Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8697272 | Global Dossier | 15.04.2014 | B2 | US2011052975 | 03.03.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US23904409 | 01.09.2009 | US70635810 | 16.02.2010 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101191661B | Global Dossier | 17.10.2012 | B1 | KR20110025036 | 09.03.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | US23904409 | 01.09.2009 | US70635810 | 16.02.2010 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5297424B | Global Dossier | 25.09.2013 | B2 | JP2011054567 | 17.03.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | US23904409 | 01.09.2009 | US70635810 | 16.02.2010 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102005602B | Global Dossier | 07.08.2013 | B | CN102005602 | 06.04.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | US23904409 | 01.09.2009 | US70635810 | 16.02.2010 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2290732 | Global Dossier | 09.05.2012 | B1 | EP2290732 | 02.03.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US23904409 | 01.09.2009 | US70635810 | 16.02.2010 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE557435T | 15.05.2012 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US23904409 | 01.09.2009 | US70635810 | 16.02.2010 |