EP2292501 - Device for fixing accessories in a motorcycle, in particular for a windshield [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.07.2015 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PIAGGIO & C. S.p.A. Viale Rinaldo Piaggio 25 56025 Pontedera (Pisa) / IT | [2014/35] |
Former [2011/10] | For all designated states PIAGGIO & C. S.p.A. Viale Rinaldo Piaggio 25 56025 Pontedera (Pisa) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Carrabs, Stefano Via Aurelio Saffi 7 56020, Santa Maria a Monte PI / IT | 02 /
Gracci, Alberto Via Vittorio Bachelet 3 56025, Pontedera PI / IT | [2014/35] |
Former [2011/10] | 01 /
Carrabs, Stefano Via Aurelio Saffi 7 56020, Santa Maria a Monte PI / IT | ||
02 /
Gracci, Alberto Via Vittorio Bachelet 3 56025, Pontedera PI / IT | Representative(s) | Mitola, Marco, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Via Senato, 8 20121 Milano / IT | [2012/33] |
Former [2011/10] | Coletti, Raimondo, et al Barzanò & Zanardo Milano S.p.A. Via Borgonuovo, 10 20121 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 10168678.0 | 07.07.2010 | [2011/10] | Priority number, date | IT2009MI01544 | 07.09.2009 Original published format: IT MI20091544 | [2011/10] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2292501 | Date: | 09.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2292501 | Date: | 27.08.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.12.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B62J17/04, B62K19/40, F16B7/14, F16B39/04, F16B39/10 | [2011/10] | CPC: |
B62K19/30 (EP,US);
B62J11/00 (EP);
B62J17/04 (EP);
F16B41/002 (EP,US);
F16B7/1445 (EP,US);
Y10T403/70 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/10] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Befestigung von Zubehör an einem Motorrad, insbesondere für eine Windschutzscheibe | [2011/10] | English: | Device for fixing accessories in a motorcycle, in particular for a windshield | [2011/10] | French: | Dispositif permettant de fixer des accessoires sur und motocyclette en particulier pour un pare-brise de motocyclette | [2011/10] | Examination procedure | 25.07.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.07.2011 | Examination requested [2011/35] | 20.06.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.07.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 15.07.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.07.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.06.2014 | Opposition(s) | 28.05.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.07.2010 | AL | 27.08.2014 | BE | 27.08.2014 | CY | 27.08.2014 | CZ | 27.08.2014 | DK | 27.08.2014 | EE | 27.08.2014 | FI | 27.08.2014 | HR | 27.08.2014 | LT | 27.08.2014 | LV | 27.08.2014 | MC | 27.08.2014 | MK | 27.08.2014 | MT | 27.08.2014 | NL | 27.08.2014 | PL | 27.08.2014 | RO | 27.08.2014 | SE | 27.08.2014 | SI | 27.08.2014 | SK | 27.08.2014 | SM | 27.08.2014 | TR | 27.08.2014 | BG | 27.11.2014 | NO | 27.11.2014 | GR | 28.11.2014 | IS | 27.12.2014 | PT | 29.12.2014 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/30] | HU | 07.07.2010 | |
BE | 27.08.2014 | ||
CY | 27.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 27.08.2014 | ||
DK | 27.08.2014 | ||
EE | 27.08.2014 | ||
FI | 27.08.2014 | ||
HR | 27.08.2014 | ||
LT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LV | 27.08.2014 | ||
MC | 27.08.2014 | ||
MK | 27.08.2014 | ||
MT | 27.08.2014 | ||
NL | 27.08.2014 | ||
PL | 27.08.2014 | ||
RO | 27.08.2014 | ||
SE | 27.08.2014 | ||
SI | 27.08.2014 | ||
SK | 27.08.2014 | ||
SM | 27.08.2014 | ||
TR | 27.08.2014 | ||
BG | 27.11.2014 | ||
NO | 27.11.2014 | ||
GR | 28.11.2014 | ||
IS | 27.12.2014 | ||
PT | 29.12.2014 | ||
Former [2017/38] | HU | 07.07.2010 | |
BE | 27.08.2014 | ||
CY | 27.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 27.08.2014 | ||
DK | 27.08.2014 | ||
EE | 27.08.2014 | ||
FI | 27.08.2014 | ||
HR | 27.08.2014 | ||
LT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LV | 27.08.2014 | ||
MC | 27.08.2014 | ||
MT | 27.08.2014 | ||
NL | 27.08.2014 | ||
PL | 27.08.2014 | ||
RO | 27.08.2014 | ||
SE | 27.08.2014 | ||
SI | 27.08.2014 | ||
SK | 27.08.2014 | ||
SM | 27.08.2014 | ||
TR | 27.08.2014 | ||
BG | 27.11.2014 | ||
NO | 27.11.2014 | ||
GR | 28.11.2014 | ||
IS | 27.12.2014 | ||
PT | 29.12.2014 | ||
Former [2017/21] | BE | 27.08.2014 | |
CY | 27.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 27.08.2014 | ||
DK | 27.08.2014 | ||
EE | 27.08.2014 | ||
FI | 27.08.2014 | ||
HR | 27.08.2014 | ||
LT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LV | 27.08.2014 | ||
MC | 27.08.2014 | ||
MT | 27.08.2014 | ||
NL | 27.08.2014 | ||
PL | 27.08.2014 | ||
RO | 27.08.2014 | ||
SE | 27.08.2014 | ||
SI | 27.08.2014 | ||
SK | 27.08.2014 | ||
BG | 27.11.2014 | ||
NO | 27.11.2014 | ||
GR | 28.11.2014 | ||
IS | 27.12.2014 | ||
PT | 29.12.2014 | ||
Former [2016/33] | BE | 27.08.2014 | |
CY | 27.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 27.08.2014 | ||
DK | 27.08.2014 | ||
EE | 27.08.2014 | ||
FI | 27.08.2014 | ||
HR | 27.08.2014 | ||
LT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LV | 27.08.2014 | ||
MC | 27.08.2014 | ||
NL | 27.08.2014 | ||
PL | 27.08.2014 | ||
RO | 27.08.2014 | ||
SE | 27.08.2014 | ||
SI | 27.08.2014 | ||
SK | 27.08.2014 | ||
BG | 27.11.2014 | ||
NO | 27.11.2014 | ||
GR | 28.11.2014 | ||
IS | 27.12.2014 | ||
PT | 29.12.2014 | ||
Former [2016/13] | CY | 27.08.2014 | |
CZ | 27.08.2014 | ||
DK | 27.08.2014 | ||
EE | 27.08.2014 | ||
FI | 27.08.2014 | ||
HR | 27.08.2014 | ||
LT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LV | 27.08.2014 | ||
MC | 27.08.2014 | ||
NL | 27.08.2014 | ||
PL | 27.08.2014 | ||
RO | 27.08.2014 | ||
SE | 27.08.2014 | ||
SI | 27.08.2014 | ||
SK | 27.08.2014 | ||
BG | 27.11.2014 | ||
NO | 27.11.2014 | ||
GR | 28.11.2014 | ||
IS | 27.12.2014 | ||
PT | 29.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/50] | CY | 27.08.2014 | |
CZ | 27.08.2014 | ||
DK | 27.08.2014 | ||
EE | 27.08.2014 | ||
FI | 27.08.2014 | ||
HR | 27.08.2014 | ||
LT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LV | 27.08.2014 | ||
NL | 27.08.2014 | ||
PL | 27.08.2014 | ||
RO | 27.08.2014 | ||
SE | 27.08.2014 | ||
SI | 27.08.2014 | ||
SK | 27.08.2014 | ||
BG | 27.11.2014 | ||
NO | 27.11.2014 | ||
GR | 28.11.2014 | ||
IS | 27.12.2014 | ||
PT | 29.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | CY | 27.08.2014 | |
CZ | 27.08.2014 | ||
DK | 27.08.2014 | ||
EE | 27.08.2014 | ||
FI | 27.08.2014 | ||
HR | 27.08.2014 | ||
LT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LV | 27.08.2014 | ||
NL | 27.08.2014 | ||
PL | 27.08.2014 | ||
RO | 27.08.2014 | ||
SE | 27.08.2014 | ||
SK | 27.08.2014 | ||
BG | 27.11.2014 | ||
NO | 27.11.2014 | ||
GR | 28.11.2014 | ||
IS | 27.12.2014 | ||
PT | 29.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/23] | CY | 27.08.2014 | |
CZ | 27.08.2014 | ||
DK | 27.08.2014 | ||
EE | 27.08.2014 | ||
FI | 27.08.2014 | ||
HR | 27.08.2014 | ||
LT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LV | 27.08.2014 | ||
NL | 27.08.2014 | ||
RO | 27.08.2014 | ||
SE | 27.08.2014 | ||
SK | 27.08.2014 | ||
BG | 27.11.2014 | ||
NO | 27.11.2014 | ||
GR | 28.11.2014 | ||
IS | 27.12.2014 | ||
PT | 29.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | CY | 27.08.2014 | |
DK | 27.08.2014 | ||
FI | 27.08.2014 | ||
HR | 27.08.2014 | ||
LT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LV | 27.08.2014 | ||
NL | 27.08.2014 | ||
RO | 27.08.2014 | ||
SE | 27.08.2014 | ||
BG | 27.11.2014 | ||
NO | 27.11.2014 | ||
GR | 28.11.2014 | ||
IS | 27.12.2014 | ||
PT | 29.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/16] | CY | 27.08.2014 | |
FI | 27.08.2014 | ||
HR | 27.08.2014 | ||
LT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LV | 27.08.2014 | ||
NL | 27.08.2014 | ||
SE | 27.08.2014 | ||
BG | 27.11.2014 | ||
NO | 27.11.2014 | ||
GR | 28.11.2014 | ||
IS | 27.12.2014 | ||
PT | 29.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | CY | 27.08.2014 | |
FI | 27.08.2014 | ||
HR | 27.08.2014 | ||
LT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LV | 27.08.2014 | ||
SE | 27.08.2014 | ||
BG | 27.11.2014 | ||
NO | 27.11.2014 | ||
GR | 28.11.2014 | ||
IS | 27.12.2014 | ||
PT | 29.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 27.08.2014 | |
FI | 27.08.2014 | ||
LT | 27.08.2014 | ||
SE | 27.08.2014 | ||
BG | 27.11.2014 | ||
NO | 27.11.2014 | ||
GR | 28.11.2014 | ||
PT | 29.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | FI | 27.08.2014 | |
LT | 27.08.2014 | ||
SE | 27.08.2014 | ||
BG | 27.11.2014 | ||
NO | 27.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | FI | 27.08.2014 | |
LT | 27.08.2014 | ||
SE | 27.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | LT | 27.08.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2263259 (PIAGGIO VEICOLI EUROP [IT]) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0650885 (PIAGGIO VEICOLI EUROP [IT]) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1362776 (PIAGGIO & C SPA [IT]) [A] 1-9* the whole document * |