EP2407061 - Goods presentation container [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.08.2018 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.08.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALDI SÜD Dienstleistungs-GmbH & Co. oHG Burgstrasse 37 45476 Mülheim/Ruhr / DE | [2017/22] |
Former [2012/03] | For all designated states Aldi Einkauf GmbH & Co. oHG Burgstrasse 37 45476 Mülheim/Ruhr / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ernst, Peter Fuchsgrube 43 45478, Mülheim / DE | 02 /
Ochsenschläger, Robert Lohbecker Berg 9 45470, Mülheim / DE | [2012/03] | Representative(s) | Nunnenkamp, Jörg Andrejewski - Honke Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB An der Reichsbank 8 45127 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/03] | Nunnenkamp, Jörg Andrejewski - Honke Patent- und Rechtsanwälte An der Reichsbank 8 45127 Essen / DE | Application number, filing date | 10169892.6 | 16.07.2010 | [2012/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2407061 | Date: | 18.01.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2407061 | Date: | 27.09.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.12.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A47F3/04 | [2012/03] | CPC: |
A47F3/0469 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/39] |
Former [2012/03] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Warenpräsentationsbehälter | [2012/03] | English: | Goods presentation container | [2012/03] | French: | Récipient de présentation de marchandises | [2012/03] | Examination procedure | 29.06.2012 | Examination requested [2012/32] | 16.05.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.06.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 21.06.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.08.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.05.2017 | Opposition(s) | 28.06.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.07.2010 | AL | 27.09.2017 | CY | 27.09.2017 | CZ | 27.09.2017 | DK | 27.09.2017 | EE | 27.09.2017 | ES | 27.09.2017 | FI | 27.09.2017 | HR | 27.09.2017 | IT | 27.09.2017 | LT | 27.09.2017 | LV | 27.09.2017 | MC | 27.09.2017 | MK | 27.09.2017 | MT | 27.09.2017 | NL | 27.09.2017 | PL | 27.09.2017 | PT | 27.09.2017 | RO | 27.09.2017 | SE | 27.09.2017 | SI | 27.09.2017 | SK | 27.09.2017 | SM | 27.09.2017 | TR | 27.09.2017 | BG | 27.12.2017 | NO | 27.12.2017 | GR | 28.12.2017 | IS | 27.01.2018 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 16.07.2010 | |
CY | 27.09.2017 | ||
CZ | 27.09.2017 | ||
DK | 27.09.2017 | ||
EE | 27.09.2017 | ||
ES | 27.09.2017 | ||
FI | 27.09.2017 | ||
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
IT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
MC | 27.09.2017 | ||
MK | 27.09.2017 | ||
MT | 27.09.2017 | ||
NL | 27.09.2017 | ||
PL | 27.09.2017 | ||
PT | 27.09.2017 | ||
RO | 27.09.2017 | ||
SE | 27.09.2017 | ||
SI | 27.09.2017 | ||
SK | 27.09.2017 | ||
SM | 27.09.2017 | ||
TR | 27.09.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
IS | 27.01.2018 | ||
Former [2020/27] | HU | 16.07.2010 | |
CZ | 27.09.2017 | ||
DK | 27.09.2017 | ||
EE | 27.09.2017 | ||
ES | 27.09.2017 | ||
FI | 27.09.2017 | ||
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
IT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
MC | 27.09.2017 | ||
MT | 27.09.2017 | ||
NL | 27.09.2017 | ||
PL | 27.09.2017 | ||
PT | 27.09.2017 | ||
RO | 27.09.2017 | ||
SE | 27.09.2017 | ||
SI | 27.09.2017 | ||
SK | 27.09.2017 | ||
SM | 27.09.2017 | ||
TR | 27.09.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
IS | 27.01.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | CZ | 27.09.2017 | |
DK | 27.09.2017 | ||
EE | 27.09.2017 | ||
ES | 27.09.2017 | ||
FI | 27.09.2017 | ||
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
IT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
MC | 27.09.2017 | ||
MT | 27.09.2017 | ||
NL | 27.09.2017 | ||
PL | 27.09.2017 | ||
RO | 27.09.2017 | ||
SE | 27.09.2017 | ||
SI | 27.09.2017 | ||
SK | 27.09.2017 | ||
SM | 27.09.2017 | ||
TR | 27.09.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
IS | 27.01.2018 | ||
Former [2019/15] | CZ | 27.09.2017 | |
DK | 27.09.2017 | ||
EE | 27.09.2017 | ||
ES | 27.09.2017 | ||
FI | 27.09.2017 | ||
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
IT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
MC | 27.09.2017 | ||
MT | 27.09.2017 | ||
NL | 27.09.2017 | ||
PL | 27.09.2017 | ||
RO | 27.09.2017 | ||
SE | 27.09.2017 | ||
SI | 27.09.2017 | ||
SK | 27.09.2017 | ||
SM | 27.09.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
IS | 27.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | CZ | 27.09.2017 | |
DK | 27.09.2017 | ||
EE | 27.09.2017 | ||
ES | 27.09.2017 | ||
FI | 27.09.2017 | ||
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
IT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
MT | 27.09.2017 | ||
NL | 27.09.2017 | ||
PL | 27.09.2017 | ||
RO | 27.09.2017 | ||
SE | 27.09.2017 | ||
SI | 27.09.2017 | ||
SK | 27.09.2017 | ||
SM | 27.09.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
IS | 27.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CZ | 27.09.2017 | |
DK | 27.09.2017 | ||
EE | 27.09.2017 | ||
ES | 27.09.2017 | ||
FI | 27.09.2017 | ||
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
IT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
MT | 27.09.2017 | ||
NL | 27.09.2017 | ||
PL | 27.09.2017 | ||
RO | 27.09.2017 | ||
SE | 27.09.2017 | ||
SK | 27.09.2017 | ||
SM | 27.09.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
IS | 27.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | CZ | 27.09.2017 | |
DK | 27.09.2017 | ||
EE | 27.09.2017 | ||
ES | 27.09.2017 | ||
FI | 27.09.2017 | ||
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
IT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
NL | 27.09.2017 | ||
PL | 27.09.2017 | ||
RO | 27.09.2017 | ||
SE | 27.09.2017 | ||
SK | 27.09.2017 | ||
SM | 27.09.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
IS | 27.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | CZ | 27.09.2017 | |
DK | 27.09.2017 | ||
EE | 27.09.2017 | ||
ES | 27.09.2017 | ||
FI | 27.09.2017 | ||
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
IT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
NL | 27.09.2017 | ||
RO | 27.09.2017 | ||
SE | 27.09.2017 | ||
SK | 27.09.2017 | ||
SM | 27.09.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
IS | 27.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | CZ | 27.09.2017 | |
EE | 27.09.2017 | ||
ES | 27.09.2017 | ||
FI | 27.09.2017 | ||
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
IT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
NL | 27.09.2017 | ||
RO | 27.09.2017 | ||
SE | 27.09.2017 | ||
SK | 27.09.2017 | ||
SM | 27.09.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
IS | 27.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/23] | CZ | 27.09.2017 | |
EE | 27.09.2017 | ||
ES | 27.09.2017 | ||
FI | 27.09.2017 | ||
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
NL | 27.09.2017 | ||
RO | 27.09.2017 | ||
SE | 27.09.2017 | ||
SK | 27.09.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
IS | 27.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/21] | CZ | 27.09.2017 | |
FI | 27.09.2017 | ||
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
NL | 27.09.2017 | ||
SE | 27.09.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/15] | FI | 27.09.2017 | |
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
NL | 27.09.2017 | ||
SE | 27.09.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/12] | FI | 27.09.2017 | |
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
SE | 27.09.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | FI | 27.09.2017 | |
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
SE | 27.09.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/08] | FI | 27.09.2017 | |
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | LT | 27.09.2017 | |
NO | 27.12.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]DE20101977U (REMIS GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-6,8-10,12-15 * the whole document * [I] 7,11; | [A]DE10021656 (WEIS ALBERT [DE]) [A] 11 * the whole document * | by applicant | DE10236212 | DE928714 | EP1508288 |