EP2278224 - AIR-GAS MIXER DEVICE, PARTICULARLY FOR PREMIX BURNER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2011/04] | Air-gas mixer device, particularly for premix burner | ||
[2014/28] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.10.2015 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIT S.P.A. Viale dell'Industria 31/33 35129 Padova / IT | [2015/11] |
Former [2011/04] | For all designated states LN 2 S.R.L. a socio unico Via G. Deledda, 10-12 62010 Montecassiano (MC) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ranalli, Antonio via Colle Breccioli, 41 66020, Scerni (CH) / IT | [2014/51] |
Former [2011/04] | 01 /
Ranalli, Antonio via Colle Breccioli, 41 66020, Scerni (CH) / IT | Representative(s) | Fabris, Stefano, et al Cantaluppi & Partners S.r.l. Piazzetta Cappellato Pedrocchi, 18 35122 Padova / IT | [2014/51] |
Former [2011/04] | Fabris, Stefano, et al Cantaluppi & Partners S.r.l. Piazzetta Cappellato Pedrocchi, 18 35122 Padova / IT | Application number, filing date | 10169982.5 | 19.07.2010 | [2011/04] | Priority number, date | IT2009PD00215 | 22.07.2009 Original published format: IT PD20090215 | [2011/04] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2278224 | Date: | 26.01.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2278224 | Date: | 27.02.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2278224 | Date: | 17.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.01.2013 | Classification | IPC: | F23D14/36, F23D14/64, F23L5/02, F04D29/42 | [2011/04] | CPC: |
F23D14/36 (EP);
F04D29/4213 (EP);
F23D14/64 (EP);
F23L5/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/04] | Title | German: | GAZ-LUFTMISCHER, INSBESONDERE FÜR VORMISCHBRENNER | [2014/28] | English: | AIR-GAS MIXER DEVICE, PARTICULARLY FOR PREMIX BURNER | [2014/28] | French: | MÉLANGEUR AIR/GAZ, EN PARTICULIER POUR BRÛLEUR À PRÉMÉLANGE | [2014/28] |
Former [2011/04] | Gas-Luftmischer, insbesondere für Vormischbrenner | ||
Former [2011/04] | Air-gas mixer device, particularly for premix burner | ||
Former [2011/04] | Mélangeur air/gaz, en particulier pour brûleur à prémélange | Examination procedure | 26.07.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.07.2013 | Examination requested [2013/36] | 08.07.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.11.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 06.11.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.11.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.07.2014 | Opposition(s) | 18.09.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.07.2010 | AL | 17.12.2014 | AT | 17.12.2014 | BE | 17.12.2014 | BG | 17.12.2014 | CY | 17.12.2014 | CZ | 17.12.2014 | DK | 17.12.2014 | EE | 17.12.2014 | ES | 17.12.2014 | FI | 17.12.2014 | HR | 17.12.2014 | IT | 17.12.2014 | LT | 17.12.2014 | LV | 17.12.2014 | MC | 17.12.2014 | MK | 17.12.2014 | MT | 17.12.2014 | NL | 17.12.2014 | PL | 17.12.2014 | PT | 17.12.2014 | RO | 17.12.2014 | SE | 17.12.2014 | SI | 17.12.2014 | SK | 17.12.2014 | SM | 17.12.2014 | NO | 17.03.2015 | GR | 18.03.2015 | IS | 17.04.2015 | IE | 19.07.2015 | LU | 19.07.2015 | CH | 31.07.2015 | FR | 31.07.2015 | LI | 31.07.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/37] | HU | 19.07.2010 | |
AT | 17.12.2014 | ||
BE | 17.12.2014 | ||
BG | 17.12.2014 | ||
CY | 17.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 17.12.2014 | ||
DK | 17.12.2014 | ||
EE | 17.12.2014 | ||
ES | 17.12.2014 | ||
FI | 17.12.2014 | ||
HR | 17.12.2014 | ||
IT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LV | 17.12.2014 | ||
MC | 17.12.2014 | ||
MK | 17.12.2014 | ||
MT | 17.12.2014 | ||
NL | 17.12.2014 | ||
PL | 17.12.2014 | ||
PT | 17.12.2014 | ||
RO | 17.12.2014 | ||
SE | 17.12.2014 | ||
SI | 17.12.2014 | ||
SK | 17.12.2014 | ||
SM | 17.12.2014 | ||
NO | 17.03.2015 | ||
GR | 18.03.2015 | ||
IS | 17.04.2015 | ||
IE | 19.07.2015 | ||
LU | 19.07.2015 | ||
CH | 31.07.2015 | ||
FR | 31.07.2015 | ||
LI | 31.07.2015 | ||
Former [2018/30] | HU | 19.07.2010 | |
AT | 17.12.2014 | ||
BE | 17.12.2014 | ||
BG | 17.12.2014 | ||
CY | 17.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 17.12.2014 | ||
DK | 17.12.2014 | ||
EE | 17.12.2014 | ||
ES | 17.12.2014 | ||
FI | 17.12.2014 | ||
HR | 17.12.2014 | ||
IT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LV | 17.12.2014 | ||
MC | 17.12.2014 | ||
MK | 17.12.2014 | ||
MT | 17.12.2014 | ||
NL | 17.12.2014 | ||
PL | 17.12.2014 | ||
RO | 17.12.2014 | ||
SE | 17.12.2014 | ||
SI | 17.12.2014 | ||
SK | 17.12.2014 | ||
SM | 17.12.2014 | ||
NO | 17.03.2015 | ||
GR | 18.03.2015 | ||
IS | 17.04.2015 | ||
IE | 19.07.2015 | ||
LU | 19.07.2015 | ||
CH | 31.07.2015 | ||
FR | 31.07.2015 | ||
LI | 31.07.2015 | ||
Former [2017/39] | HU | 19.07.2010 | |
AT | 17.12.2014 | ||
BE | 17.12.2014 | ||
BG | 17.12.2014 | ||
CY | 17.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 17.12.2014 | ||
DK | 17.12.2014 | ||
EE | 17.12.2014 | ||
ES | 17.12.2014 | ||
FI | 17.12.2014 | ||
HR | 17.12.2014 | ||
IT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LV | 17.12.2014 | ||
MC | 17.12.2014 | ||
MT | 17.12.2014 | ||
NL | 17.12.2014 | ||
PL | 17.12.2014 | ||
RO | 17.12.2014 | ||
SE | 17.12.2014 | ||
SI | 17.12.2014 | ||
SK | 17.12.2014 | ||
SM | 17.12.2014 | ||
NO | 17.03.2015 | ||
GR | 18.03.2015 | ||
IS | 17.04.2015 | ||
IE | 19.07.2015 | ||
LU | 19.07.2015 | ||
CH | 31.07.2015 | ||
FR | 31.07.2015 | ||
LI | 31.07.2015 | ||
Former [2017/21] | AT | 17.12.2014 | |
BE | 17.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 17.12.2014 | ||
DK | 17.12.2014 | ||
EE | 17.12.2014 | ||
ES | 17.12.2014 | ||
FI | 17.12.2014 | ||
HR | 17.12.2014 | ||
IT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LV | 17.12.2014 | ||
MC | 17.12.2014 | ||
MT | 17.12.2014 | ||
NL | 17.12.2014 | ||
PL | 17.12.2014 | ||
RO | 17.12.2014 | ||
SE | 17.12.2014 | ||
SI | 17.12.2014 | ||
SK | 17.12.2014 | ||
NO | 17.03.2015 | ||
GR | 18.03.2015 | ||
IS | 17.04.2015 | ||
IE | 19.07.2015 | ||
LU | 19.07.2015 | ||
CH | 31.07.2015 | ||
FR | 31.07.2015 | ||
LI | 31.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/33] | AT | 17.12.2014 | |
BE | 17.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 17.12.2014 | ||
DK | 17.12.2014 | ||
EE | 17.12.2014 | ||
ES | 17.12.2014 | ||
FI | 17.12.2014 | ||
HR | 17.12.2014 | ||
IT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LV | 17.12.2014 | ||
MC | 17.12.2014 | ||
NL | 17.12.2014 | ||
PL | 17.12.2014 | ||
RO | 17.12.2014 | ||
SE | 17.12.2014 | ||
SI | 17.12.2014 | ||
SK | 17.12.2014 | ||
NO | 17.03.2015 | ||
GR | 18.03.2015 | ||
IS | 17.04.2015 | ||
IE | 19.07.2015 | ||
LU | 19.07.2015 | ||
CH | 31.07.2015 | ||
FR | 31.07.2015 | ||
LI | 31.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 17.12.2014 | |
BE | 17.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 17.12.2014 | ||
DK | 17.12.2014 | ||
EE | 17.12.2014 | ||
ES | 17.12.2014 | ||
FI | 17.12.2014 | ||
HR | 17.12.2014 | ||
IT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LV | 17.12.2014 | ||
MC | 17.12.2014 | ||
NL | 17.12.2014 | ||
PL | 17.12.2014 | ||
RO | 17.12.2014 | ||
SE | 17.12.2014 | ||
SI | 17.12.2014 | ||
SK | 17.12.2014 | ||
NO | 17.03.2015 | ||
GR | 18.03.2015 | ||
IS | 17.04.2015 | ||
LU | 19.07.2015 | ||
CH | 31.07.2015 | ||
FR | 31.07.2015 | ||
LI | 31.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 17.12.2014 | |
BE | 17.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 17.12.2014 | ||
DK | 17.12.2014 | ||
EE | 17.12.2014 | ||
ES | 17.12.2014 | ||
FI | 17.12.2014 | ||
HR | 17.12.2014 | ||
IT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LV | 17.12.2014 | ||
MC | 17.12.2014 | ||
NL | 17.12.2014 | ||
PL | 17.12.2014 | ||
RO | 17.12.2014 | ||
SE | 17.12.2014 | ||
SI | 17.12.2014 | ||
SK | 17.12.2014 | ||
NO | 17.03.2015 | ||
GR | 18.03.2015 | ||
IS | 17.04.2015 | ||
LU | 19.07.2015 | ||
CH | 31.07.2015 | ||
LI | 31.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 17.12.2014 | |
CZ | 17.12.2014 | ||
DK | 17.12.2014 | ||
EE | 17.12.2014 | ||
ES | 17.12.2014 | ||
FI | 17.12.2014 | ||
HR | 17.12.2014 | ||
IT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LV | 17.12.2014 | ||
MC | 17.12.2014 | ||
NL | 17.12.2014 | ||
PL | 17.12.2014 | ||
RO | 17.12.2014 | ||
SE | 17.12.2014 | ||
SI | 17.12.2014 | ||
SK | 17.12.2014 | ||
NO | 17.03.2015 | ||
GR | 18.03.2015 | ||
IS | 17.04.2015 | ||
LU | 19.07.2015 | ||
CH | 31.07.2015 | ||
LI | 31.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/15] | AT | 17.12.2014 | |
CZ | 17.12.2014 | ||
DK | 17.12.2014 | ||
EE | 17.12.2014 | ||
ES | 17.12.2014 | ||
FI | 17.12.2014 | ||
HR | 17.12.2014 | ||
IT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LV | 17.12.2014 | ||
MC | 17.12.2014 | ||
NL | 17.12.2014 | ||
PL | 17.12.2014 | ||
RO | 17.12.2014 | ||
SE | 17.12.2014 | ||
SI | 17.12.2014 | ||
SK | 17.12.2014 | ||
NO | 17.03.2015 | ||
GR | 18.03.2015 | ||
IS | 17.04.2015 | ||
LU | 19.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/13] | AT | 17.12.2014 | |
CZ | 17.12.2014 | ||
DK | 17.12.2014 | ||
EE | 17.12.2014 | ||
ES | 17.12.2014 | ||
FI | 17.12.2014 | ||
HR | 17.12.2014 | ||
IT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LV | 17.12.2014 | ||
MC | 17.12.2014 | ||
NL | 17.12.2014 | ||
PL | 17.12.2014 | ||
RO | 17.12.2014 | ||
SE | 17.12.2014 | ||
SI | 17.12.2014 | ||
SK | 17.12.2014 | ||
NO | 17.03.2015 | ||
GR | 18.03.2015 | ||
IS | 17.04.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 17.12.2014 | |
CZ | 17.12.2014 | ||
DK | 17.12.2014 | ||
EE | 17.12.2014 | ||
ES | 17.12.2014 | ||
FI | 17.12.2014 | ||
HR | 17.12.2014 | ||
IT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LV | 17.12.2014 | ||
NL | 17.12.2014 | ||
PL | 17.12.2014 | ||
RO | 17.12.2014 | ||
SE | 17.12.2014 | ||
SI | 17.12.2014 | ||
SK | 17.12.2014 | ||
NO | 17.03.2015 | ||
GR | 18.03.2015 | ||
IS | 17.04.2015 | ||
Former [2016/03] | AT | 17.12.2014 | |
CZ | 17.12.2014 | ||
DK | 17.12.2014 | ||
EE | 17.12.2014 | ||
ES | 17.12.2014 | ||
FI | 17.12.2014 | ||
HR | 17.12.2014 | ||
IT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LV | 17.12.2014 | ||
NL | 17.12.2014 | ||
PL | 17.12.2014 | ||
RO | 17.12.2014 | ||
SE | 17.12.2014 | ||
SK | 17.12.2014 | ||
NO | 17.03.2015 | ||
GR | 18.03.2015 | ||
IS | 17.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | AT | 17.12.2014 | |
CZ | 17.12.2014 | ||
DK | 17.12.2014 | ||
EE | 17.12.2014 | ||
ES | 17.12.2014 | ||
FI | 17.12.2014 | ||
HR | 17.12.2014 | ||
LT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LV | 17.12.2014 | ||
NL | 17.12.2014 | ||
PL | 17.12.2014 | ||
RO | 17.12.2014 | ||
SE | 17.12.2014 | ||
SK | 17.12.2014 | ||
NO | 17.03.2015 | ||
GR | 18.03.2015 | ||
IS | 17.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/38] | AT | 17.12.2014 | |
CZ | 17.12.2014 | ||
EE | 17.12.2014 | ||
ES | 17.12.2014 | ||
FI | 17.12.2014 | ||
HR | 17.12.2014 | ||
LT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LV | 17.12.2014 | ||
NL | 17.12.2014 | ||
PL | 17.12.2014 | ||
RO | 17.12.2014 | ||
SE | 17.12.2014 | ||
SK | 17.12.2014 | ||
NO | 17.03.2015 | ||
GR | 18.03.2015 | ||
IS | 17.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | CZ | 17.12.2014 | |
EE | 17.12.2014 | ||
ES | 17.12.2014 | ||
FI | 17.12.2014 | ||
HR | 17.12.2014 | ||
LT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LV | 17.12.2014 | ||
NL | 17.12.2014 | ||
PL | 17.12.2014 | ||
RO | 17.12.2014 | ||
SE | 17.12.2014 | ||
SK | 17.12.2014 | ||
NO | 17.03.2015 | ||
GR | 18.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | CZ | 17.12.2014 | |
EE | 17.12.2014 | ||
ES | 17.12.2014 | ||
FI | 17.12.2014 | ||
HR | 17.12.2014 | ||
LT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LV | 17.12.2014 | ||
NL | 17.12.2014 | ||
RO | 17.12.2014 | ||
SE | 17.12.2014 | ||
NO | 17.03.2015 | ||
GR | 18.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | EE | 17.12.2014 | |
ES | 17.12.2014 | ||
FI | 17.12.2014 | ||
HR | 17.12.2014 | ||
LT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LV | 17.12.2014 | ||
NL | 17.12.2014 | ||
SE | 17.12.2014 | ||
NO | 17.03.2015 | ||
GR | 18.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/33] | ES | 17.12.2014 | |
FI | 17.12.2014 | ||
HR | 17.12.2014 | ||
LT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LV | 17.12.2014 | ||
NL | 17.12.2014 | ||
SE | 17.12.2014 | ||
NO | 17.03.2015 | ||
GR | 18.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/29] | FI | 17.12.2014 | |
HR | 17.12.2014 | ||
LT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LV | 17.12.2014 | ||
NL | 17.12.2014 | ||
SE | 17.12.2014 | ||
NO | 17.03.2015 | ||
GR | 18.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | FI | 17.12.2014 | |
HR | 17.12.2014 | ||
LT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LV | 17.12.2014 | ||
SE | 17.12.2014 | ||
NO | 17.03.2015 | ||
GR | 18.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | FI | 17.12.2014 | |
LT | 17.12.2014 | ||
NO | 17.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/21] | LT | 17.12.2014 | |
NO | 17.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/20] | LT | 17.12.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]DE102007022008 (SAIA BURGESS DRESDEN GMBH [DE]) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0031] , [0033] , [0034]; figures 4,5,6 * [A] 8,9 [Y] 2,3,5,6; | [Y]EP1482245 (HOVALWERK AG [LI]) [Y] 2,3,5,6 * paragraphs [0031] , [0032]; figure 2 *; | [XA]JPH08128609 (MIURA KOGYO KK) [X] 1 * abstract * [A] 4,8,9; | [XA]EP0656507 (VIESSMANN WERKE KG [DE]) [X] 1 * column 3, line 32 - line 51; figure 2 * [A] 3,8,9; | [XA]EP0896191 (DUNGS KARL GMBH & CO [DE]) [X] 1 * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0021]; figures 1,2 * [A] 8,9; | [A]EP0834695 (INVERNIZZI GIANMARIO [IT]) [A] 1,8,9 * column 3, line 22 - line 33 * * column 6, line 14 - line 17; figures 1,2 *; | [A]DE10349344 (EBM PAPST LANDSHUT GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,8,9 * paragraphs [0024] , [0028] , [0031]; figures 1,2,4 *; | [A]US2603411 (EWALD TRUMPA) [A] 2,4,8,9 * column 4, line 19 - line 39; figures 9,10 *; | [A]US2905375 (JOHN HANUS, et al) [A] 2,4,8,9 * column 2, line 29 - line 50; figure 2 *; | [A]WO02061336 (SIT LA PRECISA SPA [IT], et al) [A] 1-3,5,8,9 * page 3, line 15 - page 4, line 26 * * page 5, line 19 - line 31 * * figures 1,4 *; | [A]WO03092875 (SIT LA PRECISA SPA [IT], et al) [A] 1-3,5,8,9 * figures 1,3 * * page 3, line 7 - line 15 * * page 3, line 23 - line 29 *; | [X]WO03102407 (CATALYTICA ENERGY SYS INC [US], et al) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0041] , [0042] , [0046]; figure 5 *; | [X]WO2004057236 (BOWMAN POWER SYSTEMS LIMITED [GB], et al) [X] 1 * page 13, line 5 - line 17; figure 12 * |