EP2272584 - Line for dispensing and mixing products and related method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.07.2013 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Drocco, Luca Strada Castelgherlone, 42 12051 Alba (CN) / IT | For all designated states Drocco, Mario Localita San Cassiano, 6/29 12051 Alba (CN) / IT | [2011/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2011/02] | Representative(s) | Di Gennaro, Sergio, et al Barzanò & Zanardo Corso Vittorio Emanuele II, 61 10128 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2011/36] | Di Gennaro, Sergio, et al Barzanò & Zanardo Corso Vittorio Emanuele II, 61 10128 Torino / IT | ||
Former [2011/02] | Lotti, Giorgio Barzanò & Zanardo Milano S.p.A. Corso Vittorio Emanuele II, 61 10128 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 10168508.9 | 06.07.2010 | [2011/02] | Priority number, date | IT2009TO00516 | 10.07.2009 Original published format: IT TO20090516 | [2011/02] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2272584 | Date: | 12.01.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2272584 | Date: | 05.09.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.12.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B01F13/10, B01F15/04 | [2011/02] | CPC: |
G06Q20/204 (EP,US);
B01F33/84 (EP,US);
B01F33/8442 (EP,US);
B01F33/85 (EP,US);
B01F35/7131 (EP);
B01F35/88 (EP,US);
B01F2101/30 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/02] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Anordnung zur Ausgabe und Mischung von Produkten | [2011/02] | English: | Line for dispensing and mixing products and related method | [2011/02] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour le dosage et le mélange de produits | [2011/02] | Examination procedure | 11.07.2011 | Examination requested [2011/34] | 19.08.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 13.10.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.02.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.06.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 13.06.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.02.2012 | Opposition(s) | 06.06.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/33] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 13.10.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 13.10.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 26.10.2011 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.07.2010 | AL | 05.09.2012 | AT | 05.09.2012 | BE | 05.09.2012 | CY | 05.09.2012 | CZ | 05.09.2012 | DK | 05.09.2012 | EE | 05.09.2012 | FI | 05.09.2012 | HR | 05.09.2012 | IT | 05.09.2012 | LT | 05.09.2012 | LV | 05.09.2012 | MC | 05.09.2012 | MK | 05.09.2012 | MT | 05.09.2012 | PL | 05.09.2012 | RO | 05.09.2012 | SE | 05.09.2012 | SI | 05.09.2012 | SK | 05.09.2012 | SM | 05.09.2012 | TR | 05.09.2012 | BG | 05.12.2012 | NO | 05.12.2012 | GR | 06.12.2012 | IS | 05.01.2013 | PT | 07.01.2013 | [2018/46] |
Former [2015/34] | HU | 06.07.2010 | |
AT | 05.09.2012 | ||
BE | 05.09.2012 | ||
CY | 05.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 05.09.2012 | ||
DK | 05.09.2012 | ||
EE | 05.09.2012 | ||
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
HR | 05.09.2012 | ||
IT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LV | 05.09.2012 | ||
MC | 05.09.2012 | ||
MK | 05.09.2012 | ||
MT | 05.09.2012 | ||
PL | 05.09.2012 | ||
RO | 05.09.2012 | ||
SE | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
SK | 05.09.2012 | ||
SM | 05.09.2012 | ||
TR | 05.09.2012 | ||
BG | 05.12.2012 | ||
NO | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.12.2012 | ||
IS | 05.01.2013 | ||
PT | 07.01.2013 | ||
Former [2015/32] | AT | 05.09.2012 | |
BE | 05.09.2012 | ||
CY | 05.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 05.09.2012 | ||
DK | 05.09.2012 | ||
EE | 05.09.2012 | ||
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
HR | 05.09.2012 | ||
IT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LV | 05.09.2012 | ||
MC | 05.09.2012 | ||
MK | 05.09.2012 | ||
MT | 05.09.2012 | ||
PL | 05.09.2012 | ||
RO | 05.09.2012 | ||
SE | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
SK | 05.09.2012 | ||
SM | 05.09.2012 | ||
TR | 05.09.2012 | ||
BG | 05.12.2012 | ||
NO | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.12.2012 | ||
IS | 05.01.2013 | ||
PT | 07.01.2013 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 05.09.2012 | |
BE | 05.09.2012 | ||
CY | 05.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 05.09.2012 | ||
DK | 05.09.2012 | ||
EE | 05.09.2012 | ||
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
HR | 05.09.2012 | ||
IT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LV | 05.09.2012 | ||
MC | 05.09.2012 | ||
PL | 05.09.2012 | ||
RO | 05.09.2012 | ||
SE | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
SK | 05.09.2012 | ||
SM | 05.09.2012 | ||
BG | 05.12.2012 | ||
NO | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.12.2012 | ||
IS | 05.01.2013 | ||
PT | 07.01.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | AT | 05.09.2012 | |
BE | 05.09.2012 | ||
CY | 05.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 05.09.2012 | ||
DK | 05.09.2012 | ||
EE | 05.09.2012 | ||
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
HR | 05.09.2012 | ||
IT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LV | 05.09.2012 | ||
MC | 05.09.2012 | ||
PL | 05.09.2012 | ||
RO | 05.09.2012 | ||
SE | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
SK | 05.09.2012 | ||
BG | 05.12.2012 | ||
NO | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.12.2012 | ||
IS | 05.01.2013 | ||
PT | 07.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 05.09.2012 | |
BE | 05.09.2012 | ||
CY | 05.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 05.09.2012 | ||
DK | 05.09.2012 | ||
EE | 05.09.2012 | ||
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
HR | 05.09.2012 | ||
IT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LV | 05.09.2012 | ||
PL | 05.09.2012 | ||
RO | 05.09.2012 | ||
SE | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
SK | 05.09.2012 | ||
BG | 05.12.2012 | ||
NO | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.12.2012 | ||
IS | 05.01.2013 | ||
PT | 07.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 05.09.2012 | |
BE | 05.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 05.09.2012 | ||
DK | 05.09.2012 | ||
EE | 05.09.2012 | ||
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
HR | 05.09.2012 | ||
IT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LV | 05.09.2012 | ||
PL | 05.09.2012 | ||
RO | 05.09.2012 | ||
SE | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
SK | 05.09.2012 | ||
BG | 05.12.2012 | ||
NO | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.12.2012 | ||
IS | 05.01.2013 | ||
PT | 07.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 05.09.2012 | |
BE | 05.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 05.09.2012 | ||
DK | 05.09.2012 | ||
EE | 05.09.2012 | ||
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
HR | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LV | 05.09.2012 | ||
PL | 05.09.2012 | ||
RO | 05.09.2012 | ||
SE | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
SK | 05.09.2012 | ||
BG | 05.12.2012 | ||
NO | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.12.2012 | ||
IS | 05.01.2013 | ||
PT | 07.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/28] | AT | 05.09.2012 | |
BE | 05.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 05.09.2012 | ||
EE | 05.09.2012 | ||
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
HR | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LV | 05.09.2012 | ||
PL | 05.09.2012 | ||
RO | 05.09.2012 | ||
SE | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
SK | 05.09.2012 | ||
NO | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.12.2012 | ||
IS | 05.01.2013 | ||
PT | 07.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | AT | 05.09.2012 | |
BE | 05.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 05.09.2012 | ||
EE | 05.09.2012 | ||
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
HR | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LV | 05.09.2012 | ||
PL | 05.09.2012 | ||
RO | 05.09.2012 | ||
SE | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
SK | 05.09.2012 | ||
NO | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.12.2012 | ||
IS | 05.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 05.09.2012 | |
BE | 05.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 05.09.2012 | ||
EE | 05.09.2012 | ||
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
HR | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LV | 05.09.2012 | ||
SE | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
NO | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.12.2012 | ||
IS | 05.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/20] | AT | 05.09.2012 | |
BE | 05.09.2012 | ||
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
HR | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LV | 05.09.2012 | ||
SE | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
NO | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | AT | 05.09.2012 | |
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
HR | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LV | 05.09.2012 | ||
SE | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
NO | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | AT | 05.09.2012 | |
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
HR | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LV | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
NO | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | AT | 05.09.2012 | |
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
HR | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
NO | 05.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | AT | 05.09.2012 | |
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
NO | 05.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 05.09.2012 | |
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
NO | 05.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 05.09.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2007110764 (DINELLI MASSIMO [IT], et al) [X] 1-4,9-13 * page 7, paragraph 3 - page 10, paragraph 1; figures 1-3,12 *; | [A]EP1764149 (GERHARDT FABRIK UND LAGER CHEM [DE], et al) [A] 1-4,9-13 * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0018]; figure 1 *; | [A]US2003110101 (FRIEL JOHN MICHAEL [US], et al) [A] 1-4,9-13 * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0030] *; | [A]US5622692 (RIGG RICHARD T [US], et al) [A] 1-4,9-13 * abstract * | by applicant | WO2007110764 |