Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP2325437 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2325437



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 132
05.11.2014 Application deemed to be withdrawn (non-payment of examination fee/designation fee/non-reply to Written Opinion) Search / examination 2
03.09.2014 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 2
31.03.2014 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
25.02.2014 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
25.02.2014 European search opinion Search / examination 4
25.02.2014 European search report Search / examination 2
25.02.2014 Submission concerning representation Search / examination 3
12.02.2014 Search started Search / examination 1
04.10.2013 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 2
04.10.2013 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
14.09.2013 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 3
05.09.2013 Indication of deficiencies in a request for registering a transfer of rights and invitation to correct them Search / examination 2
22.08.2013 Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) Search / examination 6
09.08.2012 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
03.08.2012 Submission concerning change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
09.07.2012 Submission concerning representation Search / examination 2
28.04.2011 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
03.03.2011 Abstract Search / examination 1
03.03.2011 Description Search / examination 7
03.03.2011 Drawings Search / examination 16
03.03.2011 Reply to the invitation to remedy deficiencies Search / examination 2
30.12.2010 Deficiencies in application documents - annex C Search / examination 3
02.11.2010 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 34
19.08.2010 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
19.07.2010 Abstract Search / examination 1
19.07.2010 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
19.07.2010 Claims Search / examination 2
19.07.2010 Description Search / examination 7
19.07.2010 Drawings Search / examination 16
19.07.2010 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 4