EP2401921 - Method and apparatus for making a low density wafer product [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.11.2012 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.12.2012 [2012/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nestec S.A. Avenue Nestlé 55 1800 Vevey / CH | [2012/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Arrachid, Abdessamad 81 Rue Sainte Catherine 59000 Lille / FR | 02 /
De Acutis, Rodolfo / 39, Phoenix Boulevard York, Yorkshire Y026 4WX / GB | 03 /
Leadbeater, Richard R&D Centre Nestle PO box 204 York, Yorkshire YO91 1 XY / GB | 04 /
Powell, Hugh R&D Centre Nestle PO box 204 York, YOrkshire YO91 1 XY / GB | 05 /
Coe, Stephen / Lilac Cottage Main Street Minksip, Yorkshire YO51 9JF / GB | [2012/01] | Representative(s) | Gundel, Isabelle Nestec S.A. CT-IAM Avenue Nestlé 55 1800 Vevey / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2012/01] | Rossand, Isabelle Nestec S.A. CT-PAT Avenue Nestlé 55 1800 Vevey / CH | Application number, filing date | 10168242.5 | 02.07.2010 | [2012/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2401921 | Date: | 04.01.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.01.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A21D13/00, A21C5/00, A21D2/26 | [2012/01] | CPC: |
A21D8/025 (EP,US);
A21D13/00 (RU);
A21C5/006 (EP,US);
A21D13/45 (EP,US);
A21D13/50 (EP,US);
A21D2/188 (EP,US);
A21D2/262 (EP,US);
A21D2/263 (EP,US);
A21D2/265 (EP,US);
A21D6/00 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/01] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Herstellung eines Waffelprodukts mit geringer Dichte | [2012/01] | English: | Method and apparatus for making a low density wafer product | [2012/01] | French: | Procédé et appareil pour fabriquer une gaufrette à faible densité | [2012/01] | Examination procedure | 05.07.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/52] | 13.08.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2012/52] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2012 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1897445 (NESTEC SA [CH]) [X] 8-12,14,15 * claims 1,8-9, 21-24 * * paragraphs [0017] , [0021] *; | [XA]EP2105051 (NESTEC SA [CH]) [X] 14,15 * the whole document * [A] 1-13; | [T]EP2266406 (UNILEVER PLC NO 41424 [GB], et al) [T] 1-15 * the whole document * | [XA] - PRITCHARD P E, STEVENS D J, "The influence of ingredients on the properties of wafer sheets", FOOD TRADE REVIEW, (1974), vol. 44, no. 6, ISSN 0015-6671, pages 12 - 18, XP009143430 [X] 14,15 * the whole document * [A] 1-13 |