blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2275220

EP2275220 - Method for reinforcing components from a TiAl base material and corresponding components [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  22.02.2019
Database last updated on 26.04.2025
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  17.05.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip22.02.2019Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 27.03.2019  [2019/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MTU Aero Engines AG
Dachauer Strasse 665
80995 München / DE
[2015/28]
Former [2014/42]For all designated states
MTU Aero Engines GmbH
Dachauer Strasse 665
80995 München / DE
Former [2011/03]For all designated states
MTU Aero Engines GmbH
Dachauer Strasse 665
80995 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Jakimov, Andreas
Alte Allee 61
81245 München / DE
02 / Richter, Karl-Hermann
Am Keltenhang 29
85229 Markt Indersdorf / DE
 [2011/03]
Application number, filing date10169059.209.07.2010
[2011/03]
Priority number, dateDE2009103256410.07.2009         Original published format: DE102009032564
[2011/03]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2275220
Date:19.01.2011
Language:DE
[2011/03]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.11.2010
ClassificationIPC:B23K9/04, B23K26/34, F01D5/28, B23K26/14, B23K35/30, B32B15/01
[2011/03]
CPC:
B23K9/04 (EP); B23K26/144 (EP); B23K26/32 (EP);
B23K26/34 (EP); B23K26/342 (EP); B23K35/30 (EP);
B23K35/3033 (EP); B23K35/3046 (EP); B23K35/34 (EP);
B32B15/01 (EP); C22C19/03 (EP); C22C19/07 (EP);
C22C27/06 (EP); F01D11/02 (EP); F01D5/225 (EP);
B23K2101/001 (EP); B23K2103/08 (EP); B23K2103/10 (EP);
B23K2103/14 (EP); B23K2103/18 (EP); B23K2103/26 (EP);
F05C2201/0463 (EP); F05C2201/0466 (EP); F05D2300/506 (EP);
F05D2300/702 (EP); Y02T50/60 (EP) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2011/03]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Panzerung von Bauteilen aus einem TiAl-Basiswerkstoff, sowie entsprechende Bauteile[2011/03]
English:Method for reinforcing components from a TiAl base material and corresponding components[2011/03]
French:Procédé de blindage de composants à partir d'une matière première à base de TiAl et composants correspondants[2011/03]
Examination procedure18.09.1961Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
19.07.2011Examination requested  [2011/35]
18.05.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.09.2018Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2019/13]
08.11.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2019/13]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  18.05.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.07.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
30.07.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
30.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
30.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 06
28.07.2016Renewal fee patent year 07
27.07.2017Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.201809   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[XY]EP1054077  (ROLLS ROYCE PLC [GB]) [X] 1,2,4-14 * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0039]; figure 3 * * paragraph [0043] * [Y] 3,15;
 [XY]US2007281175  (HOFFMANN CARINE [FR], et al) [X] 1,2,4-14 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0007]; figure 2 * * examples 1,2,5 * [Y] 3,15;
 [A]WO2009046699  (ACCESS EV [DE], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [YD]EP1643011  (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [YD] 3,15 * the whole document *
by applicantEP1643011
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.