EP2283722 - Food processing installation, in particular in the production of cheese [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.11.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SAS EVOLI 4, rue Champenâtre 25770 Serre les Sapins / FR | [2011/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gaillard, Pascal SAS EVOLI c/o Novagraaf Technologies 25A, rue Proudhon 25000 Besançon / FR | [2012/43] |
Former [2011/07] | 01 /
Gaillard, Pascal SAS EVOLI c/o Novagraaf Technologies 25A, rue Proudhon 25000, BESANCON / FR | Representative(s) | Brungard, Yves Francois, et al Novagraaf Technologies 16, rue Gambetta 25000 Besançon / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2013/04] | Brungard, Yves Francois, et al Novagraaf Technologies 16, rue Gambetta 25000 Besançon / FR | ||
Former [2011/07] | Brungard, Yves Francois, et al Novagraaf Technologies 25A, rue Proudhon 25000 Besançon / FR | Application number, filing date | 10169687.0 | 15.07.2010 | [2011/07] | Priority number, date | FR20090055183 | 24.07.2009 Original published format: FR 0955183 | [2011/07] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2283722 | Date: | 16.02.2011 | Language: | FR | [2011/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2283722 | Date: | 23.01.2013 | Language: | FR | [2013/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.01.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A01J25/11, A01J25/12, A01J25/13, A01J25/15, A01J25/16 | [2012/42] | CPC: |
A01J25/115 (EP);
A01J25/12 (EP);
A01J25/13 (EP);
A01J25/15 (EP);
A01J25/16 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2011/07] | A01J25/11 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/07] | Title | German: | Lebensmittelherstellungsanlage, insbesondere für die Herstellung von Käse | [2011/07] | English: | Food processing installation, in particular in the production of cheese | [2011/07] | French: | Installation agroalimentaire notamment dans la fabrication du fromage | [2011/07] | Examination procedure | 18.07.2011 | Examination requested [2011/34] | 04.10.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.12.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 12.12.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.10.2012 | Opposition(s) | 24.10.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.07.2010 | AL | 23.01.2013 | AT | 23.01.2013 | CY | 23.01.2013 | CZ | 23.01.2013 | DK | 23.01.2013 | EE | 23.01.2013 | FI | 23.01.2013 | HR | 23.01.2013 | IT | 23.01.2013 | LT | 23.01.2013 | LV | 23.01.2013 | MC | 23.01.2013 | MK | 23.01.2013 | MT | 23.01.2013 | NL | 23.01.2013 | PL | 23.01.2013 | RO | 23.01.2013 | SE | 23.01.2013 | SI | 23.01.2013 | SK | 23.01.2013 | SM | 23.01.2013 | TR | 23.01.2013 | BG | 23.04.2013 | NO | 23.04.2013 | GR | 24.04.2013 | ES | 04.05.2013 | IS | 23.05.2013 | PT | 23.05.2013 | IE | 15.07.2013 | LU | 15.07.2013 | BE | 31.07.2013 | [2018/46] |
Former [2015/34] | HU | 15.07.2010 | |
AT | 23.01.2013 | ||
CY | 23.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 23.01.2013 | ||
DK | 23.01.2013 | ||
EE | 23.01.2013 | ||
FI | 23.01.2013 | ||
HR | 23.01.2013 | ||
IT | 23.01.2013 | ||
LT | 23.01.2013 | ||
LV | 23.01.2013 | ||
MC | 23.01.2013 | ||
MK | 23.01.2013 | ||
MT | 23.01.2013 | ||
NL | 23.01.2013 | ||
PL | 23.01.2013 | ||
RO | 23.01.2013 | ||
SE | 23.01.2013 | ||
SI | 23.01.2013 | ||
SK | 23.01.2013 | ||
SM | 23.01.2013 | ||
TR | 23.01.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
NO | 23.04.2013 | ||
GR | 24.04.2013 | ||
ES | 04.05.2013 | ||
IS | 23.05.2013 | ||
PT | 23.05.2013 | ||
IE | 15.07.2013 | ||
LU | 15.07.2013 | ||
BE | 31.07.2013 | ||
Former [2015/32] | AT | 23.01.2013 | |
CY | 23.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 23.01.2013 | ||
DK | 23.01.2013 | ||
EE | 23.01.2013 | ||
FI | 23.01.2013 | ||
HR | 23.01.2013 | ||
IT | 23.01.2013 | ||
LT | 23.01.2013 | ||
LV | 23.01.2013 | ||
MC | 23.01.2013 | ||
MK | 23.01.2013 | ||
MT | 23.01.2013 | ||
NL | 23.01.2013 | ||
PL | 23.01.2013 | ||
RO | 23.01.2013 | ||
SE | 23.01.2013 | ||
SI | 23.01.2013 | ||
SK | 23.01.2013 | ||
SM | 23.01.2013 | ||
TR | 23.01.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
NO | 23.04.2013 | ||
GR | 24.04.2013 | ||
ES | 04.05.2013 | ||
IS | 23.05.2013 | ||
PT | 23.05.2013 | ||
IE | 15.07.2013 | ||
BE | 31.07.2013 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 23.01.2013 | |
CY | 23.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 23.01.2013 | ||
DK | 23.01.2013 | ||
EE | 23.01.2013 | ||
FI | 23.01.2013 | ||
HR | 23.01.2013 | ||
IT | 23.01.2013 | ||
LT | 23.01.2013 | ||
LV | 23.01.2013 | ||
MC | 23.01.2013 | ||
NL | 23.01.2013 | ||
PL | 23.01.2013 | ||
RO | 23.01.2013 | ||
SE | 23.01.2013 | ||
SI | 23.01.2013 | ||
SK | 23.01.2013 | ||
SM | 23.01.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
NO | 23.04.2013 | ||
GR | 24.04.2013 | ||
ES | 04.05.2013 | ||
IS | 23.05.2013 | ||
PT | 23.05.2013 | ||
IE | 15.07.2013 | ||
BE | 31.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/33] | AT | 23.01.2013 | |
CY | 23.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 23.01.2013 | ||
DK | 23.01.2013 | ||
EE | 23.01.2013 | ||
FI | 23.01.2013 | ||
HR | 23.01.2013 | ||
IT | 23.01.2013 | ||
LT | 23.01.2013 | ||
LV | 23.01.2013 | ||
MC | 23.01.2013 | ||
NL | 23.01.2013 | ||
PL | 23.01.2013 | ||
RO | 23.01.2013 | ||
SE | 23.01.2013 | ||
SI | 23.01.2013 | ||
SK | 23.01.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
NO | 23.04.2013 | ||
GR | 24.04.2013 | ||
ES | 04.05.2013 | ||
IS | 23.05.2013 | ||
PT | 23.05.2013 | ||
IE | 15.07.2013 | ||
BE | 31.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/23] | AT | 23.01.2013 | |
CY | 23.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 23.01.2013 | ||
DK | 23.01.2013 | ||
EE | 23.01.2013 | ||
FI | 23.01.2013 | ||
HR | 23.01.2013 | ||
IT | 23.01.2013 | ||
LT | 23.01.2013 | ||
LV | 23.01.2013 | ||
MC | 23.01.2013 | ||
NL | 23.01.2013 | ||
PL | 23.01.2013 | ||
RO | 23.01.2013 | ||
SE | 23.01.2013 | ||
SI | 23.01.2013 | ||
SK | 23.01.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
NO | 23.04.2013 | ||
GR | 24.04.2013 | ||
ES | 04.05.2013 | ||
IS | 23.05.2013 | ||
PT | 23.05.2013 | ||
BE | 31.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | AT | 23.01.2013 | |
CY | 23.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 23.01.2013 | ||
DK | 23.01.2013 | ||
EE | 23.01.2013 | ||
FI | 23.01.2013 | ||
HR | 23.01.2013 | ||
IT | 23.01.2013 | ||
LT | 23.01.2013 | ||
LV | 23.01.2013 | ||
MC | 23.01.2013 | ||
NL | 23.01.2013 | ||
PL | 23.01.2013 | ||
RO | 23.01.2013 | ||
SE | 23.01.2013 | ||
SI | 23.01.2013 | ||
SK | 23.01.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
NO | 23.04.2013 | ||
GR | 24.04.2013 | ||
ES | 04.05.2013 | ||
IS | 23.05.2013 | ||
PT | 23.05.2013 | ||
Former [2014/03] | AT | 23.01.2013 | |
CY | 23.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 23.01.2013 | ||
DK | 23.01.2013 | ||
EE | 23.01.2013 | ||
FI | 23.01.2013 | ||
HR | 23.01.2013 | ||
IT | 23.01.2013 | ||
LT | 23.01.2013 | ||
LV | 23.01.2013 | ||
NL | 23.01.2013 | ||
PL | 23.01.2013 | ||
RO | 23.01.2013 | ||
SE | 23.01.2013 | ||
SI | 23.01.2013 | ||
SK | 23.01.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
NO | 23.04.2013 | ||
GR | 24.04.2013 | ||
ES | 04.05.2013 | ||
IS | 23.05.2013 | ||
PT | 23.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 23.01.2013 | |
CY | 23.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 23.01.2013 | ||
DK | 23.01.2013 | ||
EE | 23.01.2013 | ||
FI | 23.01.2013 | ||
HR | 23.01.2013 | ||
LT | 23.01.2013 | ||
LV | 23.01.2013 | ||
NL | 23.01.2013 | ||
PL | 23.01.2013 | ||
RO | 23.01.2013 | ||
SE | 23.01.2013 | ||
SI | 23.01.2013 | ||
SK | 23.01.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
NO | 23.04.2013 | ||
GR | 24.04.2013 | ||
ES | 04.05.2013 | ||
IS | 23.05.2013 | ||
PT | 23.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 23.01.2013 | |
CZ | 23.01.2013 | ||
DK | 23.01.2013 | ||
EE | 23.01.2013 | ||
FI | 23.01.2013 | ||
HR | 23.01.2013 | ||
LT | 23.01.2013 | ||
LV | 23.01.2013 | ||
NL | 23.01.2013 | ||
PL | 23.01.2013 | ||
RO | 23.01.2013 | ||
SE | 23.01.2013 | ||
SI | 23.01.2013 | ||
SK | 23.01.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
NO | 23.04.2013 | ||
GR | 24.04.2013 | ||
ES | 04.05.2013 | ||
IS | 23.05.2013 | ||
PT | 23.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 23.01.2013 | |
DK | 23.01.2013 | ||
EE | 23.01.2013 | ||
FI | 23.01.2013 | ||
HR | 23.01.2013 | ||
LT | 23.01.2013 | ||
LV | 23.01.2013 | ||
NL | 23.01.2013 | ||
PL | 23.01.2013 | ||
SE | 23.01.2013 | ||
SI | 23.01.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
NO | 23.04.2013 | ||
GR | 24.04.2013 | ||
ES | 04.05.2013 | ||
IS | 23.05.2013 | ||
PT | 23.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/41] | AT | 23.01.2013 | |
FI | 23.01.2013 | ||
HR | 23.01.2013 | ||
LT | 23.01.2013 | ||
LV | 23.01.2013 | ||
NL | 23.01.2013 | ||
PL | 23.01.2013 | ||
SE | 23.01.2013 | ||
SI | 23.01.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
NO | 23.04.2013 | ||
GR | 24.04.2013 | ||
ES | 04.05.2013 | ||
IS | 23.05.2013 | ||
PT | 23.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/40] | AT | 23.01.2013 | |
FI | 23.01.2013 | ||
LT | 23.01.2013 | ||
LV | 23.01.2013 | ||
NL | 23.01.2013 | ||
PL | 23.01.2013 | ||
SE | 23.01.2013 | ||
SI | 23.01.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
NO | 23.04.2013 | ||
GR | 24.04.2013 | ||
ES | 04.05.2013 | ||
IS | 23.05.2013 | ||
PT | 23.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/38] | AT | 23.01.2013 | |
FI | 23.01.2013 | ||
LT | 23.01.2013 | ||
LV | 23.01.2013 | ||
NL | 23.01.2013 | ||
PL | 23.01.2013 | ||
SE | 23.01.2013 | ||
SI | 23.01.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
NO | 23.04.2013 | ||
GR | 24.04.2013 | ||
ES | 04.05.2013 | ||
IS | 23.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 23.01.2013 | |
FI | 23.01.2013 | ||
LT | 23.01.2013 | ||
NL | 23.01.2013 | ||
PL | 23.01.2013 | ||
SE | 23.01.2013 | ||
SI | 23.01.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
NO | 23.04.2013 | ||
GR | 24.04.2013 | ||
ES | 04.05.2013 | ||
IS | 23.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/36] | AT | 23.01.2013 | |
LT | 23.01.2013 | ||
PL | 23.01.2013 | ||
SE | 23.01.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
NO | 23.04.2013 | ||
ES | 04.05.2013 | ||
IS | 23.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | LT | 23.01.2013 | |
SE | 23.01.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
NO | 23.04.2013 | ||
IS | 23.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/33] | LT | 23.01.2013 | |
NO | 23.04.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9220217 (SCHWARTE WERK GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-21 * page 11 - page 17; figures 1-3 *; | [A]US7437991 (LEFFELMAN RICKY [US]) [A] 1-21 * page 1, line 49 - page 2, line 37; figures 1-4 *; | [A]FR1460510 (ALFA LAVAL SOC) [A] 1-21 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2211178 (GUILBERT ETS [FR]) [A] 1-21 * page 3 - page 4; figures 1,2 *; | [A]DE1582944 (AHLBORN E AG) [A] 1-21 * page 4 - page 6; figures 1,2 * |