EP2275597 - Clothes drying rack [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.12.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.12.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.01.2017 [2017/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Leifheit AG Leifheitstrasse 1 56377 Nassau / DE | [2011/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fischer, Klaus-Jürgen Leifheit AG Dörnberg-Hütte 14 56379 Holzappel / DE | [2011/03] | Representative(s) | Bungartz, Klaus Peter, et al Bungartz Christophersen Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Im Mediapark 6A 50670 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/03] | Bungartz, Klaus Peter Patentanwälte Bungartz & Tersteegen Eupener Strasse 161a 50933 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 10169318.2 | 12.07.2010 | [2011/03] | Priority number, date | DE20091032727 | 11.07.2009 Original published format: DE102009032727 | [2011/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2275597 | Date: | 19.01.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.11.2010 | Classification | IPC: | D06F57/12 | [2011/03] | CPC: |
D06F57/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/03] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Wäschetrockner | [2011/03] | English: | Clothes drying rack | [2011/03] | French: | Séchoir à linge | [2011/03] | Examination procedure | 19.07.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.07.2011 | Examination requested [2011/35] | 18.03.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.07.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/03] | 02.09.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2017/03] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.03.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2016 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP1186696 (GOOCH IVAN ARTHUR VICTOR [GB]) [X] 1-3,6-9 * paragraphs [0001] - [0003] * * paragraphs [0026] - [0031] * * paragraphs [0037] - [0040] * * figures 1-7 * [I] 11,12; | [XYI]CH685302 (STEINER WALTER) [X] 1,2,6 * column 1, line 39 - column 2, line 52 * * figure 1 * [Y] 14,15 [I] 3-5,13; | [Y]WO9859104 (BENELI MEIR [AU], et al) [Y] 14,15 * abstract *; | [A]DE202007018631U (CASA SI MARKETING UND VERTRIEB [AT]) [A] 1-13 * paragraphs [0040] , [0041]; figures 1-7 *; | [A]DE328816 (MAX FEUERABEND) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [A]DE29802952U (PAREDES GONZALEZ MANUEL [ES]) [A] 1 * page 6, lines 4-11; figures 1-5 * | by applicant | US2008277358 | DE29911195U | DE3723490 |