EP2276277 - Device programmable network based packet filter [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.06.2014 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rockstar Consortium US LP 2201 Lakeside Boulevard Suite 1N-110 Richardson, TX 75082 / US | [2014/24] |
Former [2011/03] | For all designated states Nortel Networks Limited 2351 Boulevard Alfred-Nobel St. Laurent, QC H4S 2A9 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sauter, Martin Marktplatz 1 88677, Markdorf / DE | 02 /
Illidge, Ed 2 Grierson Lane, Kanata Ontario Ontario K2W 1A6 / CA | 03 /
Ding, Wayne Wei 28 Glen Meadows Circle, Kanata Ontario Ontario K2M 2W8 / CA | [2013/34] |
Former [2011/03] | 01 /
Sauter, Martin Marktplatz 1 88677, Markdorf / DE | ||
02 /
Illidge, Ed 2 Grierson Lane, Kanata Ontario Ontario K2W 1A6 / CA | |||
03 /
Ding, Wayne Wei 28 Glen Meadows Circle, Kanata Ontario Ontario K2M 2W8 / CA | Representative(s) | Brophy, David Timothy, et al FRKelly 27 Clyde Road Dublin D04 F838 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/38] | Brophy, David Timothy, et al FRKelly 27 Clyde Road Ballsbridge Dublin 4 / IE | ||
Former [2013/34] | Kelly, Madeleine FRKelly 27 Clyde Road Ballsbridge Dublin 4 / IE | ||
Former [2011/03] | Kelly, Madeleine FRKelly 27 Clyde Road Ballsbridge Dublin 4 / IE | Application number, filing date | 10169393.5 | 13.07.2010 | [2011/03] | Priority number, date | US20090503266 | 15.07.2009 Original published format: US 503266 | [2011/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2276277 | Date: | 19.01.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2276277 | Date: | 21.08.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.11.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H04W12/00, H04L29/06 | [2011/03] | CPC: |
H04L63/0236 (EP,KR,US);
H04L63/101 (EP,KR,US);
H04L63/1416 (EP,KR,US);
H04W12/088 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/03] | Title | German: | Vorrichtungsprogrammierbarer, netzwerkbasierter Paketfilter | [2011/03] | English: | Device programmable network based packet filter | [2011/03] | French: | Filtre de paquet basé sur un réseau programmable de dispositif | [2011/03] | Examination procedure | 19.07.2011 | Examination requested [2011/35] | 25.08.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 01.09.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.11.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.01.2013 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 28.02.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.06.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 14.06.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.11.2012 | Opposition(s) | 22.05.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/31] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 01.09.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 01.09.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 14.09.2011 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.07.2010 | AL | 21.08.2013 | AT | 21.08.2013 | BE | 21.08.2013 | BG | 21.08.2013 | CY | 21.08.2013 | CZ | 21.08.2013 | DK | 21.08.2013 | EE | 21.08.2013 | ES | 21.08.2013 | FI | 21.08.2013 | HR | 21.08.2013 | IT | 21.08.2013 | LT | 21.08.2013 | LV | 21.08.2013 | MC | 21.08.2013 | MK | 21.08.2013 | MT | 21.08.2013 | NL | 21.08.2013 | PL | 21.08.2013 | RO | 21.08.2013 | SE | 21.08.2013 | SI | 21.08.2013 | SK | 21.08.2013 | SM | 21.08.2013 | TR | 21.08.2013 | NO | 21.11.2013 | GR | 22.11.2013 | IS | 21.12.2013 | PT | 23.12.2013 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/30] | HU | 13.07.2010 | |
AT | 21.08.2013 | ||
BE | 21.08.2013 | ||
BG | 21.08.2013 | ||
CY | 21.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 21.08.2013 | ||
DK | 21.08.2013 | ||
EE | 21.08.2013 | ||
ES | 21.08.2013 | ||
FI | 21.08.2013 | ||
HR | 21.08.2013 | ||
IT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LV | 21.08.2013 | ||
MC | 21.08.2013 | ||
MK | 21.08.2013 | ||
MT | 21.08.2013 | ||
NL | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
RO | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
SI | 21.08.2013 | ||
SK | 21.08.2013 | ||
SM | 21.08.2013 | ||
TR | 21.08.2013 | ||
NO | 21.11.2013 | ||
GR | 22.11.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2016/33] | HU | 13.07.2010 | |
AT | 21.08.2013 | ||
BE | 21.08.2013 | ||
BG | 21.08.2013 | ||
CY | 21.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 21.08.2013 | ||
DK | 21.08.2013 | ||
EE | 21.08.2013 | ||
ES | 21.08.2013 | ||
FI | 21.08.2013 | ||
HR | 21.08.2013 | ||
IT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LV | 21.08.2013 | ||
MC | 21.08.2013 | ||
MT | 21.08.2013 | ||
NL | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
RO | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
SI | 21.08.2013 | ||
SK | 21.08.2013 | ||
SM | 21.08.2013 | ||
TR | 21.08.2013 | ||
NO | 21.11.2013 | ||
GR | 22.11.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 13.07.2010 | |
AT | 21.08.2013 | ||
BE | 21.08.2013 | ||
BG | 21.08.2013 | ||
CY | 21.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 21.08.2013 | ||
DK | 21.08.2013 | ||
EE | 21.08.2013 | ||
ES | 21.08.2013 | ||
FI | 21.08.2013 | ||
HR | 21.08.2013 | ||
IT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LV | 21.08.2013 | ||
MC | 21.08.2013 | ||
MT | 21.08.2013 | ||
NL | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
RO | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
SI | 21.08.2013 | ||
SK | 21.08.2013 | ||
SM | 21.08.2013 | ||
NO | 21.11.2013 | ||
GR | 22.11.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 21.08.2013 | |
BE | 21.08.2013 | ||
BG | 21.08.2013 | ||
CY | 21.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 21.08.2013 | ||
DK | 21.08.2013 | ||
EE | 21.08.2013 | ||
ES | 21.08.2013 | ||
FI | 21.08.2013 | ||
HR | 21.08.2013 | ||
IT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LV | 21.08.2013 | ||
MC | 21.08.2013 | ||
MT | 21.08.2013 | ||
NL | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
RO | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
SI | 21.08.2013 | ||
SK | 21.08.2013 | ||
SM | 21.08.2013 | ||
NO | 21.11.2013 | ||
GR | 22.11.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 21.08.2013 | |
BE | 21.08.2013 | ||
CY | 21.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 21.08.2013 | ||
DK | 21.08.2013 | ||
EE | 21.08.2013 | ||
ES | 21.08.2013 | ||
FI | 21.08.2013 | ||
HR | 21.08.2013 | ||
IT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LV | 21.08.2013 | ||
MC | 21.08.2013 | ||
NL | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
RO | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
SI | 21.08.2013 | ||
SK | 21.08.2013 | ||
SM | 21.08.2013 | ||
NO | 21.11.2013 | ||
GR | 22.11.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2016/21] | AT | 21.08.2013 | |
BE | 21.08.2013 | ||
CY | 21.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 21.08.2013 | ||
DK | 21.08.2013 | ||
EE | 21.08.2013 | ||
ES | 21.08.2013 | ||
FI | 21.08.2013 | ||
HR | 21.08.2013 | ||
IT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LV | 21.08.2013 | ||
MC | 21.08.2013 | ||
NL | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
RO | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
SI | 21.08.2013 | ||
SK | 21.08.2013 | ||
NO | 21.11.2013 | ||
GR | 22.11.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 21.08.2013 | |
BE | 21.08.2013 | ||
CY | 21.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 21.08.2013 | ||
DK | 21.08.2013 | ||
EE | 21.08.2013 | ||
ES | 21.08.2013 | ||
FI | 21.08.2013 | ||
HR | 21.08.2013 | ||
IT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LV | 21.08.2013 | ||
NL | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
RO | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
SI | 21.08.2013 | ||
SK | 21.08.2013 | ||
NO | 21.11.2013 | ||
GR | 22.11.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/23] | AT | 21.08.2013 | |
BE | 21.08.2013 | ||
CY | 21.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 21.08.2013 | ||
DK | 21.08.2013 | ||
EE | 21.08.2013 | ||
FI | 21.08.2013 | ||
HR | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LV | 21.08.2013 | ||
NL | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
RO | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
SI | 21.08.2013 | ||
SK | 21.08.2013 | ||
NO | 21.11.2013 | ||
GR | 22.11.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/22] | AT | 21.08.2013 | |
BE | 21.08.2013 | ||
CY | 21.08.2013 | ||
DK | 21.08.2013 | ||
FI | 21.08.2013 | ||
HR | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LV | 21.08.2013 | ||
NL | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
RO | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
SI | 21.08.2013 | ||
NO | 21.11.2013 | ||
GR | 22.11.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 21.08.2013 | |
BE | 21.08.2013 | ||
CY | 21.08.2013 | ||
DK | 21.08.2013 | ||
FI | 21.08.2013 | ||
HR | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LV | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
SI | 21.08.2013 | ||
NO | 21.11.2013 | ||
GR | 22.11.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | AT | 21.08.2013 | |
BE | 21.08.2013 | ||
CY | 21.08.2013 | ||
FI | 21.08.2013 | ||
HR | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LV | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
SI | 21.08.2013 | ||
NO | 21.11.2013 | ||
GR | 22.11.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | AT | 21.08.2013 | |
BE | 21.08.2013 | ||
FI | 21.08.2013 | ||
HR | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LV | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
SI | 21.08.2013 | ||
CY | 18.09.2013 | ||
NO | 21.11.2013 | ||
GR | 22.11.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | AT | 21.08.2013 | |
FI | 21.08.2013 | ||
HR | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LV | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
SI | 21.08.2013 | ||
CY | 18.09.2013 | ||
NO | 21.11.2013 | ||
GR | 22.11.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | AT | 21.08.2013 | |
FI | 21.08.2013 | ||
HR | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
CY | 18.09.2013 | ||
NO | 21.11.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | AT | 21.08.2013 | |
HR | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
CY | 18.09.2013 | ||
NO | 21.11.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 21.08.2013 | |
HR | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
NO | 21.11.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | LT | 21.08.2013 | |
NO | 21.11.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | NO | 21.11.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2007147380 (ORMAZABAL GASTON S [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0018] *; | [A]US2004172557 (NAKAE MASAYUKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0033] *; | [A]US2004193912 (LI HONG C [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0044] * | [IA] - D-Link, "D-Link AirPlus Xtreme G DI-624 Manual Version 1.06", (20041110), pages 1 - 97, URL: ftp://ftp.dlink.com/Gateway/di624/Manual/DI-624_manual_06292005.zip, (20101021), XP002606424 [I] 1-4,7-15 * Chapter "Using the Configuration Menu" * [A] 5,6 | [A] - dslreports.com, "DI-624 and UPnP", (20050607), pages 1 - 4, URL: http://www.dslreports.com/forum/remark,13256090, (20101020), XP002606425 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * |