05] | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District, Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | ||
For all designated states Xidian University 2th Tai Bai South Road Xi'an Shaanxi 710071 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wang, Yong c/o XI, Dian University ISN Lab. Xidian University, 2 South Taibai Road Xi'an Shaanxi 710071 / CN | 02 /
Fu, Shaozhong c/o XI, Dian University ISN Lab. Xidian University, 2 South Taibai Road Xi'an Shaanxi 710071 / CN | 03 /
Wu, Tao c/o Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building, Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2011/16] |
Former [2011/05] | 01 /
Wang, Yong c/o XI, Dian University ISN Lab. Xidian University, 2 South Taibai Road 710071, Xi'an Shaanxi / CN | ||
02 /
Fu, Shaozhong c/o XI, Dian University ISN Lab. Xidian University, 2 South Taibai Road 710071, Xi'an Shaanxi / CN | |||
03 /
Wu, Tao c/o Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building, Bantian Longgang District 518129, Shenzhen / CN | Representative(s) | Körber, Martin Hans Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstrasse 33 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/05] | Körber, Martin Hans Mitscherlich & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstrasse 33 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10167932.2 | 30.06.2010 | [2011/05] | Priority number, date | CN20091150053 | 30.06.2009 Original published format: CN200910150053 | [2011/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2280578 | Date: | 02.02.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2280578 | Date: | 24.08.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.10.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H04W16/10 | [2011/14] | CPC: |
H04W16/10 (EP,US);
H04W16/30 (EP,US);
H04W72/541 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2011/05] | H04W72/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/05] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Unterdrückung der Interferenz zwischen Zellen | [2011/05] | English: | Method and apparatus for suppressing inter-cell interference | [2011/05] | French: | Procédé et appareil pour supprimer l'interférence entre cellules | [2011/05] | Examination procedure | 30.06.2010 | Examination requested [2011/05] | 24.01.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.03.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.07.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 01.07.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 31.03.2011 | Opposition(s) | 25.05.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/31] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.06.2010 | AL | 24.08.2011 | AT | 24.08.2011 | BE | 24.08.2011 | CY | 24.08.2011 | CZ | 24.08.2011 | DK | 24.08.2011 | EE | 24.08.2011 | FI | 24.08.2011 | HR | 24.08.2011 | LT | 24.08.2011 | LV | 24.08.2011 | MK | 24.08.2011 | MT | 24.08.2011 | NL | 24.08.2011 | PL | 24.08.2011 | RO | 24.08.2011 | SE | 24.08.2011 | SI | 24.08.2011 | SK | 24.08.2011 | SM | 24.08.2011 | TR | 24.08.2011 | BG | 24.11.2011 | NO | 24.11.2011 | GR | 25.11.2011 | ES | 05.12.2011 | IS | 24.12.2011 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AL | 24.08.2011 | |
AT | 24.08.2011 | ||
BE | 24.08.2011 | ||
CY | 24.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2011 | ||
DK | 24.08.2011 | ||
EE | 24.08.2011 | ||
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
HR | 24.08.2011 | ||
LT | 24.08.2011 | ||
LV | 24.08.2011 | ||
MK | 24.08.2011 | ||
MT | 24.08.2011 | ||
NL | 24.08.2011 | ||
PL | 24.08.2011 | ||
RO | 24.08.2011 | ||
SE | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
SK | 24.08.2011 | ||
SM | 24.08.2011 | ||
TR | 24.08.2011 | ||
BG | 24.11.2011 | ||
NO | 24.11.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
ES | 05.12.2011 | ||
IS | 24.12.2011 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AL | 24.08.2011 | |
AT | 24.08.2011 | ||
BE | 24.08.2011 | ||
CY | 24.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2011 | ||
DK | 24.08.2011 | ||
EE | 24.08.2011 | ||
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
HR | 24.08.2011 | ||
LT | 24.08.2011 | ||
LV | 24.08.2011 | ||
MK | 24.08.2011 | ||
MT | 24.08.2011 | ||
NL | 24.08.2011 | ||
PL | 24.08.2011 | ||
RO | 24.08.2011 | ||
SE | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
SK | 24.08.2011 | ||
TR | 24.08.2011 | ||
BG | 24.11.2011 | ||
NO | 24.11.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
ES | 05.12.2011 | ||
IS | 24.12.2011 | ||
Former [2013/51] | AL | 24.08.2011 | |
AT | 24.08.2011 | ||
BE | 24.08.2011 | ||
CY | 24.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2011 | ||
DK | 24.08.2011 | ||
EE | 24.08.2011 | ||
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
HR | 24.08.2011 | ||
LT | 24.08.2011 | ||
LV | 24.08.2011 | ||
MK | 24.08.2011 | ||
MT | 24.08.2011 | ||
NL | 24.08.2011 | ||
PL | 24.08.2011 | ||
RO | 24.08.2011 | ||
SE | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
SK | 24.08.2011 | ||
BG | 24.11.2011 | ||
NO | 24.11.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
ES | 05.12.2011 | ||
IS | 24.12.2011 | ||
Former [2013/35] | AT | 24.08.2011 | |
BE | 24.08.2011 | ||
CY | 24.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2011 | ||
DK | 24.08.2011 | ||
EE | 24.08.2011 | ||
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
HR | 24.08.2011 | ||
LT | 24.08.2011 | ||
LV | 24.08.2011 | ||
MK | 24.08.2011 | ||
MT | 24.08.2011 | ||
NL | 24.08.2011 | ||
PL | 24.08.2011 | ||
RO | 24.08.2011 | ||
SE | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
SK | 24.08.2011 | ||
BG | 24.11.2011 | ||
NO | 24.11.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
ES | 05.12.2011 | ||
IS | 24.12.2011 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 24.08.2011 | |
BE | 24.08.2011 | ||
CY | 24.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2011 | ||
DK | 24.08.2011 | ||
EE | 24.08.2011 | ||
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
HR | 24.08.2011 | ||
LT | 24.08.2011 | ||
LV | 24.08.2011 | ||
MK | 24.08.2011 | ||
NL | 24.08.2011 | ||
PL | 24.08.2011 | ||
RO | 24.08.2011 | ||
SE | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
SK | 24.08.2011 | ||
BG | 24.11.2011 | ||
NO | 24.11.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
ES | 05.12.2011 | ||
IS | 24.12.2011 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 24.08.2011 | |
BE | 24.08.2011 | ||
CY | 24.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2011 | ||
DK | 24.08.2011 | ||
EE | 24.08.2011 | ||
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
HR | 24.08.2011 | ||
LT | 24.08.2011 | ||
LV | 24.08.2011 | ||
MK | 24.08.2011 | ||
NL | 24.08.2011 | ||
PL | 24.08.2011 | ||
RO | 24.08.2011 | ||
SE | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
SK | 24.08.2011 | ||
NO | 24.11.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
ES | 05.12.2011 | ||
IS | 24.12.2011 | ||
Former [2013/12] | AT | 24.08.2011 | |
BE | 24.08.2011 | ||
CY | 24.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2011 | ||
DK | 24.08.2011 | ||
EE | 24.08.2011 | ||
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
HR | 24.08.2011 | ||
LT | 24.08.2011 | ||
LV | 24.08.2011 | ||
MK | 24.08.2011 | ||
NL | 24.08.2011 | ||
PL | 24.08.2011 | ||
RO | 24.08.2011 | ||
SE | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
SK | 24.08.2011 | ||
NO | 24.11.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
IS | 24.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/34] | AT | 24.08.2011 | |
BE | 24.08.2011 | ||
CY | 24.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2011 | ||
DK | 24.08.2011 | ||
EE | 24.08.2011 | ||
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
HR | 24.08.2011 | ||
LT | 24.08.2011 | ||
LV | 24.08.2011 | ||
NL | 24.08.2011 | ||
PL | 24.08.2011 | ||
RO | 24.08.2011 | ||
SE | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
SK | 24.08.2011 | ||
NO | 24.11.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
IS | 24.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/23] | AT | 24.08.2011 | |
BE | 24.08.2011 | ||
CY | 24.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2011 | ||
EE | 24.08.2011 | ||
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
HR | 24.08.2011 | ||
LT | 24.08.2011 | ||
LV | 24.08.2011 | ||
NL | 24.08.2011 | ||
PL | 24.08.2011 | ||
RO | 24.08.2011 | ||
SE | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
SK | 24.08.2011 | ||
NO | 24.11.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
IS | 24.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/21] | AT | 24.08.2011 | |
BE | 24.08.2011 | ||
CY | 24.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2011 | ||
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
HR | 24.08.2011 | ||
LT | 24.08.2011 | ||
LV | 24.08.2011 | ||
NL | 24.08.2011 | ||
PL | 24.08.2011 | ||
SE | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
NO | 24.11.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
IS | 24.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/17] | AT | 24.08.2011 | |
BE | 24.08.2011 | ||
CY | 24.08.2011 | ||
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
HR | 24.08.2011 | ||
LT | 24.08.2011 | ||
LV | 24.08.2011 | ||
NL | 24.08.2011 | ||
PL | 24.08.2011 | ||
SE | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
NO | 24.11.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
IS | 24.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/14] | AT | 24.08.2011 | |
CY | 24.08.2011 | ||
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
HR | 24.08.2011 | ||
LT | 24.08.2011 | ||
LV | 24.08.2011 | ||
NL | 24.08.2011 | ||
PL | 24.08.2011 | ||
SE | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
NO | 24.11.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
IS | 24.12.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2005272432 (JI TINGFANG [US], et al); | [A]US2007086406 (PAPASAKELLARIOU ARIS [US]); |