EP2316276 - GENES ENCODING PROTEOLYTIC ENZYMES FROM ASPARGILLI [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2011/18] | Genes encoding proteolytic enzymes from aspargilli | ||
[2011/31] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.09.2013 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.10.2013 [2013/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DSM IP Assets B.V. Het Overloon 1 6411 TE Heerlen / NL | [2011/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Edens, Luppo Hoflaan 118 3062 JL Rotterdam / NL | 02 /
van Dijk, Albertus Alard c/o DSM Intellectual Property Delft Office (600-0240) 2600 MA Delft / NL | 03 /
Krubasik, Philipp C/o DSM Intellectual Property Delft Office (600-0240) 2600 MA Delft / NL | 04 /
Albermann, Kaj C/o DSM Intellectual Property Delft Office (600-0240) 2600 MA Delft / NL | 05 /
Stock, Alexander C/o DSM Intellectual Property Delft Office (600-0240) 2600 MA Delft / NL | 06 /
Kimpel, Erik C/o DSM Intellectual Property Delft Office (600-0240) 2600 MA Delft / NL | 07 /
Klugbauer, Sabine C/o DSM Intellectual Property Delft Office (600-0240) 2600 MA Delft / NL | 08 /
Wagner, Christian C/o DSM Intellectual Property Delft Office (600-0240) 2600 MA Delft / NL | 09 /
Fritz, Andreas C/o DSM Intellectual Property Delft Office (600-0240) 2600 MA Delft / NL | 10 /
von Gustedt, Wilk C/o DSM Intellectual Property Delft Office (600-0240) 2600 MA Delft / NL | 11 /
Heinrich, Oliver C/o DSM Intellectual Property Delft Office (600-0240) 2600 MA Delft / NL | 12 /
Maier, Dieter C/o DSM Intellectual Property Delft Office (600-0240) 2600 MA Delft / NL | 13 /
Spreafico, Fabio C/o DSM Intellectual Property Delft Office (600-0240) 2600 MA Delft / NL | 14 /
Folkers, Ulrike C/o DSM Intellectual Property Delft Office (600-0240) 2600 MA Delft / NL | 15 /
Hopper, Sylvia C/o DSM Intellectual Property Delft Office (600-0240) 2600 MA Delft / NL | 16 /
Kenmer, Wolfram C/o DSM Intellectual Property Delft Office (600-0240) 2600 MA Delft / NL | 17 /
Tan, Pamela C/o DSM Intellectual Property Delft Office (600-0240) 2600 MA Delft / NL | 18 /
Stiebler, Josephine C/o DSM Intellectual Property Delft Office (600-0240) 2600 MA Delft / NL | 19 /
Albang, Richard C/o DSM Intellectual Property Delft Office (600-0240) 2600 MA Delft / NL | [2011/18] | Representative(s) | Matulewicz, Emil Rudolf Antonius, et al DSM Intellectual Property P.O. Box 4 6100 AA Echt / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2011/18] | Matulewicz, Emil Rudolf Antonius, et al DSM Intellectual Property P.O. Box 130 6100 AC Echt / NL | Application number, filing date | 10169964.3 | 22.02.2002 | [2011/18] | Priority number, date | EP20010200660 | 23.02.2001 Original published format: EP 01200660 | EP20010200658 | 23.02.2001 Original published format: EP 01200658 | EP20010200657 | 23.02.2001 Original published format: EP 01200657 | EP20010200707 | 26.02.2001 Original published format: EP 01200707 | EP20010200708 | 26.02.2001 Original published format: EP 01200708 | EP20010200719 | 26.02.2001 Original published format: EP 01200719 | EP20010200706 | 26.02.2001 Original published format: EP 01200706 | EP20010000075 | 28.03.2001 Original published format: EP 01000075 | EP20010000078 | 28.03.2001 Original published format: EP 01000078 | EP20010000080 | 28.03.2001 Original published format: EP 01000080 | EP20010000084 | 28.03.2001 Original published format: EP 01000084 | EP20010000085 | 28.03.2001 Original published format: EP 01000085 | EP20010000087 | 28.03.2001 Original published format: EP 01000087 | EP20010000088 | 28.03.2001 Original published format: EP 01000088 | EP20010000156 | 21.05.2001 Original published format: EP 01000156 | EP20010000159 | 21.05.2001 Original published format: EP 01000159 | EP20010000160 | 21.05.2001 Original published format: EP 01000160 | EP20010000162 | 21.05.2001 Original published format: EP 01000162 | EP20010000165 | 21.05.2001 Original published format: EP 01000165 | EP20010000166 | 21.05.2001 Original published format: EP 01000166 | EP20010000168 | 21.05.2001 Original published format: EP 01000168 | EP20010000225 | 20.06.2001 Original published format: EP 01000225 | EP20010000229 | 20.06.2001 Original published format: EP 01000229 | EP20010000234 | 21.06.2001 Original published format: EP 01000234 | EP20010000237 | 21.06.2001 Original published format: EP 01000237 | EP20010000238 | 21.06.2001 Original published format: EP 01000238 | EP20010000240 | 21.06.2001 Original published format: EP 01000240 | EP20010000242 | 21.06.2001 Original published format: EP 01000242 | EP20010000244 | 21.06.2001 Original published format: EP 01000244 | EP20010000246 | 21.06.2001 Original published format: EP 01000246 | EP20010000280 | 12.07.2001 Original published format: EP 01000280 | EP20010000285 | 12.07.2001 Original published format: EP 01000285 | EP20010000286 | 12.07.2001 Original published format: EP 01000286 | EP20010000287 | 12.07.2001 Original published format: EP 01000287 | EP20010000320 | 30.07.2001 Original published format: EP 01000320 | EP20010000321 | 30.07.2001 Original published format: EP 01000321 | EP20010000322 | 30.07.2001 Original published format: EP 01000322 | EP20010000323 | 30.07.2001 Original published format: EP 01000323 | EP20010000327 | 30.07.2001 Original published format: EP 01000327 | EP20010000341 | 02.08.2001 Original published format: EP 01000341 | EP20010000342 | 02.08.2001 Original published format: EP 01000342 | EP20010000343 | 02.08.2001 Original published format: EP 01000343 | EP20010000344 | 02.08.2001 Original published format: EP 01000344 | EP20010000357 | 09.08.2001 Original published format: EP 01000357 | EP20010000374 | 16.08.2001 Original published format: EP 01000374 | EP20010000377 | 16.08.2001 Original published format: EP 01000377 | EP20010000478 | 20.09.2001 Original published format: EP 01000478 | EP20010000483 | 20.09.2001 Original published format: EP 01000483 | EP20010000552 | 22.10.2001 Original published format: EP 01000552 | EP20010000553 | 22.10.2001 Original published format: EP 01000553 | EP20010000554 | 22.10.2001 Original published format: EP 01000554 | EP20010000556 | 22.10.2001 Original published format: EP 01000556 | EP20010000557 | 22.10.2001 Original published format: EP 01000557 | EP20010000558 | 22.10.2001 Original published format: EP 01000558 | EP20010204464 | 15.11.2001 Original published format: EP 01204464 | EP20010205117 | 21.12.2001 Original published format: EP 01205117 | [2011/18] | Previously filed application, date | EP20080171292 | 22.02.2002 | [2011/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2316276 | Date: | 04.05.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2316276 | Date: | 03.08.2011 | [2011/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.07.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A23J3/34, A23J3/16, C12N9/62, C12N9/48 | [2011/18] | CPC: |
A23J3/16 (EP,US);
A23J3/343 (EP,US);
A23J3/344 (EP,US);
A23J3/346 (EP,US);
A23L2/02 (EP,US);
A23L2/84 (EP,US);
A23L33/18 (EP,US);
A23L33/40 (EP,US);
C12H1/003 (EP,US);
C12N9/62 (EP,US);
C12Q1/37 (EP,US);
G01N33/56961 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2011/18] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GENES QUI CODANT POUR L'ENZYMES PROTEOLYTIQUES DERIVEES DE ASPARGILLI | [2011/31] | English: | GENES ENCODING PROTEOLYTIC ENZYMES FROM ASPARGILLI | [2011/31] | French: | GENES QUI CODANT POUR L'ENZYMES PROTEOLYTIQUES DERIVEES DE ASPARGILLI | [2011/31] |
Former [2011/18] | Gene der Aspergilli, die proteolytische Enzyme kodieren | ||
Former [2011/18] | Genes encoding proteolytic enzymes from aspargilli | ||
Former [2011/18] | Gènes codant des enzymes protéolytiques dérivées de aspargilli | Examination procedure | 19.07.2010 | Examination requested [2011/18] | 02.02.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.02.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 16.04.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/41] | 21.05.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/41] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP02744901.6 / EP1377664 | EP08171292.9 / EP2123749 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20020744901) is 18.01.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 19.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 15.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2013 | 12   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5674728 (BUXTON FRANK [CH], et al) [A] 1-21 * abstract *; | [A]EP0967286 (KIKKOMAN CORP [JP]) [A] 1-21 * abstract *; | [A]WO9851804 (NOVO NORDISK BIOTECH INC [US]) [A] 1-21 * abstract * | [A] - VAN DEN HOMBERGH J P T W ET AL, "Cloning, characterization and expression of pepF, a gene encoding a serine carboxypeptidase from Aspergillus niger", GENE, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (19941230), vol. 151, no. 1, doi:10.1016/0378-1119(94)90634-3, ISSN 0378-1119, pages 73 - 79, XP004042615 [A] 1-21 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0378-1119(94)90634-3 | [XA] - Tsang, "an_0206 Aspergillus niger", EMBL, EBI, (20000920), Database accession no. BE760105, URL: EBI, XP002604992 [X] 1-4,6,9,12,17 * the whole document * [A] 5,7,8,10,11,13-16,18-21 |