EP2234183 - Light emitting device and fabrication method thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.02.2013 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.02.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.03.2013 [2013/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Innotek Co., Ltd. Seoul Square 541, Namdaemunno 5-ga Jung-gu Seoul 100-714 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2010/42] | For all designated states LG Innotek Co., Ltd. Seoul Square 541, Namdaemunno 5-ga Jung-gu Seoul 100-714 / KR | ||
Former [2010/39] | For all designated states LG Innotek Co., Ltd. 14th Fl. Hansol Bldg., 736-1, Yoksam-dong, Kangnam-gu 135-983 Seoul / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Choo, Sung-Ho Seoul Square, 541 Namdaemunno 5-ga, Jung-gu Seoul, 100-714 / KR | 02 /
Jang, Ja-Soon Seoul Square, 541 Namdaemunno 5-ga, Jung-gu Seoul, 100-714 / KR | [2011/13] |
Former [2010/39] | 01 /
Choo, Sung-Ho 978-1, Jangduk-dong Gwangsan-gu 506-831, Gwangju / KR | ||
02 /
Jang, Ja-Soon 978-1, Jang-duk-dong Gwangsan-gu 506-831, Gwangju / KR | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 104 Rue de Richelieu CS92104 75080 Paris Cedex 02 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2010/50] | Cabinet Plasseraud 52, rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [2010/50] | Tranter, Andrew David Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham West Midlands B16 8QQ / GB | ||
Former [2010/39] | Tranter, Andrew David Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 10168505.5 | 17.11.2003 | [2010/39] | Priority number, date | KR20020071432 | 16.11.2002 Original published format: KR 20020071432 | KR20030058209 | 22.08.2003 Original published format: KR 20030058209 | KR20030058210 | 22.08.2003 Original published format: KR 20030058210 | [2010/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2234183 | Date: | 29.09.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2234183 | Date: | 17.08.2011 | [2011/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.07.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H01L33/40, // H01L33/32 | [2011/35] | CPC: |
H01L33/40 (EP,US);
H01L33/32 (EP,US);
Y10S257/918 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2010/39] | H01L33/40 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2010/39] | Title | German: | Lichtemittierendes Bauteil und seine Herstellung | [2010/39] | English: | Light emitting device and fabrication method thereof | [2010/39] | French: | Dispositif luminescent et son procédé de fabrication | [2010/39] | Examination procedure | 17.02.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.02.2012 | Examination requested [2012/13] | 21.05.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.10.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/13] | 07.11.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/13] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP03772905.0 / EP1561247 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20030772905) is 04.11.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 03.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2012 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2002146856 (MORITA ETSUO [JP]) [A] 7 * paragraphs [0017] , [0029] * |