18.07.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] |
30.05.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.07.2014 [2014/27] |
18.04.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.05.2014 [2014/21] |
15.11.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.12.2013 [2013/51] |
26.07.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.08.2013 [2013/35] |
19.07.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.08.2013 [2013/34] |
12.07.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.08.2013 [2013/33] |
03.05.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.06.2013 [2013/23] |
26.04.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.05.2013 [2013/22] |
15.03.2013 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 17.04.2013 [2013/16] |
15.02.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.03.2013 [2013/12] |
08.02.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.03.2013 [2013/11] |
01.02.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.03.2013 [2013/10] |
25.01.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.02.2013 [2013/09] |
18.01.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.02.2013 [2013/08] |
11.01.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.02.2013 [2013/07] |
21.12.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.01.2013 [2013/04] |
30.11.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.01.2013 [2013/01] |
16.11.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.12.2012 [2012/51] |
09.11.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.12.2012 [2012/50] |
02.11.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.12.2012 [2012/49] |
26.10.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.11.2012 [2012/48] |
19.10.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] |
08.04.2012 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 09.05.2012 [2012/19] |
23.03.2012 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
23.03.2012 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
23.11.2011 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
14.01.2011 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 16.02.2011 [2011/07] |
14.01.2011 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 16.02.2011 [2011/07] |