blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2325437

EP2325437 - Master-slave rotary piston motor [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  06.03.2015
Database last updated on 26.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip06.03.2015Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 08.04.2015  [2015/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
IVATUS (UG)
Münchner Strasse 25
82041 Oberhaching / DE
[2013/45]
Former [2011/21]For all designated states
Hruschka, Peter C.
Niemoellerallee 12
81739 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Hruschka, Peter C.
Niemoellerallee 12
81739 München / DE
 [2013/45]
Former [2011/21]01 / see applicant
...
Representative(s)Hofstetter, Schurack & Partner
Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei
PartG mbB
Balanstraße 73 / Haus 31A
81541 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2012/37]Hofstetter, Schurack & Partner
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Balanstrasse 57
81541 München / DE
Former [2011/21]Schurack, Eduard F.
Hofstetter, Schurack & Skora Balanstrasse 57
81541 München / DE
Application number, filing date10170041.719.07.2010
[2011/21]
Priority number, dateEP2009000934017.07.2009         Original published format: EP 09009340
[2011/21]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2325437
Date:25.05.2011
Language:DE
[2011/21]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2325437
Date:26.03.2014
Language:DE
[2014/13]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.02.2014
ClassificationIPC:F01C1/063, F01C1/077, F01C1/07
[2014/13]
CPC:
F01C1/07 (EP); F01C1/063 (EP); F01C1/077 (EP)
Former IPC [2011/21]F01C1/063
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2011/21]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:Master-Slave-Drehkolbenmotor[2011/21]
English:Master-slave rotary piston motor[2011/21]
French:Moteur à pistons rotatifs du type master-slave[2011/21]
Examination procedure27.09.2014Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2015/15]
05.11.2014Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2015/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.07.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
31.07.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.201405   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]US3203405  (HUSCHANG SABET) [X] 1-15 * figures 1-4 * * column 1, line 33 - line 40 * * column 3, line 25 - line 48 *;
 [X]DE3226396  (STRANG MATTHIAS, et al) [X] 1-15 * figures 1, 4, 29 * * page 9, line 19 - page 10, line 9 * * page 19, line 8 - page 20, line 17 *;
 [X]US5622149  (WITTRY DAVID B [US]) [X] 1-15 * figures 1,2 * * column 5, line 1 - line 26 *;
 [X]US6305345  (BAKHTINE VLADIMIR K [RU]) [X] 1-15 * figures 1-4 * * column 4, line 44 - line 46 * * column 4, line 62 - line 65 * * column 6, line 50 - column 7, line 25 *;
 [X]DE102007003833  (AFFONSO ALVARO [DE]) [X] 1-15 * figures 1,2 * * paragraph [0003] ** claims 1-4 *;
 [X]FR2922954  (BONNEFOUS EDOUARD [FR]) [X] 1-15 * figures 1-6, 15-17 * * page 10, line 3 - page 11, line 31 * * page 15, line 33 - page 17, line 9 * * claim 1 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.