EP2233531 - Curable composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 26.10.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.10.2018 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 28.11.2018 [2018/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KANEKA CORPORATION 2-3-18, Nakanoshima Kita-ku Osaka / JP | [2014/19] |
Former [2013/31] | For all designated states KANEKA CORPORATION 2-3-18, Nakanoshima, Kita-ku Osaka / JP | ||
Former [2013/21] | For all designated states Kaneka Corporation 2-3-18, Nakanoshima, Kita-ku Osaka 530-8288 / JP | ||
Former [2010/39] | For all designated states Kaneka Corporation 2-4, Nakanoshima 3-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8288 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Okamoto, Toshihiko c/o KANEKA CORPORATION 1-8 Miyamae-cho, Takasago-cho Takasago-shi Hyogo 676-0027 / JP | 02 /
Wakabayashi, Katsuyu c/o KANEKA CORPORATION 1-8 Miyamae-cho, Takasago-cho Takasago-shi Hyogo 676-0027 / JP | 03 /
Ito, Hiroshi c/o KANEKA CORPORATION 1-8 Miyamae-cho, Takasago-cho Takasago-shi Hyogo 676-0027 / JP | 04 /
Ando, Hiroshi c/o KANEKA CORPORATION 1-8 Miyamae-cho, Takasago-cho Takasago-shi Hyogo 676-0027 / JP | [2014/19] |
Former [2010/39] | 01 /
Okamoto, Toshihiko c/o KANEKA CORPORATION 1-8 Miyamae-cho, Takasago-cho Takasago-shi Hyogo 676-0027 / JP | ||
02 /
Wakabayashi, Katsuyu c/o KANEKA CORPORATION 1-8 Miyamae-cho, Takasago-cho Takasago-shi Hyogo 676-0027 / JP | |||
03 /
Ito, Hiroshi c/o KANEKA CORPORATION 1-8 Miyamae-cho, Takasago-cho Takasago-shi Hyogo 676-0027 / JP | |||
04 /
Ando, Hiroshi c/o KANEKA CORPORATION 1-8 Miyamae-cho, Takasago-cho Takasago-shi Hyogo 676-0027 / JP | Representative(s) | Hart-Davis, Jason, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [2018/48] |
Former [2010/39] | Hart-Davis, Jason, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 10169285.3 | 22.10.2003 | [2010/39] | Priority number, date | JP20020319335 | 01.11.2002 Original published format: JP 2002319335 | JP20020364490 | 16.12.2002 Original published format: JP 2002364490 | [2010/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2233531 | Date: | 29.09.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2233531 | Date: | 07.05.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/19] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP2233531 | Date: | 28.11.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.08.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C08L101/10, C09J201/10, C09K3/10, C08G65/336 | [2018/12] | CPC: |
C08L101/10 (EP,US);
C08G65/336 (US);
C09K3/1018 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2010/39] | C08L101/10, C09J201/10, C09K3/10 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, NL [2018/48] |
Former [2010/39] | BE, DE, FR, GB, NL | Title | German: | Härtbare Zusammensetzung | [2010/39] | English: | Curable composition | [2010/39] | French: | Composition durcissable | [2010/39] | Examination procedure | 12.07.2010 | Examination requested [2010/39] | 23.03.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.04.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.09.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.10.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.01.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.01.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.06.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.06.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.10.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.02.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.04.2013 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 19.12.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.03.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 31.03.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.03.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP03758787.0 / EP1566412 | EP07111208.0 / EP1832627 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20030758787) is 27.02.2006 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
22.01.2015
27.01.2015
ADMISSIBLE Wacker Chemie AG Hanns-Seidel-Platz 4 81737 München / DE Opponent's representative Mieskes, Klaus Theoderich, et al, et al Wacker Chemie AG Gisela-Stein-Straße 1 81671 München / DE | 02
05.02.2015
11.02.2015
ADMISSIBLE Henkel AG & Co. KGaA Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/19] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
22.01.2015
27.01.2015
ADMISSIBLE Wacker Chemie AG Hanns-Seidel-Platz 4 81737 München / DE Opponent's representative Mieskes, Klaus Theoderich, et al, et al Wacker Chemie AG Intellectual Property Hanns-Seidel-Platz 4 81737 München / DE | ||
02
05.02.2015
11.02.2015
ADMISSIBLE Henkel AG & Co. KGaA Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | |||
Former [2015/12] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
22.01.2015
27.01.2015
ADMISSIBLE Wacker Chemie AG Hanns-Seidel-Platz 4 81737 München / DE Opponent's representative Mieskes, Klaus Theoderich, et al, et al Wacker Chemie AG Intellectual Property Hanns-Seidel-Platz 4 81737 München / DE | ||
02
05.02.2015
11.02.2015
ADMISSIBLE Henkel AG & Co. KGaA Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE Opponent's representative Peters, Frank M., et al, et al Henkel AG & Co. KGaA CLI Patents 40191 Düsseldorf / DE | |||
Former [2015/10] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
22.01.2015
27.01.2015
ADMISSIBLE Wacker Chemie AG Hanns-Seidel-Platz 4 81737 München / DE Opponent's representative Mieskes, Klaus Theoderich, et al, et al Wacker Chemie AG Intellectual Property Hanns-Seidel-Platz 4 81737 München / DE | 16.03.2015 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 21.09.2015 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 06.06.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 13.10.2016 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 18.01.2018 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 07.02.2018 | 07.02.2018 | Date of oral proceedings | 23.04.2018 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 03.05.2018 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 07.09.2018 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 22.10.2018 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 21.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 23.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 07.05.2014 | NL | 07.05.2014 | FR | 31.10.2014 | [2015/38] |
Former [2015/12] | BE | 07.05.2014 | |
NL | 07.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | BE | 07.05.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3857825 (STRECK R, et al) [X] 1-14* examples 1-17; claims 1-19 *; | [X]US5399607 (NANBU TOSHIRO [JP], et al) [X] 1-14 * examples 1-8; claims 1-16 *; | [X]US5639825 (NANBU TOSHIRO [JP], et al) [X] 1-14 * examples 1-3; claims 1-15 *; | [X]US6204350 (LIU JUNKANG JACOB [US], et al) [X] 1-14 * examples 1-93; claims 1-51 *; | [X]US6271309 (ROBERTS GARY P [US], et al) [X] 1-14 * examples 1-12; claims 1-48 *; | [X]US6287701 (OOCHI IKUROU [JP], et al) [X] 1-14 * examples 1-11; claims 1-17 * | by applicant | JPS4536319B | JPS4612154B | US3278457 | US3278458 | US3278459 | US3427256 | US3427334 | US3427335 | JPS4627250B | US3632557 | JPS50156599 | JPS546096 | JPS5513767 | JPS5513468 | US4345053 | JPS57164123 | US4366307 | JPS5915336 | JPS5978223 | JPS59122541 | JPS59168014 | JPS60228516 | JPS60228517 | JPS61167631 | JPS61215623 | JPS61215622 | JPS61218632 | JPS63112642 | JPS63254149 | JPS6422904 | JPH01168764 | JPH01197509 | US4960844 | JPH032450 | JPH0314068 | JPH0347825 | JPH0372527 | JPH03160053 | JPH0455444 | JPH0469659 | JPH04283259 | JPH0570531 | JPH05117521 | JPH05287187 | JPH06172631 | JPH06211922 | JPH06279693 | JPH0753882 | JPH07108928 | JPH07258534 | JPH08231707 | JP2539445B | JPH09194731 | JPH09272714 | JPH10245482 | JPH10245484 | JPH10251552 | JPH10273512 | WO9847939 | JPH10324793 | JPH10330630 | JPH1112473 | JPH1112480 | JPH1121463 | JPH1129713 | JPH1135923 | JPH1149969 | JPH1149970 | JPH1160722 | JP2873395B | JPH11116831 | JPH11116763 | JPH11124509 | JPH11209639 | JPH11241029 | JPH11310772 | JP2000034391 | JP2000109676 | JP2000109677 | JP2000109678 | JP2000129126 | JP2000129145 | JP2000129146 | JP2000129147 | JP2000136312 | JP2000136313 | JP2000186176 | JP2000239338 | JP2000327771 | JP2001055503 | JP2001072854 | JP2001072855 | JP2001207157 | - J. P. KENNEDY ET AL., J. POLYMER SCI., POLYMER CHEM. ED., (1997), vol. 15, page 2843 | - MATYJASZEWSKI ET AL., JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, (1995), vol. 117, page 5.614 | Opposition | EP0520426 | JPH1072540 | JPH10251552 | JPH10330630 | JPH1112480 | JPH1129713 | JPH1149969 | EP0918062 | JP2000109676 | JP2000109677 | JP2000109678 | JP2000136312 | JP2000136313 | JP2000239338 | WO0112693 | JP2001072855 | - MORSE P.M. ET AL, ADHESIVES AND SEALANTS, SPECIALTY CHEMICALS SRI INTERNATIONAL, (200011), pages 2-5 - 128,140 | - HUTCHINSON A.R. ET AL, "BUILDING JOINT MOVEMENT MONITORING AND DEVELOPMENT OF LABARATORY SIMULATION RIGS", HUTCHINSON A.R. ET AL, WOLF A.T., DURABILITY OF BUILDING SEALANTS. PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL RILEM SYMPOSIUM ON DURABILITY OF BUILDING SEALANTS, LONDON, E & FN SPON, (1999), ISBN 0-419-24930-3 | - BURCHARDT B. ET AL, "ELASTIC BONDING - THE BASIC PRINCIPLES OF ADHESIVE TECHNOLOGY AND A GUIDE TO ITS COST-EFFECTIVE USE IN INDUSTRY", HIGH-TECH INDUSTRIAL ADHESIVES - TECHNICAL FUNDAMENTALS AND INDUSTRIAL APPLICATIONS, VERLAG MODERNE INDUSTRIE, (1998), pages 4 - 70 | - TOMANEK ANDREAS, SILICONES & INDUSTRY - A COMPENDIUM FOR PLACTICAL USE, INSTRUCTION AND REFERENCE, MUNICH, DE, WACKER-CHEMIE GMBH, (199107), pages 1,2,4-7 - 116-123, ISBN 3-446-17264-5 | - "SIKAFLEX ELASTOMERIC SEALANTS - JOIN DESIGN & MOVEMENT CALCULATION GUIDE", AUGUST 2004, PAGES 1 TO 4 | - "SEALANTS FOR BUILDING AND CONSTRUCTION - THE FUNDAMENTALS AND THE PROPER WAY OF USING", 25 MARCH 2002, JAPAN SEALANT INDUSTRY ASSOCIATION, TOKYO, JAPAN; PAGES 87,334 |