EP2228963 - Quadrature modulator which employs four 90-degrees-shifted carriers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.08.2019 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.08.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.07.2021 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 11.08.2021 [2021/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Qualcomm Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive, R-132 D San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | [2010/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ballantyne, Gary J. 7C Paisley Street Summer 8008, Christchurch / NZ | [2018/39] |
Former [2010/37] | 01 /
Ballantyne, Gary J. 7C Paisley Street Summer 8008, Christchurch / NZ | Representative(s) | Tomkins & Co 5 Dartmouth Road Dublin 6 / IE | [2018/39] |
Former [2010/37] | O'Neill, Aoife, et al Tomkins & Co. 5 Dartmouth Road Dublin 6 / IE | Application number, filing date | 10168026.2 | 17.03.2004 | [2010/37] | Priority number, date | US20030392042 | 18.03.2003 Original published format: US 392042 | [2010/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2228963 | Date: | 15.09.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2228963 | Date: | 05.04.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2228963 | Date: | 26.09.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.03.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H04L27/36, H03C1/54, H03F3/217 | [2017/14] | CPC: |
H03C1/547 (EP,US);
H03F3/2176 (EP,US);
H04L27/362 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2010/37] | H04L27/36 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/39] |
Former [2010/37] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Quadraturemodulator mit vier um 90 Grad verschobenen Trägern | [2010/37] | English: | Quadrature modulator which employs four 90-degrees-shifted carriers | [2010/37] | French: | Modulateur en quadrature qui utilise quatre porteuses décalées à 90 dégrées | [2010/37] | Examination procedure | 30.06.2010 | Examination requested [2010/37] | 03.10.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.04.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.08.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 16.08.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.08.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP04757606.1 / EP1665709 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20040757606) is 19.06.2006 | Opposition(s) | 27.06.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 07.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 08.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 10.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 06.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 08.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 07.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 08.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 15 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.03.2004 | AT | 26.09.2018 | CY | 26.09.2018 | CZ | 26.09.2018 | DK | 26.09.2018 | EE | 26.09.2018 | ES | 26.09.2018 | FI | 26.09.2018 | IT | 26.09.2018 | MC | 26.09.2018 | NL | 26.09.2018 | PL | 26.09.2018 | RO | 26.09.2018 | SE | 26.09.2018 | SI | 26.09.2018 | SK | 26.09.2018 | TR | 26.09.2018 | BG | 26.12.2018 | GR | 27.12.2018 | PT | 26.01.2019 | GB | 17.03.2019 | IE | 17.03.2019 | LU | 17.03.2019 | BE | 31.03.2019 | CH | 31.03.2019 | FR | 31.03.2019 | LI | 31.03.2019 | [2021/32] |
Former [2021/26] | AT | 26.09.2018 | |
CY | 26.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 26.09.2018 | ||
DK | 26.09.2018 | ||
EE | 26.09.2018 | ||
ES | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
IT | 26.09.2018 | ||
MC | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
PL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
SI | 26.09.2018 | ||
SK | 26.09.2018 | ||
TR | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
PT | 26.01.2019 | ||
GB | 17.03.2019 | ||
IE | 17.03.2019 | ||
LU | 17.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
CH | 31.03.2019 | ||
FR | 31.03.2019 | ||
LI | 31.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AT | 26.09.2018 | |
CZ | 26.09.2018 | ||
DK | 26.09.2018 | ||
EE | 26.09.2018 | ||
ES | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
IT | 26.09.2018 | ||
MC | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
PL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
SI | 26.09.2018 | ||
SK | 26.09.2018 | ||
TR | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
PT | 26.01.2019 | ||
GB | 17.03.2019 | ||
IE | 17.03.2019 | ||
LU | 17.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
CH | 31.03.2019 | ||
FR | 31.03.2019 | ||
LI | 31.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AT | 26.09.2018 | |
CZ | 26.09.2018 | ||
DK | 26.09.2018 | ||
EE | 26.09.2018 | ||
ES | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
IT | 26.09.2018 | ||
MC | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
PL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
SI | 26.09.2018 | ||
SK | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
PT | 26.01.2019 | ||
GB | 17.03.2019 | ||
IE | 17.03.2019 | ||
LU | 17.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
CH | 31.03.2019 | ||
FR | 31.03.2019 | ||
LI | 31.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AT | 26.09.2018 | |
CZ | 26.09.2018 | ||
DK | 26.09.2018 | ||
EE | 26.09.2018 | ||
ES | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
IT | 26.09.2018 | ||
MC | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
PL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
SI | 26.09.2018 | ||
SK | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
PT | 26.01.2019 | ||
IE | 17.03.2019 | ||
LU | 17.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/01] | AT | 26.09.2018 | |
CZ | 26.09.2018 | ||
DK | 26.09.2018 | ||
EE | 26.09.2018 | ||
ES | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
IT | 26.09.2018 | ||
MC | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
PL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
SI | 26.09.2018 | ||
SK | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
PT | 26.01.2019 | ||
LU | 17.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AT | 26.09.2018 | |
CZ | 26.09.2018 | ||
DK | 26.09.2018 | ||
EE | 26.09.2018 | ||
ES | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
IT | 26.09.2018 | ||
MC | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
PL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
SI | 26.09.2018 | ||
SK | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
PT | 26.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/46] | AT | 26.09.2018 | |
CZ | 26.09.2018 | ||
DK | 26.09.2018 | ||
EE | 26.09.2018 | ||
ES | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
IT | 26.09.2018 | ||
MC | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
PL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
SK | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
PT | 26.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AT | 26.09.2018 | |
CZ | 26.09.2018 | ||
DK | 26.09.2018 | ||
EE | 26.09.2018 | ||
ES | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
IT | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
PL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
SK | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
PT | 26.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 26.09.2018 | |
CZ | 26.09.2018 | ||
EE | 26.09.2018 | ||
ES | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
IT | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
PL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
SK | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
PT | 26.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AT | 26.09.2018 | |
CZ | 26.09.2018 | ||
EE | 26.09.2018 | ||
ES | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
IT | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
PL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
SK | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/22] | CZ | 26.09.2018 | |
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
IT | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
PL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/21] | FI | 26.09.2018 | |
IT | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/20] | FI | 26.09.2018 | |
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | FI | 26.09.2018 | |
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 26.09.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4638504 (SALEK STANLEY [US]) [A] 1-23 * column 1, lines 14-17 ** column 2, line 44 - column 3, line 48; claims 1,5 *; | [A]US5559457 (UDA HISANORI [JP], et al) [A] 1-23 * column 1, lines 23-41 *; | [A]US6275688 (TAKAGI MINORU [JP], et al) [A] 1-23 * column 6, paragraph l - column 7, line 18; figure 9 * | by applicant | - WEI ET AL., "Analysis and experimental waveform study on inverse class class-F mode of microwave power FETs", IEEE MTT-S INTERNATIONAL MICROWAVE SYMPOSIUM DIGEST, (2000), vol. 1, doi:doi:10.1109/MWSYM.2000.861106, pages 525 - 528, XP010506032 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/MWSYM.2000.861106 | - I. AOKI ET AL., "Fully Integrated CMOS Power Amplifier Design Using the Distributed Active-Transformer Architecture", IEEE JOURNAL OF SOLID STATE CIRCUITS, (200203), vol. 37, no. 3, doi:doi:10.1109/4.987090, pages 371 - 383, XP001222669 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/4.987090 |