EP2278381 - Optical helmet position detector usable under a large range of ambient illumination [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.01.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.01.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.02.2012 [2012/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thales 45, rue de Villiers 92200 Neuilly Sur Seine / FR | [2011/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Perbet, Jean-Noël 9 allée de Fondefroide 33320 EYSINES / FR | 02 /
Barbier, Bruno 42 rue de Laseppe 33000 BORDEAUX / FR | 03 /
Potin, Laurent 11A LD La Renauderie 33230 COUTRAS / FR | [2011/04] | Representative(s) | Bréda, Jean-Marc, et al Marks & Clerk France Conseils en Propriété Industrielle Immeuble " Visium " 22 Avenue Aristide Briand 94117 Arcueil Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2011/04] | Bréda, Jean-Marc, et al Marks & Clerk France Conseils en Propriété Industrielle Immeuble " Visium " 22, avenue Aristide Briand 94117 Arcueil Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 10168210.2 | 02.07.2010 | [2011/04] | Priority number, date | FR20090003422 | 10.07.2009 Original published format: FR 0903422 | [2011/04] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2278381 | Date: | 26.01.2011 | Language: | FR | [2011/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.10.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G02B27/00, F41G3/22, G01S5/16, G06F3/01, G02B27/01, G02B5/00, // G02B5/12, G02B27/32 | [2011/04] | CPC: |
G02B27/0093 (EP,US);
F41G3/225 (EP,US);
G01S17/46 (EP,US);
G01S5/163 (EP,US);
G02B27/017 (EP,US);
G02B5/003 (EP,US);
G06F3/012 (EP,US);
G02B2027/0187 (EP,US);
G02B27/32 (EP,US);
G02B5/12 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/04] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Optischer Detektor der Position eines Helms, verwendbar unter grosser Bandbreite der umgebenden Beleuchtung | [2011/04] | English: | Optical helmet position detector usable under a large range of ambient illumination | [2011/04] | French: | Dispositif optique de détection de position de casque utilisable dans une grande gamme d'éclairement ambiant | [2011/04] | Examination procedure | 27.07.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/08] | 12.09.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2012/08] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]FR2723208 (THOMSON CSF [FR]) [X] 1,2 * page 3, line 30 - page 4, line 10 * * figure 2 * [Y] 3-5; | [X]GB2234877 (MARCONI GEC LTD [GB]) [X] 1,2 * page 2, paragraph last * * page 4 * * figures 1,4 *; | [X]US4461553 (DOERR JOSEPH E [US], et al) [X] 1 * column 2, line 15 - line 33 * * column 2, line 66 - line 68 * * figure 2 *; | [Y]EP0317838 (ANRITSU CORP [JP]) [Y] 3,4 * page 2, line 39 - line 43 * * page 3, line 7 - line 17 * * page 4, line 36 - line 37 * * page 5, line 7 - line 10 * * page 15, line 1 - line 12 *; | [Y]US2009126783 (LIN SHAWN-YU [US], et al) [Y] 5 * paragraphs [0006] , [0018] , [0027] *; | [A] - KOHEI MIZUNO, JUNATARO ISHII, HIDEO KISHIDA ET AL., "A black body absorber from vertically aligned single-walled carbon nanotubes", PNAS, (20090414), vol. 106, no. 15, pages 6044 - 6047, XP002571851 [A] 3-5 * page 6044; figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.0900155106 |