EP2407529 - Peroxygen composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.12.2012 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.01.2013 [2013/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SOLVAY SA Rue de Ransbeek, 310 1120 Bruxelles / BE | [2012/33] |
Former [2012/03] | For all designated states Solvay SA Rue du Prince Albert, 33 1050 Brussels / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Candy, Thomas E. 1 Pensarns Gardens, Callands C heshire Warrington, Merseyside WA5 9RF / GB | 02 /
Malone, Joseph W. 26 Thingwall Lane Liverpool, Merseyside L14 7NX / GB | [2012/03] | Representative(s) | Vande Gucht, Anne, et al Solvay S.A. Intellectual Assets Management Rue de Ransbeek, 310 1120 Bruxelles / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/03] | Vande Gucht, Anne, et al Solvay S.A. Intellectual Assets Management Rue de Ransbeek, 310 1120 Bruxelles / BE | Application number, filing date | 10169207.7 | 12.07.2010 | [2012/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2407529 | Date: | 18.01.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.03.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C11D1/62, C11D1/835, C11D3/00, C11D3/39 | [2012/03] | CPC: |
C11D1/62 (EP);
C11D1/835 (EP);
C11D3/3945 (EP);
C11D3/48 (EP);
C11D1/72 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/03] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Peroxygenzusammensetzung | [2012/03] | English: | Peroxygen composition | [2012/03] | French: | Composition de peroxygène | [2012/03] | Examination procedure | 19.07.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/02] | 24.08.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2013/02] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2012 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO9400548 (LAPORTE E S D LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1-8,10-12,15 * page 1, line 22 - page 4, line 23; example - * [I] 9; | [IA]US2002128164 (HARA YASUSHI [JP], et al) [I] 1-12 * paragraphs [0018] - [0021] - [0025]; example -; claim - * [A] 15; | [A]EP1192860 (AIR LIQUIDE SANTE INT [FR], et al) [A] 1-12,15 * paragraphs [0015] - [0019]; table 2 * | by applicant | US2003109403 | US2002192340 |